Democratic Party of Virginia et al v. Brink et al
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Virginia and DCCC
Defendant: Robert H. Brink, Christopher E. Piper, Jamilah D. Lecruise and John O'Bannon
Amicus Curiae: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Intervenor Defendant: Republican Party of Virginia
Case Number: 3:2021cv00756
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (Granting Motion to Intervene) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Republican Party of Virginia's ("RPV") Motion to Intervene. (ECF No. 27.) Upon due consideration and for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. RPV SHALL be added as a defendant to this action. RPV is further DIRECTED to file its responsive pleading within five (5) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/3/2022. (smej, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Granting Motion to Intervene). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/3/2022. (smej, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Intervene filed by Republican Party of Virginia. (Warrington, David)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER (Denying Motion to Intervene; Granting Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on Public Interest Legal Foundation's ("Movant") Motion to Intervene. (ECF No. 5.) Upon due consideration and for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Motion to Intervene is DENIED. The Court, nonetheless, GRANTS Movant leave to participate as an amicus curiae. The Court further ORDERS that Movant may file a memorandum of law, not to exceed twenty pages, addressing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 29). Such brief SHALL be filed within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/31/2022. (smej, )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Denying Motion to Intervene; Granting Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/31/2022. (smej, )
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Opposition to #27 MOTION to Intervene filed by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Opposition to #29 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Noah Lief on behalf of Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper (Lief, Joshua)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER (Granting Motion to Withdraw) that Senior Assistant Attorney General Heather Hays Lockerman' s request to withdraw from her representation of Defendants Robert H. Brink, John O'Bannon, and Jamilah D. LeCruise, in their official capacities as Chairman, Vice-Chairman, and Secretary, respectively, of the Virginia State Board of Elections, and Christopher E. Piper, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Elections is GRANTED. Heather Hays Lockerman is RELIEVED as counsel in this case. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/18/22. (adun, )
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper. (Lockerman, Heather)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Memorandum in Support to #29 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper. (Lewis, Carol)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper. (Lewis, Carol)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Intervene filed by Republican Party of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Financial Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit Proposed Motion to Dismiss)(Warrington, David)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene by Republican Party of Virginia. (Warrington, David)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Adams, John)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper. (Lockerman, Heather)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Democratic Party of Virginia, DCCC as to All Defendants (Costello-Essig, Haley) (Main Document 23 replaced on 12/29/2021) (smej, ). Modified on 12/29/2021 (smej, ).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER (Granting in Part Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and for Expedited Briefing Schedule (the "Motion") filed on December 15, 2021. (ECF No. 8.) Defendants ask for an extension until February 1, 2022, to file their responsive pleadings. Plaintiffs oppose the Motion but consent to an extension until January 5, 2022. (ECF No. 19 at 1.) After considering the parties' briefings and weighing the interests of justice, the Motion is hereby GRANTED IN PART. Defendants shall have until January 12, 2022 to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/22/2021. (smej, )
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Hays Lockerman on behalf of Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper (Lockerman, Heather)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper. (Lewis, Carol)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley). Clerk replaced document to include Certificate of Service at the request of filing attorney. NEF was regenerated on 12/21/2021. Modified docket text on 12/21/2021. (sbea)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Joel Jacinto Ramirez for DCCC, Joel Jacinto Ramirez for Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/17/21. (adun, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Michael Geise for DCCC, John Michael Geise for Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/17/2021. (adun, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Marc Erik Elias for DCCC, Marc Erik Elias for Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/17/2021. (adun, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Elisabeth Carmel Frost for DCCC,Elisabeth Carmel Frost for Democratic Party of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/17/2021. (adun, )
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel J. Ramirez and Certification of Local Counsel Haley Costello-Essig Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8157737. by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John M. Geise and Certification of Local Counsel Haley Costello-Essig Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8157719. by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc E. Elias and Certification of Local Counsel Haley Costello-Essig Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8157686. by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elisabeth C. Frost and Certification of Local Counsel Haley Costello-Essig Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8157659. by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Ordering Briefing Schedule) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and for Expedited Briefing Schedule (the "Motion") filed on December 15, 2021. (ECF No. 9.) The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendants' Motion on or before Monday, December 20, 2021. Thereafter, Defendants may file a reply on or before Wednesday, December 22, 2021. The Court will resolve the Motion, after briefing, without a hearing. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/16/2021. (jpow, )
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Briefing Schedule filed by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper. (Lewis, Carol)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Expedited Briefing Schedule by Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper. (Lewis, Carol)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Louise Lewis on behalf of Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper (Lewis, Carol)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Adams, John)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #2 Exhibit Financial Disclosure, #3 Proposed Order)(Adams, John)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert H. Brink, Jamilah D. Lecruise, John O'Bannon, Christopher E. Piper, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (smej, )
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by DCCC, Democratic Party of Virginia. (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-8139980), filed by Democratic Party of Virginia, DCCC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Costello-Essig, Haley)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint: Filing attorney is instructed to file proposed summons to serve defendants, or if waiving service, to notify the court in writing by electronically filing the notice. (smej, )
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Democratic Party of Virginia et al v. Brink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Virginia
Represented By: Haley Karen Costello-Essig
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Yukevich
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Represented By: Joel Jacinto Ramirez
Represented By: John Michael Geise
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCCC
Represented By: Haley Karen Costello-Essig
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Yukevich
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Represented By: Joel Jacinto Ramirez
Represented By: John Michael Geise
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Brink
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Represented By: Joshua Noah Lief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher E. Piper
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Represented By: Joshua Noah Lief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamilah D. Lecruise
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Represented By: Joshua Noah Lief
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O'Bannon
Represented By: Carol Louise Lewis
Represented By: Heather Hays Lockerman
Represented By: Joshua Noah Lief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Represented By: John Christian Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican Party of Virginia
Represented By: David Alan Warrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?