Gray v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Antonie Pierre Gray
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00679
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) and 16(b) and Local Rule 16(B), a pretrial conference is rescheduled in this action for December 19, 2022, at 1:00 P.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/15/22. (jjones, )
December 15, 2022 Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 12/19/2022 at 01:00 PM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. (jsau, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 12/16/2022 at 09:30 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 12/14/22. (jsau, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that having considered the CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ECF No. 6), it is hereby ORDERED that this action shall be REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell for all purposes. It is further ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled on the undersigned's docket for 11:00 a.m. January 17,2023 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/14/2022. Copy sent to Judge Colombell. (jjones, )
December 14, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. District Judge Robert E. Payne no longer assigned to the case. (jjones, )
December 14, 2022 Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that due to a conflict in the Court's docket, it is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11:00 a. m. December 14, 2022 is continued to 11:00 a.m. January 17, 2023. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/13/2022. (jjones, )
December 13, 2022 Filing 6 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Antonie Pierre Gray. (Montgomery, Wayne)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of Senior District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/30/2022. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2022 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of Senior District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/30/2022. (nbrow)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company.(de Witt, Alexander)
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (de Witt, Alexander)
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8620780.), filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(de Witt, Alexander)
October 20, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (adun, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonie Pierre Gray
Represented By: Wayne Barry Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Represented By: Alexander Spotswood de Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?