G.G. v. Gloucester County School Board Featured Case
Plaintiff: G. G.
Defendant: Gloucester County School Board
Case Number: 4:2015cv00054
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Newport News Office
County: Gloucester
Presiding Judge: Robert G. Doumar
Presiding Judge: Tommy E. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 237 USCA Case Number 19-1952, 4CCA Case Manager Cathi Bennett for 235 Notice of Appeal filed by Gloucester County School Board. [19-1952] (bpet, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 236 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 235 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal) (bpet, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Gloucester County School Board. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-6814437. (Corrigan, David)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting 233 , the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Shayna Medley-Warsoff for Gavin Grimm. Ms. Medley-Warsoff is terminated as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/22/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
August 21, 2019 Filing 233 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Shayna Medley-Warsoff by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heilman, Eden)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 231 , the Joint Motion to Defer Filing of Bill of Costs and Petition for Fees filed by Gavin Grimm, as follows: Plaintiff shall file his bill of costs and petition for fees within twenty-one days after the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit issues its mandate on appeal. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/19/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
August 16, 2019 Filing 231 Joint MOTION to Defer Filing of Bill of Costs and Petition for Fees by Gavin Grimm. (Heilman, Eden)
August 9, 2019 Filing 230 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/19. (bpet, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER. The Board's 213 Motion to Strike Exhibits is GRANTED IN PART andDENIED IN PART. Gavin Grimm's 184 Motion for Summary Judgment isGRANTED. The Board's 191 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/9/19. (bpet, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 228 Motions Hearing held before District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/23/2019 re 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment 213 MOTION to Exclude. Joshua Block, Nicole Tortoriello, Eden Heilman, Jennifer Safstrom and Shayna Medley-Warsoff present on behalf of the plaintiff. David Corrigan and Jeremy Capps present on behalf of the defendant. Arguments of counsel heard. Court to take the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Jody Stewart.)(lhow)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying 221 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 6/21/19. (bpet, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Gavin Grimm re 201 Response in Opposition to Motion, 223 Memorandum in Opposition, 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heilman, Eden) Modified text on 6/18/19 (bpet, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 224 REPLY Brief in Support re 221 MOTION to Stay filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David) Modified docket text on 6/6/2019 (jrin).
May 31, 2019 Filing 223 Memorandum in Opposition re 221 MOTION to Stay filed by Gavin Grimm. (Heilman, Eden)
May 24, 2019 Filing 222 Brief in Support to 221 MOTION to Stay filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 221 MOTION to Stay by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER deferring ruling on 213 the Motion to Strike Exhibits filed by Defendant, as well as the other pending motions; oral argument will be heard on these motions at 9 AM on Tuesday, July 23, 2019 in Norfolk. The trial date of July 23, 2019, the Pretrial Conference previously set for July 12, 2019, and all trial document filing deadlines are stricken, and will be rescheduled if necessary after the pending motions are resolved. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/21/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER deferring ruling on 191 the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the Defendant, as well as the other pending motions; oral argument will be heard on these motions at 9 AM on Tuesday, July 23, 2019 in Norfolk. The trial date of July 23, 2019, the Pretrial Conference previously set for July 12, 2019, and all trial document filing deadlines are stricken, and will be rescheduled if necessary after the pending motions are resolved. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/21/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER deferring ruling on 184 the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff, and the other pending motions; oral argument will be heard on these motions at 9 AM on Tuesday, July 23, 2019 in Norfolk. The trial date of July 23, 2019, the Pretrial Conference previously set for July 12, 2019, and all trial document filing deadlines are stricken, and will be rescheduled if necessary after the pending motions are resolved. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/21/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
May 13, 2019 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Support re 213 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Exhibits Filed with Gavin Grimm's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 216 Memorandum in Opposition re 213 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Exhibits Filed with Gavin Grimm's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gavin Grimm. (Safstrom, Jennifer)
