Lynch v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Wesley Lynch
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00703
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Non-Waiver Proposed Order by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Mehigan, James)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Confidentiality Proposed Order by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Mehigan, James)
January 6, 2022 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2022 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
December 30, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 1/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson; date and time remain the same, hearing changed to a TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (rpiz)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Mehigan, James)
November 9, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (adun, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Mehigan, James)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8091458.), filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mehigan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Lynch
Represented By: Jason Meyer Krumbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James Mehigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?