United Specialty Insurance Company v. Gripshover
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Joan Anna Gripshover
Case Number: 3:2021cv00587
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL ORDER THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #11 ) filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii). It appearing that all matters of controversy have been resolved, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/1/2021. (asho, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Specialty Insurance Company (Ward, Margaret)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12(b)(6) and Rule 19 filed by Joan Anna Gripshover. (Roberts, Thomas)
October 17, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12(b)(6) and Rule 19 filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ward, Margaret)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint & Affirmative Defenses by Joan Anna Gripshover.(Roberts, Thomas) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/5/2021) (smej, ).
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Brief in Support to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12(b)(6) and Rule 19 filed by Joan Anna Gripshover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USIC answer to tort complaint, #2 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #3 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt, #4 Exhibit State DEC Action, #5 Exhibit State Nonsuit DEC Action, #6 Exhibit Waiver/Withdraw Affirmative Defense of No Coverage, #7 Exhibit Gripshover State Complaint - No Constitutional or State/Federal Issues)(Roberts, Thomas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12(b)(6) and Rule 19 by Joan Anna Gripshover. (Roberts, Thomas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company Joan Anna Gripshover served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 (Ward, Margaret)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joan Anna Gripshover. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header, Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (asho, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Ward, Margaret)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7988774.), filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Margaret)
September 10, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Specialty Insurance Company v. Gripshover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Anna Gripshover
Represented By: Thomas Hunt Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?