Woods v. Pullman et al
Plaintiff: Robert C. Woods
Defendant: Susanna Starr Pullman, William Anthony Pullman, Starr Pullman, Tony Pullman, Keith Wesley Ruse, Deltaville Boatyard, LLC and Ryan Brown
Case Number: 3:2022cv00497
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2022 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Counsel directed to report to Courtroom 6000. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 9/13/22. (wtuc)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER This matter comes before the Court on the plaintiff's consent motion to dismiss the defendant Ryan Brown ("the defendant") without prejudice , pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. (ECF No. 22.) The Court GRANTS the motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to dismiss Ryan Brown from the case. The defendant's motion to dismiss is MOOT. (ECF No. #17 .) The plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file a reply brief to the defendant's motion to dismiss is MOOT. (ECF No. #22 .) Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 8/24/2022. (asho, ) Modified 8/25/2022 to replace Order, NEF's regenerated.
August 24, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION extension of time to file a reply brief to Brown's 12(b) brief if Rule 21 dismissal is not first entered , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Robert C. Woods. (Barker, Samuel)
August 23, 2022 Filing 21 Brief in Support to #20 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by Robert C. Woods. (Barker, Samuel)
August 23, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Robert C. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal w/ Def. Brown's Consent)(Barker, Samuel)
August 10, 2022 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Brown. (Bernhardt, Christopher)
August 10, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Hensley on behalf of Ryan Brown (Hensley, Amy)
August 10, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ryan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bernhardt, Christopher)
August 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Praeger Bernhardt on behalf of Ryan Brown (Bernhardt, Christopher)
August 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Deltaville Boatyard, LLC, Susanna Starr Pullman, William Anthony Pullman, Keith Wesley Ruse (Praecipe) (Murphy, Earl)
August 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl Stanley Murphy on behalf of Deltaville Boatyard, LLC, Susanna Starr Pullman, William Anthony Pullman, Keith Wesley Ruse (Murphy, Earl)
August 9, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Deltaville Boatyard, LLC, Susanna Starr Pullman, William Anthony Pullman, Keith Wesley Ruse.(Murphy, Earl)
July 21, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert C. Woods William Anthony Pullman served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022 (Barker, Samuel)
July 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert C. Woods Deltaville Boatyard, LLC served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022 (Barker, Samuel)
July 21, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert C. Woods Keith Wesley Ruse served on 7/18/2022, answer due 8/8/2022 (Barker, Samuel)
July 21, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert C. Woods Susanna Starr Pullman served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022 (Barker, Samuel) Modified on 7/21/2022 (asho, ).
July 21, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert C. Woods Ryan Brown served on 7/20/2022, answer due 8/10/2022 (Barker, Samuel) Modified on 7/21/2022 (asho, ).
July 18, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ryan Brown, Deltaville Boatyard, LLC, Susanna Starr Pullman, William Anthony Pullman, Keith Wesley Ruse, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (asho, )
July 15, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Ryan Brown, DWR by Robert C. Woods. (Barker, Samuel)
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons William Pullman by Robert C. Woods. (Barker, Samuel)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Deltaville Boatyard, LLC R/A by Robert C. Woods. (Barker, Samuel)
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Keith Wesley Ruse by Robert C. Woods. (Barker, Samuel)
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Susanna Starr Pullman by Robert C. Woods. (Barker, Samuel)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8475140.), filed by Robert Coleman Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Yacht Photographs, #2 Exhibit Va. SCC listing DBY, #3 Exhibit DWR application transfer Yacht, #4 Exhibit DWR application transfer JetSki, #5 Exhibit Prior BK SOFA, #6 Exhibit DBY Yard Rules in 2013, #7 Exhibit DBY Yard Rules in 2020-2021, #8 Exhibit DBY Service Rates, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barker, Samuel) (Main Document 1 replaced to include civil case number on 7/15/2022) (asho, ).
July 15, 2022 Notice of Correction; Filing user notified that the complaint did not include the civil case number and to include the case number on all future filings. The clerk has inserted the number on the complaint and no further action is required. Clerk also reminded filing user to electronically file the proposed summonses. (asho, )
July 15, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Pullman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanna Starr Pullman
Represented By: Earl Stanley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Anthony Pullman
Represented By: Earl Stanley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Pullman
Represented By: Earl Stanley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Pullman
Represented By: Earl Stanley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wesley Ruse
Represented By: Earl Stanley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deltaville Boatyard, LLC
Represented By: Earl Stanley Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Brown
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Hensley
Represented By: Christopher Praeger Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Woods
Represented By: Samuel Keith Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?