Heflin et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Heflin and April Robertson-Heflin
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation agent of d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services and McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00232
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. Amended filed by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Trustees Deed)(Wylie, Michael)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Amended) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Williston, Gillian)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion for Leave to File Late Response (ECF No. #12 ) and ORDERS that Plaintiffs' Response (ECF No. #8 ) is hereby deemed timely filed. Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation shall have until on or before May 27, 2024 to file any Reply deemed necessary. Copy of order and Pro Se E-Noticing Form mailed to Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 05/20/2024. (Kski, )
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter received from Jerry and April Heflin. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Service, #2 Local Rule 83.1 Certification, #3 Envelope)(jenjones, )
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC. (Wylie, Michael)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, of Non-Opposition (Williston, Gillian)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro, #4 Memorandum in Support filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Williston, Gillian). Modified on 5/13/2024 correcting the linked ECF numbers (Khan, ).
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Response to PHH Mortgage Notice of Removal filed by Jerry Heflin, April Robertson-Heflin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kski, )
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC. (Wylie, Michael)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC. (Wylie, Michael)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC. (Wylie, Michael)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Williston, Gillian)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Williston, Gillian)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (sbea)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Williston, Gillian)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9444828.), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williston, Gillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heflin et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Heflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Robertson-Heflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation agent of d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Gillian DiFilippo Williston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Richard Derrick Painter
Represented By: Michael C Wylie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?