May 1, 2019 Filing 215 Request for Hearing by Gloucester County School Board re 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 213 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Exhibits Filed with Gavin Grimm's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrigan, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 214 Brief in Support to 213 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Exhibits Filed with Gavin Grimm's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 List of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Corrigan, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 213 MOTION to Exclude and Strike Exhibits Filed with Gavin Grimm's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 204 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 4/22/19. (bpet, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 211 RESPONSE to Motion re 204 MOTION to Seal filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Capps, Jeremy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 210 Memorandum in Support re 204 MOTION to Seal filed by Gavin Grimm. (Heilman, Eden)
April 16, 2019 Filing 209 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) E re 204 MOTION to Seal . (Heilman, Eden)
April 16, 2019 Filing 208 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) D re 204 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Continuation of Sealed Filing, # 2 Supplement Continuation of Sealed Filing)(Heilman, Eden)
April 16, 2019 Filing 207 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) C re 204 MOTION to Seal . (Heilman, Eden)
April 16, 2019 Filing 206 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) B re 204 MOTION to Seal . (Heilman, Eden)
April 16, 2019 Filing 205 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Gavin Grimm re 204 MOTION to Seal (Heilman, Eden)
April 16, 2019 Filing 204 MOTION to Seal by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heilman, Eden)
April 16, 2019 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Heilman, Eden)
April 15, 2019 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 List of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Corrigan, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Heilman, Eden)
April 9, 2019 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P)(Corrigan, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 199 Amicus Brief by Fairfax County School Board, Alexandria City School Board, Arlington School Board, Falls Church City School Board. (bpet, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 188 , the Unopposed Motion of Amici Curiae for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiff, filed by Fairfax County School Board and other Virginia school boards. The Clerk is directed to please file the proposed amicus brief, ECF No. 188-1. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/27/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
March 27, 2019 Notice of Correction re 186 , 187 , 192 , 193 , 194 , 195 , 197 Exhibits: The exhibits are not linked back to the document to which they refer. Additionally, to the extent possible, exhibits should filed as attachments to the document they support. In the event that exhibits are too numerous to be contained in one docket entry, they should be filed as attachments to a Notice of Submission bearing the signature of the filing user, as outlined in the ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. The filing user has been advised to note same for future reference. No further action is required at this time. (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 197 EXHIBIT 7 Declaration of James H. Loving re 185 Memorandum in Support by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 1st multi user 1, # 2 Exhibit B - 1st multi user 2, # 3 Exhibit C - 1st multi user 3, # 4 Exhibit D - 2nd multi user 1, # 5 Exhibit E - 2nd multi user 2, # 6 Exhibit F - 2nd multi user 3, # 7 Exhibit G - 2nd multi user 4, # 8 Exhibit H - single user 1, # 9 Exhibit I - single user 2, # 10 Exhibit J - single user 3, # 11 Exhibit K - single user 4, # 12 Exhibit L - single user 5)(Heilman, Eden) Modified on 3/27/19 (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 196 Brief in Support to 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O)(Corrigan, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 195 EXHIBIT 6 Declaration of Janet M. Rainey re 185 Memorandum in Support by Gavin Grimm. (Heilman, Eden) Modified on 3/27/19 (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 194 EXHIBIT 5 Declaration of Thomas Aberli re 185 Memorandum in Support by Gavin Grimm. (Heilman, Eden) Modified on 3/27/19 (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 193 EXHIBIT 4 Declaration of Diana Bruce re 185 Memorandum in Support by Gavin Grimm. (Heilman, Eden) Modified on 3/27/19 (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 192 EXHIBIT 3 Declaration of Shayna Medley-Warsoff re 185 Memorandum in Support by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Def.'s Response to First Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Def.'s Supplemental Response to First Set of Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Penn Expert Rep. & Decl., # 4 Exhibit 4 - Penn CV, # 5 Exhibit 5 - WPATH Standards of Care, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Endocrine Society Guidelines, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Van Meter Expert Rep., # 8 Exhibit 8 - Penn Rebuttal Rep., # 9 Exhibit 9 - Collins Dep., # 10 Exhibit 10 - Clemons Dep., # 11 Exhibit 11 - Durr Dep., # 12 Exhibit 12 - Lord Dep., # 13 Exhibit 13 - Anderson Dep., # 14 Exhibit 14 - Van Meter Dep., # 15 Exhibit 15 - Collins memo dated 10/14/2014 (GCSB 894), # 16 Exhibit 16 - Clemons email dated 10/22/14 (WAVYTVFOIA 007), # 17 Exhibit 17 - Collins memo dated 10/23/14 (GCSB 4122), # 18 Exhibit 18 - Hook email dated 10/24/14 (GCSB-0854), # 19 Exhibit 19 - Hook email dated 10/31/14 (GCSB 0844), # 20 Exhibit 20 - Hook email to Board dated 11/4/14 (GCSB 0513), # 21 Exhibit 21 - Hook email to the Board dated 11/9/14 with attachment (GCSB 0507-08), # 22 Exhibit 22 - Press Release dated 12/3/14, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Recorded Minutes of the Gloucester County School Board, December 9, 2014, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Collins memo to Deirdre and David Grimm dated 12/10/2014 (GCSB 0893), # 25 Exhibit 25 - Email to Nate Collins dated 11/19/2014 (GCSB 3932), # 26 Exhibit 26 - Gavin transcript GCSB, # 27 Exhibit 27 - VSBA Presentation, # 28 Exhibit 28 - Map of Gloucester High