Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC v. Cambridge Investment Research, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC
Defendant: Cambridge Investment Research, Inc., Cambridge Investment Research Advisors, Inc. and Jayne W Di Vincenzo
Case Number: 3:2022cv00717
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER This matter is before the Court on Defendants Cambridge Investment Research, Inc. and Cambridge Investment Research Advisors, Inc. (collectively, Cambridge) and Jayne W. Di Vincenzo (Ms. Di Vincenzo) (collectively, Defendants) Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLCs (Colonial River) Amended Complaint. (ECF. No. #15 .) Finding good cause to do so, it is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motion is GRANTED, and that the deadline to respond to Colonial Rivers Amended Complaint (ECF No. #12 ) is January 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/5/2023. (asho, )
January 4, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Jayne W Di Vincenzo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Willett, Henry)
December 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw on behalf of Cambridge Investment Research Advisors, Inc., Cambridge Investment Research, Inc. (McGraw, Diana Lyn)
December 16, 2022 Filing 13 Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC. (Wolf, Thomas)
December 16, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement)(Wolf, Thomas)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The November 16 Order did not directly address the implications of the Amended Complaint on Defendants pending responsive pleading obligations, otherwise due December 2, 2022. This Order corrects that oversight. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that all Defendants have 21 days from receipt of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint to submit a responsive pleading. It is further ORDERED that no response shall be required to the Complaint (ECF No. 1). Because the Consent Motion and accompanying Proposed Consent Order did not address the filing obligations of Defendants Cambridge Investment Research, Inc. and Cambridge Investment Research Advisors, Inc., and in light of this comprehensive Order, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to TERMINATE the Consent Motion (ECF No. #10 ) as MOOT. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/30/2022. (asho, )
November 29, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadline for Responsive Pleadings by Jayne W Di Vincenzo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Willett, Henry)
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda Duke Jones on behalf of Jayne W Di Vincenzo (Jones, Belinda)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Irving Willett, III on behalf of Jayne W Di Vincenzo (Willett, Henry)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER This matter is before the Court on its own initiative for review of the jurisdictional allegations in the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ). The Court has also reviewed Plaintiffs Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (ECF No. #5 ). The pleadings are insufficient to establish subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity of citizenship. Accordingly, within thirty (30) days of the date hereof, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that includes the specific information required for the Court to determine whether subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity of citizenship exists in this matter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/16/2022. (asho, )
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cambridge Investment Research Advisors, Inc., Cambridge Investment Research, Inc., Jayne W Di Vincenzo, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (asho, )
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC. (Wolf, Thomas)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Jayne W. Di Vincenzo by Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC. (Wolf, Thomas)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Cambridge Investment Research Advisors, Inc. by Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC. (Wolf, Thomas)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Cambridge Investment Research, Inc. by Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC. (Wolf, Thomas)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8656342.), filed by Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolf, Thomas)
November 10, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC v. Cambridge Investment Research, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonial River Wealth Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Jason Forest Goldsmith
Represented By: John MacDonald Robb, III
Represented By: Joseph M. Rainsbury
Represented By: Kenneth Thomas Stout
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Investment Research, Inc.
Represented By: Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Investment Research Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayne W Di Vincenzo
Represented By: Belinda Duke Jones
Represented By: Henry Irving Willett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?