Featherston v. Gregory et al
Plaintiff: Forest Glenn Featherston
Defendant: Alisa Gregory, Ennis, Deputy Reavis, Deputy Prince, Deputy Church and Major Jerrell
Case Number: 3:2025cv00072
Filed: January 29, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE- IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Plaintiff failed to keep the Court informed of his current address. Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants, Alisa Gregory, Ennis, Deputy Reavis, Deputy Prince, Deputy Church, and Major Jerrell. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2025. Copy mailed to Plaintiff.(adun, )
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL ORDER- that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Plaintiff failed to keep the Court informed of his current address. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a final appealable Judgment in a Civil Case in favor of Defendants as a separate entry on the docket. Plaintiff does not request, and the Court does not grant leave to amend, rendering this order final and appealable. Should Plaintiff desire to appeal, a written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof Failure to file a notice of appeal within that period may result in the loss of the right to appeal. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/5/2025. Copy of Opinion and Order mailed to Plaintiff.(adun, )
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/5/2025. (adun, )
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Forest Glenn Featherston (adun, )
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action). It is ORDERED that: this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within thirty (30) days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for 6-month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 2/5/2025. (Copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff with IFP Form and Consent to Collection of Fees. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.)(jenjones, )
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Deputy Church, Deputy Prince, Deputy Reavis, Ennis, Alisa Gregory, Major Jerrell, filed by Forest Glenn Featherston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(adun, )
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Forest Glenn Featherston. (adun, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Featherston v. Gregory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Glenn Featherston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisa Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Reavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Jerrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?