School 17 (GCSB 1276), # 29 Exhibit 29 - Annotated Map of GHS, # 30 Exhibit 30 - List of Restrooms at GHS (GCSB 03944), # 31 Exhibit 31 - Ltr. from J. Block to D. Corrigan dated 12/23/16, # 32 Exhibit 32 - Ltr. from D. Corrigan to J. Block dated 1/18/17, # 33 Exhibit 33 - Ltr. from J. Block to D. McNerney dated 1/18/17, # 34 Exhibit 34 - Ltr. from K. Duncan to D. McNerney dated 1/19/17, # 35 Exhibit 35 - Press Release dated 02/13/2019, # 36 Exhibit 36 - Press Release dated 02/21/2019, # 37 Exhibit 37 - Recorded Minutes of the Gloucester County School Board, November 11, 2014, # 38 Exhibit 38 - AAP Amicus, # 39 Exhibit 39 - School Administrator Amicus, # 40 Exhibit 40 - Nat'l PTA Amicus, # 41 Exhibit 41 - APA & NASP Resolution, # 42 Exhibit 42 - Gender Spectrum Frequently Asked Questions (2016), # 43 Exhibit 43 - NASSP Statement)(Heilman, Eden) Modified on 3/27/19 (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Alan Raphael on behalf of Fairfax County School Board, Alexandria City School Board, Arlington School Board, Falls Church City School Board (Raphael, Stuart)
March 26, 2019 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Stephen Cox on behalf of Fairfax County School Board, Alexandria City School Board, Arlington School Board, Falls Church City School Board (Cox, Trevor)
March 26, 2019 Filing 188 MOTION Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiff Unopposed Motion of Amicus Curiae Fairfax County School Board and Other Virginia School Boards for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiff by Fairfax County School Board, Alexandria City School Board, Arlington School Board, Falls Church City School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Trevor)
March 26, 2019 Filing 187 EXHIBIT 2 Declaration of Deirdre Grimm re 185 Memorandum in Support by Gavin Grimm.. (Heilman, Eden) Modified on 3/27/19 (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 186 EXHIBIT 1 Declaration of Gavin Grimm re 185 Memorandum in Support by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Treatment Documentation Letter (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B - DMV, # 3 Exhibit C - Court Order (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit D - Birth Certificate (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit E - Transcript (Redacted))(Heilman, Eden) Modified on 3/27/19 (bpet, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 185 Memorandum in Support re 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gavin Grimm. (Heilman, Eden)
March 26, 2019 Filing 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heilman, Eden)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 182 , Plaintiff's consent motion for leave to file summary judgment briefs in excess of the thirty-page limit on briefs imposed by Local Civil Rule 7(F)(3) as follows: for good cause shown, briefs filed in support of summary judgment, in opposition of summary judgment, and in reply shall be subject to a sixty-page limit. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/192019. (Allen, Arenda)
March 19, 2019 Filing 182 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heilman, Eden)
March 7, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Safstrom on behalf of Gavin Grimm (Safstrom, Jennifer)
March 1, 2019 Filing 180 ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by Gloucester County School Board.(Corrigan, David)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to File expert disclosure by Gloucester County School Board. The defendant's expert disclosure responding to, contradicting, or rebutting plaintiff's expert disclosure shall be made on or before February 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 02/21/2019. (Krask, Robert)
February 20, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: 178 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures. (bpet, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 178 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures by Gloucester County School Board. (Capps, Jeremy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 177 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gloucester County School Board, filed by Gavin Grimm. (bpet, )
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 170 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 2/14/19. (bpet, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting 173 , the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant filed by Gloucester County School Board. Douglas E. Pittman is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 2/14/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
February 13, 2019 Filing 174 Brief in Support to 173 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Pittman, Douglas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 173 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Pittman, Douglas)
December 27, 2018 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to Motion re 170 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Gavin Grimm. (Tortoriello, Nicole)
December 21, 2018 Filing 171 Memorandum in Opposition re 170 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Corrigan, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tortoriello, Nicole)
October 29, 2018 Bench Trial set for 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Newport News Courtroom 1 before District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen. (lhow)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 168 Motion to Strike Jury Demand and Set Case for Bench Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 10/29/18. (bpet, )
October 29, 2018 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: 168 Consent MOTION to Strike Jury Demand and Set Case for Bench Trial. (bpet, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 168 Consent MOTION to Strike Jury Demand and Set Case for Bench Trial by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tortoriello, Nicole)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask; Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 10/19/18. (bpet, )
