Clark v. Bourne
Plaintiff: Rodrik Clark
Defendant: R. Bourne
Case Number: 3:2023cv00772
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Assessing Initial Partial Filing Fee). It is ORDERED that: Within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof, Plaintiff must submit an initial partial filing fee of $7.73 or state under penalty of perjury that he does not have sufficient assets to pay such a fee. Plaintiff remains liable for the entire filing fee of $350.00. After Plaintiff pays the initial partial filing fee or it is waived, the Court will contact Plaintiff's place of incarceration. The institution will then forward to the Court twenty percent (20%) of all deposits into Plaintiff's account until the full $350.00 filing fee is paid. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 1/8/2024. Memorandum Order was mailed to the plaintiff. (sbea)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent to Collection of Fees by Rodrik Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jsmi, )
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodrik Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jsmi, )
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Rodrik Clark. (Attachments: #1 Account History)(jenjones, )
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 11/30/2023. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.)(Kat)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against R. Bourne, filed by Rodrik Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(adun, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrik Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?