Burt v. United States Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Plaintiff: Gordon Burt
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2024cv00401
Filed: May 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (ECF No. #7 ) is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file their Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by August 2, 2024. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 7/2/2024. (jenjones, )
June 28, 2024 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hambrick, Jonathan)
June 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Holland Hambrick on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security (Hambrick, Jonathan)
June 17, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate Reporting Service. United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Department of Homeland Security served 6/3/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (Hambrick, Jonathan) Modified docket text to include answer due date on 6/18/2024 (jsmi, )
June 11, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gordon Burt. All Defendants. (Gluckman, David)
May 30, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please electronically file the service copy using the filing event Summons Returned Executed as to the USA. (sbea) (Clerk corrected date of response on the Summons on 5/30/2024). (sbea)
May 30, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Gordon Burt. (Gluckman, David)
May 30, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9553728.), filed by Gordon Burt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gluckman, David)
May 30, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea)
May 30, 2024 Notice of Correction re: #3 Summons Issued as to USA; Clerk amended date of answer response per Office procedure. No further action is required. (sbea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burt v. United States Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Burt
Represented By: David Elliott Gluckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?