October 18, 2018 Settlement Conference held on 10/18/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (lwoo)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 SECOND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement conference scheduled for 10/18/18 at 10:00 a.m. in the Richmond Courthouse; any supplemental memoranda due by noon on 10/16/18; all other terms of the original 156 Settlement Conference Order remain in full force and effect; see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 10/4/18. (bpet, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 165 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 11:00 AM at the courthouse in Norfolk. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM at the courthouse in Newport News. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/25/18 and filed on 9/26/18. (lhow)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 158 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eden Heilman as certified by local counsel Nicole Gloria Tortoriello for Gavin Grimm. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/19/2018. (Allen, Arenda)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 159 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shayna Medley-Warsoff as certified by local counsel Nicole Gloria Tortoriello for Gavin Grimm. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/19/2018. (Allen, Arenda)
September 19, 2018 Notice of Correction re 158 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eden Heilman: the filing user has been advised to resubmit 158 via email with the proper signatures, and the Clerk's Office will substitute it for the existing document. (bpet, )
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 161 , the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as follows: Ms. Gastanaga, counsel of record for Gavin Grimm, is granted permission to withdraw from this matter as counsel. The Plaintiff has consented, and remains fully represented. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/19/2018. (Allen, Arenda)
September 18, 2018 Filing 161 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gastanaga, Claire)
September 17, 2018 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 9/17/2018. Eden Heilman appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. (pro hac application pending) (lhow)
September 12, 2018 Filing 160 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gavin Grimm. (Gastanaga, Claire) Motion terminated on 9/18/18 (bpet, ).
September 11, 2018 Filing 159 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shayna Medley-Warsoff and Certification of Local Counsel Nicole Gloria Tortoriello Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6266816. by Gavin Grimm. (Tortoriello, Nicole)
September 11, 2018 Filing 158 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eden Heilman and Certification of Local Counsel Nicole Gloria Tortoriello Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6266806. by Gavin Grimm. (Tortoriello, Nicole) (Main Document 158 replaced w/ ink-signed copy on 9/19/18) (bpet, ).
September 11, 2018 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Gloria Tortoriello on behalf of Gavin Grimm (Tortoriello, Nicole)
August 2, 2018 Filing 156 Settlement Conference Order entered. Settlement conference scheduled for October 4, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States District Court in Norfolk. The parties must submit a brief memorandum of five pages or less directly to the chambers of the undersigned via facsimile by noon on October 1, 2018. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 08/02/18. (jjon)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask and filed on 7/31/18. (lhow)
July 31, 2018 Set Hearings Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2018 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, )
July 23, 2018 Refer for 16(b). (bpet)
July 20, 2018 Filing 154 ANSWER to Complaint by Gloucester County School Board.(Corrigan, David)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER: Defendant's 149 Consent Motion to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal to the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals is GRANTED. The Court's 5/22/18 148 Order is AMENDED as described in the instant Order. The parties' 151 Joint Motion to Stay All Proceedings in this Case Pending Appeal and for an Extension of Time for the School Board to File an Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed pending a ruling by the Fourth Circuit, and Defendant's deadline to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended to 10 days after the entry of such ruling. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 6/5/18. (bpet)
June 4, 2018 Filing 152 Brief in Support to 151 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in this Case Pending Appeal and for an Extension of Time for the School Board to File an Answer to Grimm's Amended Complaint filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
June 4, 2018 Filing 151 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in this Case Pending Appeal and for an Extension of Time for the School Board to File an Answer to Grimm's Amended Complaint by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 150 Brief in Support to 149 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appeal to the United States Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 149 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appeal to the United States Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying 135 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, DISMISSING as moot 118 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to contact the Magistrate Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/22/18. (bpet)
April 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 146 , the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Gail Deady, as follows: Ms. Deady, counsel of record for Plaintiff Gavin Grimm, is granted permission to withdraw from this matter as counsel. Plaintiff will continue to be represented in this matter by Claire Gastanaga of the American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Virginia, Inc., and Joshua Block and Leslie Cooper of the American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, who are all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/28/2018. (Allen, Arenda)
