Gastanaga v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Claire G. Gastanaga
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2024cv00485
Filed: July 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2024 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Claire G. Gastanaga. (Hurd, William)
August 26, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Claire G. Gastanaga. (Hurd, William)
August 16, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Lucier, Jonathan)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Court hereby GRANTS the Consent Motion (ECF No. #7 ). Defendant shall file its responsive pleadings on or before August 16, 2024. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 8/2/2024. (adun, )
July 31, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate Reporting Service by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Lucier, Jonathan)
July 31, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Lucier, Jonathan)
July 31, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services re #6 Certificate Reporting Service, #5 Notice of Appearance re Corrected Filings (Lucier, Jonathan)
July 31, 2024 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lucier, Jonathan)
July 9, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate Reporting Service by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 7/3/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. (Lucier, Jonathan)
July 9, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Lucier, Jonathan)
July 3, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Kski, )
July 3, 2024 Filing 3 PLEASE DISREGARD, DOCKETED IN ERROR, CORRECT SUMMONS TO ISSUE Summons Issued. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Electronically file the summons return using the filing events Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. Please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear when filing the return of service. (Kski, ) Modified on 7/3/2024 (Kski, ).
July 2, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to U.S. Dept. of Health and Human Services, Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney by Claire G. Gastanaga (Hurd, William) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/3/2024) (Kski)
July 2, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9611205.), filed by Claire G. Gastanaga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Hurd, William) (Main Document 1 and Civil Cover Sheet 2 replaced on 7/3/2024) (Kski, ).
July 2, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (Kski, )
July 2, 2024 Notice of Correction: Filing attorney notified that all documents must be e-signed and uploaded in standard pdf format. Clerk will correct ECF's #1 and #2 when the corrected documents are received. Attorney also reminded to filed proposed summons for both the USAG as well as the US Attorney. (Kski, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gastanaga v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire G. Gastanaga
Represented By: William Henry Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?