Alston v. CHS TX, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Deandre R. Alston
Defendant: Sandra Hill, Damarcus Brown, Ty Doyle, Sanders, Mason, Dale Moreno, Jonathan Dix, Devin Holland, J. A. Smith, Derek Brown, CHS TX, Inc. doing business as YesCare Corp., Charlotte L. Botvinis and CHS VA, LLC doing business as YesCare Corp.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00892
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2025 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Damarcus Brown, Derek Brown, Jonathan Dix, Ty Doyle, Devin Holland, Mason, Sanders, J. A. Smith. (Richard, Timothy)
February 10, 2025 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Damarcus Brown, Derek Brown, Jonathan Dix, Ty Doyle, Devin Holland, Mason, Sanders, J. A. Smith. (Richard, Timothy)
February 10, 2025 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by CHS TX, Inc., CHS VA, LLC.(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2025 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Dale Moreno.(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2025 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Sandra Hill.(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2025 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Charlotte L. Botvinis.(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Armando Richard on behalf of Damarcus Brown, Derek Brown, Jonathan Dix, Ty Doyle, Devin Holland, Mason, Sanders, J. A. Smith (Richard, Timothy)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Court GRANTS Defendants' #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Ty Doyle, Jonathan Dix, Damarcus Brown, Devin Holland, Derek Brown, Sanders, J.A. Smith, and Mason to File Responsive Pleadings. As such, Defendants Ty Doyle, Jonathan Dix, Damarcus Brown, Devin Holland, Derek Brown, Sanders, J.A. Smith, and Mason SHALL file their responsive pleadings on or before February 10, 2025. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/13/2025. (jsmi, )
January 9, 2025 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Damarcus Brown, Derek Brown, Jonathan Dix, Ty Doyle, Devin Holland, Mason, Sanders, J. A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Rachel)
January 9, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Woodul Tunner on behalf of Damarcus Brown, Derek Brown, Jonathan Dix, Ty Doyle, Devin Holland, Mason, Sanders, J. A. Smith (Tunner, William)
January 9, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Willer Adams on behalf of Damarcus Brown, Derek Brown, Jonathan Dix, Ty Doyle, Devin Holland, Mason, Sanders, J. A. Smith (Adams, Rachel)
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- Based on the parties consent, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants Motion for Extension (ECF No. #8 ). As such, Defendants SHALL file their responsive pleadings on or before February 10, 2025. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/8/2025. (adun, )
January 7, 2025 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Charlotte L. Botvinis, CHS VA, LLC, CHS TX, Inc., Sandra Hill, Dale Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muldowney, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Martin Muldowney on behalf of Charlotte L. Botvinis, CHS VA, LLC, CHS TX, Inc., Sandra Hill, Dale Moreno (Muldowney, Elizabeth)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7(E) STANDING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 7/16/2024. (adun, )
December 17, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charlotte L. Botvinis, Damarcus Brown, Derek Brown, CHS VA, LLC, CHS TX, Inc., Jonathan Dix, Ty Doyle, Sandra Hill, Devin Holland, Mason, Dale Moreno, Sanders, J. A. Smith. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Electronically file the summons return using the filing events Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. Please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear when filing the return of service. (adun, )
December 16, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (adun, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Deandre R. Alston. (McNelis, Edward) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/17/2024) (adun, ).
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Deandre R. Alston. (McNelis, Edward) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/16/2024) (adun, ).
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Deandre R. Alston. (McNelis, Edward) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/16/2024) (adun, ).
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9904800.), filed by Deandre R. Alston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNelis, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. CHS TX, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Hill
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damarcus Brown
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Doyle
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Moreno
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Dix
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Holland
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. A. Smith
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Brown
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Timothy Armando Richard
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS TX, Inc. doing business as YesCare Corp.
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte L. Botvinis
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS VA, LLC doing business as YesCare Corp.
Represented By: Elizabeth Martin Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre R. Alston
Represented By: Howard William Ross Bullock
Represented By: Harrison Whitten Long
Represented By: Edward Joseph McNelis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?