April 23, 2018 Filing 146 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deady, Gail)
April 23, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Guthrie Gastanaga on behalf of Gavin Grimm (Gastanaga, Claire)
March 13, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Gavin Grimm re 135 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deady, Gail) Dkt text modified on 3/13/2018 (bpet).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 137 , the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by M. Scott Fisher, as follows: Mr. Fisher, counsel of record for Defendant Gloucester County School Board, is granted permission to withdraw from this matter as counsel. Defendant will continue to be represented in this matter by Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman and David Corrigan, Jeremy Capps, and Douglas Pittman of that firm, who are also counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/9/2018. (Allen, Arenda)
March 6, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Gavin Grimm re 135 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Deady, Gail) Dkt text modified on 3/6/2018 (bpet).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER of USCA as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by Gavin Grimm. The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal. [15-2056] (bpet)
January 16, 2018 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion re 135 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Corrigan, David)
January 10, 2018 Filing 139 Memorandum in Opposition re 135 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Gavin Grimm. (Deady, Gail)
January 9, 2018 Filing 138 Brief in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Fisher, Maurice)
January 9, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION to Withdraw , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fisher, Maurice)
January 5, 2018 Filing 136 Brief in Support to 135 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Pittman, Douglas)
January 5, 2018 Filing 135 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint by Gloucester County School Board. (Pittman, Douglas)
January 5, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Edward Pittman on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Pittman, Douglas)
January 5, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Corrigan on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Corrigan, David)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING 126 Motion to Vacate, DISMISSING Requests for Relief (C) and (D). Defendant shall file an amended Motion to Dismiss within 45 days of this Order. Plaintiff shall file a Response to same within 21 days, and Defendant may file a Reply 7 days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/12/17. (bpet, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE by Gavin Grimm re 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deady, Gail)
November 20, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE by Gavin Grimm re 126 MOTION to Vacate 123 Order,,, Oral Argument (Deady, Gail)
November 17, 2017 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 MOTION to Vacate 123 Order,,, filed by Gavin Grimm. (Deady, Gail)
November 16, 2017 Filing 128 Opposition to 126 MOTION to Vacate 123 Order,,, filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER of USCA as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by Gavin Grimm. The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal. (15-2056) (bpet, )
November 2, 2017 Filing 126 MOTION to Vacate 123 Order,,, by Gavin Grimm. (Deady, Gail)
November 2, 2017 Filing 125 NOTICE by Gavin Grimm Consent to Dismissal of Requests for Relief (C) and (D) (Deady, Gail)
November 1, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE by Gavin Grimm Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deady, Gail)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER - The parties are ORDERED to file supplemental briefing on mootness pursuant to the directives herein. A ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 118 is DEFERRED pending resolution of the mootness issue. Before undertaking any jurisdictional discovery, the party seeking to undertake discovery is ORDERED to file a motion for jurisdictional discovery no later than 14 calendar days after the date of the entry of this Order. Defendant shall file its Supplemental Memorandum no later than 60 calendar days after the date of the entry of this Order. Plaintiff shall file its Response no later than 21 calendar days after service of the Defendant's Memorandum. Defendant may file a Reply no later than 7 calendar days after the service of the Response. Briefs shall not exceed 35 pages, excluding exhibits. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/26/17. (bpet, )
October 11, 2017 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Support re 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Corrigan, David)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER deferring ruling on 118 , the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; under the circumstances presented by counsel jointly in a communication to the Court, the Court shall permit Defendant to file its Reply brief on or before Wednesday, October 11, 2017. The motion will be taken under advisement as of that date. If a hearing is deemed warranted by the Court, the Court will notify counsel for purposes of scheduling the hearing after October 11, 2017. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/2/2017. (Allen, Arenda)
September 29, 2017 Filing 120 Memorandum in Opposition re 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gavin Grimm. (Deady, Gail)
September 22, 2017 Filing 119 Brief in Support to 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
September 22, 2017 Filing 118 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 116 Defendant's agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint as follows: Defendant's Motion shall be filed on or before September 22, 2017. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 08/31/2017. (Allen, Arenda)
