Childs v. Dotson
Petitioner: Dominique A. Childs
Respondent: Chadwick S. Dotson
Case Number: 3:2025cv00091
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 300006614 (Lgar, )
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Evidentiary Hearing by Dominique A. Childs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Envelope)(adun, )
February 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Filing 28 U.S.C. 2254 Petition). It is ORDERED that: The Petition is CONDITIONALLY FILED pending payment of any assessed filing fee; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to process Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis. If an appropriate affidavit for proceeding in forma pauperis has not been submitted, the Clerk shall mail an appropriate in forma pauperis affidavit to Petitioner. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a Notice & Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate form. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 2/21/2025. (Copy of Memorandum Order, IFP Form and Notice and Consent form mailed to petitioner. Inmate Account Form and copy of Memorandum Order mailed to Plaintiff's Institution.) (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent and Reference)(jenjones, )
February 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dominique A. Childs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit H-3, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Envelope) (Attachment and exhibits scanned in order received.)(jenjones, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childs v. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dominique A. Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chadwick S. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?