Russini v. Unknown
Petitioner: Jennifer Russini
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 3:2025cv00114
Filed: February 12, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark R Colombell
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2025 Filing 5 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE- IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Russini's 2254 Petition and the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because she has failed either to demonstrate that she has exhausted available state remedies or that exceptional circumstances warrant consideration of her petition at this juncture. Judgment is entered in favor of the Respondent. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2025. Copy mailed to Petitioner. (adun, )
March 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER- Accordingly, Russini's 2254 Petition and the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because she has failed either to demonstrate that she has exhausted available state remedies or that exceptional circumstances warrant consideration of her petition at this juncture. The Clerk is DIRECTED toenter a final appealable Judgment in a Civil Case in favor of Respondent as a separate entry on the docket. Russini does not request, and the Court does not grant, leave to amend, rendering this order final and appealable. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Should Russini desire to appeal, a written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. Failure to file a notice of appeal within that period may result in the loss of the right to appeal. SEE ORDER FOR DEATILS. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 3/19/2025. Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner.(adun, )
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Directing Petitioner to Show Cause for Lack of Exhaustion)- Petitioner is DIRECTED to show cause, within twenty (20) days of date of entry hereof, as to why her 2254 Petition should not be dismissed for lack of exhaustion. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of the 2254 Petition without prejudice to re- file after Petitioner has exhausted her state court remedies for all of her claims. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 2/20/2025. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff. (adun, )
February 12, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Russini. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kski, )
February 12, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jennifer Russini. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Kski, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russini v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennifer Russini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?