August 30, 2017 Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed)(Corrigan, David)
August 30, 2017 Filing 115 USCA Rule 42(b) Mandate re 54 Notice of Appeal. This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42(b) takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. 15-2056 (ldab, )
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER of USCA as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by Gavin Grimm Upon consideration of the motion to dismiss this appeal pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and there appearing no opposition, the court grants the motion. Entered at the direction of Judge Niemeyer with the concurrence of Judge Duncan and Judge Floyd. 15-2056(ldab, )
August 22, 2017 Filing 113 AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS DIRECTED against Gloucester County School Board, filed by Gavin Grimm.(ecav, )
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 109 , the Consent Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint, as follows: the Clerk is DIRECTED to lodge the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; the Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or motion on or before September 15, 2017. If Defendant files a motion to dismiss, the parties' respective memoranda in support and opposition shall not exceed forty-five pages, exclusive of affidavits and supporting documentation. All briefs shall otherwise comply with the requirements of this Court's Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/22/2017. (Allen, Arenda)
August 18, 2017 Filing 111 STATUS REPORT Joint Position Statement by Gavin Grimm. (Deady, Gail)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER of USCA as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by Gavin Grimm. The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal. (15-2056) (epri)
August 11, 2017 Filing 109 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Complaint by Gavin Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deady, Gail)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re 107 Published Opinion and Order DIRECTING LIMITED REMAND [4CCA retains jurisdiction]. On August 25, 2017, each party shall submit a Response to the Position Statements. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 8/4/17. Copies distributed to all parties 8/4/17.(ldab, )
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Published Opinion and Order DIRECTING LIMITED REMAND [4CCA retains jurisdiction] re 54 Notice of Appeal attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. 15-2056 (ldab, )
June 6, 2017 Case Reassigned to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen. District Judge Robert G. Doumar no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court finds that Plaintiff has reached the legal age of majority in Virginia. Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion. ECF No. 103. The Court ORDERS the Clerk of the Court to amend the docket by substituting "Gavin Grimm" as Plaintiff for "G.G., by his next friend and mother, Deirdre Grimm" in the case caption, and further ORDERS that all future filings in this matter employ this case styling. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 5/16/2017. (bgra)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of Rebecca K. Glenberg's motion to withdraw as attorney in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 5/16/2017. (bgra)
May 4, 2017 Filing 104 Memorandum in Support re 103 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Complaint Caption filed by G. G.. (Deady, Gail)
May 4, 2017 Notice of Correction: The filing user is requested to refile the Memorandum in Support as a separate pleading, linking same back to Motion to Amend/Correct. re 103 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Complaint (bgra)
May 4, 2017 Filing 103 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Complaint by G. G.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Caption)(Deady, Gail)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER of USCA as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by G. G. The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal. (15-2056) (bgra)
May 3, 2017 Filing 101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by G. G.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Glenberg, Rebecca)
May 1, 2017 Filing 100 USCA Mandate: The judgment of this court, entered 4/7/2017, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. re 70 Notice of Appeal. (16-1733) (bgra)
April 18, 2017 Filing 99 AMENDED PUBLISHED ORDER of USCA (Copy) re 70 Notice of Appeal attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. Upon consideration of the unopposed motion to vacate preliminary injunction, the court vacates the preliminary injunction entered by the district court on June 23, 2016. Senior Judge Davis wrote a concurring opinion in which Judge Floyd joined. Entered at the direction of Judge Floyd with the concurrence of Judge Niemeyer and Senior Judge Davis. [16-1733] (bgra)
April 18, 2017 Filing 98 AMENDED ORDER of USCA as to 70 Notice of Appeal filed by Gloucester County School Board. The Court amends its order filed April 7, 2017, as follows: On page 4, line 12, Shehab is corrected to read Shihab. [16-1733] (bgra)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Continue. The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion to Continue Stay and STAYS this matter pending the Fourth Circuit's ruling on the preliminary injunction and the dismissal of the Title IX claim. ECF No. 95.Copy of Order provided all counsel of record.Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 4/13/2017. (bgra)
April 13, 2017 Filing 96 Brief in Support to 95 MOTION to Continue Stay, Unopposed filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
April 13, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION to Continue Stay, Unopposed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
