Tate, et al v. EventMakers-USA, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Trina Tate, Brittany Hutchinson and Morgan Hutchinson
Defendant: EventMakers-USA, Inc. doing business as CVAH Productions doing business as IAH Productions, Lawrence A. Creeger and Matthew Allan Creeger
Case Number: 3:2022cv00045
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 Brief in Support to #16 MOTION for Joinder OF NON-PARTY THE BRITMOR GROUP, LLC filed by Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc.. (Muse, Brian)
March 21, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Joinder OF NON-PARTY THE BRITMOR GROUP, LLC by Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc.. (Muse, Brian)
March 21, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc..(Muse, Brian)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT {ECF No. 9) is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendants, EventMakers-USA, Inc., Lawrence A. Creeger, and Matthew Allan Creeger, shall file their Answers and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by March 21, 2022. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/25/2022. (smej, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by EventMakers-USA, Inc.. (Muse, Brian)
February 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Callahan on behalf of Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc. (Callahan, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Hylton Hansen on behalf of Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc. (Hansen, Robyn)
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Garth Muse on behalf of Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc. (Muse, Brian)
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Granting Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Muse, Brian)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance as to Matthew Allan Creeger served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (smej, )
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Compliance as to Lawrence A. Creeger served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (smej, )
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Compliance as to EventMakers-USA, Inc. served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (smej, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lawrence A. Creeger, Matthew Allan Creeger, EventMakers-USA, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (smej, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Brittany Hutchinson, Morgan Hutchinson, Trina Tate. (Shelley, Blackwell)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Brittany Hutchinson, Morgan Hutchinson, Trina Tate. (Shelley, Blackwell)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Brittany Hutchinson, Morgan Hutchinson, Trina Tate. (Shelley, Blackwell)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-8212960), filed by Trina Tate, Morgan Hutchinson, Brittany Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shelley, Blackwell)
January 26, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate, et al v. EventMakers-USA, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Tate
Represented By: Blackwell N Shelley, Jr.
Represented By: Nichole Buck Vanderslice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Hutchinson
Represented By: Blackwell N Shelley, Jr.
Represented By: Nichole Buck Vanderslice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Hutchinson
Represented By: Blackwell N Shelley, Jr.
Represented By: Nichole Buck Vanderslice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EventMakers-USA, Inc. doing business as CVAH Productions doing business as IAH Productions
Represented By: Brian Garth Muse
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Callahan
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence A. Creeger
Represented By: Brian Garth Muse
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Callahan
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Allan Creeger
Represented By: Brian Garth Muse
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Callahan
Represented By: Robyn Hylton Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?