April 7, 2017 Filing 94 USCA JUDGMENT as to 70 Notice of Appeal: In accordance with the decision of this court, the district court preliminary injunction entered June 23, 2016 is vacated. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (16-1733) (bgra)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PUBLISHED OPINION of USCA (Copy): Upon consideration of the unopposed motion to vacate preliminary injunction, the court vacates the preliminary injunction entered by the district court on June 23, 2016. Senior Judge Davis wrote a concurring opinion in which Judge Floyd joined. Entered at the direction of Judge Floyd with the concurrence of Judge Niemeyer and Senior Judge Davis. re 70 Notice of Appeal attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. (16-1733) (bgra)
April 7, 2017 Filing 92 SUPREME COURT REMARK--judgment remanding case received. REMANDED vacated, 04/07/2017. 70 Notice of Appeal, 54 Notice of Appeal. (15-2056) (16-1733) (bgra)
March 6, 2017 Filing 91 SUPREME COURT REMARK--order remanding case received. 03/06/2017, REMANDED vacated. re 70 Notice of Appeal, 54 Notice of Appeal : [15-2056, 16-1733] (bgra)
February 7, 2017 Filing 90 Appeal Remark re 70 Notice of Appeal : RECORD (4CCA) transmitted to Supreme Court. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273 (15-2056) (bgra)
February 7, 2017 Filing 89 Appeal Remark re 70 Notice of Appeal : RECORD requested by Supreme Court from court of appeals and district court/agency. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273 (15-2056)(bgra)
October 31, 2016 Filing 88 Supreme Court Remark re 54 Notice of Appeal : The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted limited to Questions 2 and 3 presented by the petition. (bgra)
September 2, 2016 Filing 87 SUPREME COURT REMARK: The petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on August 29, 2016 and placed on the docket September 1, 2016 as No. 16-273. re 54 Notice of Appeal. [15-2056] (ldab, )
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Stay. The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion to Stay and STAYS this matter pending the disposition of the School Board's petition for a writ of certiorari with the United States Supreme Court. ECF No. 80. Copy of Order provided to all Counsel of Record. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 8/31/2016. (bgra)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY PROTECTIVE ORDER: granting 83 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by G. G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 8/24/2016. (bgra)
August 23, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. 83 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (bgra)
August 23, 2016 Filing 84 Memorandum in Support re 83 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by G. G.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Protective Order)(Deady, Gail)
August 23, 2016 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by G. G.. (Deady, Gail)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER of USCA as to 70 Notice of Appeal filed by Gloucester County School Board : Upon consideration of the joint motion to hold appeal in abeyance pending disposition of certiorari petition, the court grants the motion. (16-1733) (bgra)
August 18, 2016 Filing 81 Brief in Support to 80 MOTION to Stay filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
August 18, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION to Stay by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
August 3, 2016 Filing 79 SUPREME COURT REMARK: The application to recall and stay the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit in case No. 152056, presented to THE CHIEF JUSTICE and by him referred to the Court, is granted and the preliminary injunction entered by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia on June 23, 2016, is hereby stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the judgment of this Court. (15-2056)(bgra)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER of USCA as to 70 : Upon consideration of submissions relative to the motion of appellant for stay pending appeal, the court denies the motion.Entered at the direction of Judge Floyd. Senior Judge Davis wrote an opinion concurring in the denial of a stay pending the filing of, and action on, a petition for certiorari. Judge Niemeyer wrote an opinion dissenting from the denial of a stay pending appeal. Notice of Appeal filed by Gloucester County School Board (16-1733) (bgra)
July 7, 2016 Jury Trial set for 1/31/2017 at 10:00 AM in Newport News Courtroom 1 before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (lbax, )
July 6, 2016 Filing 77 ANSWER to 8 Complaint by Gloucester County School Board.(Corrigan, David)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 71 Motion to Stay. This Court is bound by the Judgment of the Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals' actions in denying a rehearing en banc and a stay of its mandate indicate that it desires that its Judgment take effect immediately. The Court of Appeals itself is bound by its own prior precedents. Although Defendant has filed an appeal of the Preliminary Injunction, the Court of Appeals' prior opinion in this case will control in that appeal. This Court believes that based on the law as laid out in that opinion and the evidence submitted by declarations in this case, thePreliminary Injunction was warranted. There are no grounds for a stay. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. ECF No. 71. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 7/6/2016. (bgra)
July 1, 2016 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION to Stay re 69 Order, Pending Appeal filed by G. G.. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
June 30, 2016 Filing 74 USCA Case Number 16-1733 4CCA - Case Manager Jennifer Rice for 70 Notice of Appeal filed by Gloucester County School Board. [16-1733] (cchr)
June 30, 2016 Filing 73 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. Bench Trial set for 1/31/2017 at 10:00 AM in Newport News. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar & filed on 6/30/16. (ptom, )
June 29, 2016 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 6/29/2016 before District Judge Robert G. Doumar: Rebecca Glenberg and Joshua block present on behalf of the plaintiff; David Corrigan and Jeremy Capps present on behalf of the defendant; Comments of Court and Counsel; Court directed counsel to file a response to motion by 7/1/16. Trial date selected; Discovery schedule reviewed. Order to follow. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Heidi Jeffreys.)(lhow, )
June 28, 2016 Filing 72 Memorandum in Support re 71 MOTION to Stay re 69 Order, Pending Appeal filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
June 28, 2016 Filing 71 MOTION to Stay re 69 Order, Pending Appeal by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
June 28, 2016 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 70 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (bgra)
June 27, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 69 Order, by Gloucester County School Board. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-5050850. (Corrigan, David)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Based on the evidence submitted through declarations previously proffered for the purpose of the hearing on the Preliminary Injunction, this Court, pursuant to Title IX, hereby ORDERS that Gloucester County School Board permit the plaintiff, G.G., to use the boys' restroom at Gloucester High School until further order of this Court. Copy of Order delivered to all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 6/23/2016. (bgra)
June 23, 2016 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (lbax, )
June 17, 2016 Filing 68 USCA Mandate re 54 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 4/19/2016, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (15-2056) (bgra)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER of USCA as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by G. G. Upon consideration of the motion to stay mandate pending filing of petition for writ of certiorari, the court denies the motion. Judge Floyd and Senior Judge Davis voted to deny the motion. Judge Niemeyer voted to grant the motion. (15-2056) (bgra)
June 7, 2016 Filing 66 STAY OF MANDATE re 54 Notice of Appeal : Under Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(1), the timely filing of a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or the timely filing of a motion to stay the mandate stays the mandate until the court has ruled on the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or motion to stay. In accordance with Rule 41(d)(1), the mandate is stayed pending further order of this court. (15-2056) (bgra)
May 31, 2016 Filing 65 PUBLISHED ORDER of USCA : denying Motion for rehearing en banc 54 Notice of Appeal filed by G. G. (15-2056) (bgra)
May 3, 2016 Filing 64 STAY OF MANDATE: Under Fed. R. App. P. 41(d)(1), the timely filing of a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or the timely filing of a motion to stay the mandate stays the mandate until the court has ruled on the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc or motion to stay. In accordance with Rule 41(d)(1), the mandate is stayed pending further order of this court. as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by G.G. (cchr)
April 19, 2016 Filing 63 USCA JUDGMENT as to 54 Notice of Appeal filed by G. G.: In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is reversed in part and vacated in part. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision.This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (15-2056) (bgra)
April 19, 2016 Filing 62 Published Opinion of USCA (Copy): Reversed in part, Vacated in part, and Remanded. re 54 Notice of Appeal attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. (15-2056) (bgra)
October 5, 2015 Filing 61 Declaration re 10 Declaration - Corrected by G. G.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Deady, Gail)
October 5, 2015 Filing 60 Declaration re 9 Declaration - Corrected by G. G.. (Deady, Gail)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Copies of Redacted Exhibits. The corrected copies attached to the Motion (ECF Nos. 58-1 and 58-2) may be filed as substitutes for the redacted Declarations of G.G. and Dr. Randi Ettner originally filed in support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. 9 and 10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on October 1, 2015. (Miller, Douglas)
September 23, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. 58 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copies of Redacted Documents (bgra)
September 22, 2015 Filing 58 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copies of Redacted Documents by G. G.. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Decl. of G.G., # 2 Corrected Decl. of Dr. Ettner)(Deady, Gail)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION - the Court GRANTED the Motion to Dismiss as to Count II, Plaintiff's claim under Title IX, and DENIED the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 9/17/15. (afar)
September 10, 2015 Filing 56 USCA Case Number 15-2056 4CCA Case Manager Jennifer Rice for 54 Notice of Appeal filed by G. G. (15-2056) (bgra)
September 9, 2015 Filing 55 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 54 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal)(bgra)
September 8, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 53 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by G. G.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-4626161. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - DENIES 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 9/4/15. (afar)
September 3, 2015 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that G.G.'s identifying information, as shownon page fifteen (15) of the transcript of the June 27. 2015 hearing, lines fourteen (14). fifteen (15), sixteen (16). and eighteen (18), shall be under seal. The Court further ORDERS that this identifying information shall not be released by the Clerk or any party or individual without a specific order of the Court. Copy of Order provided to all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 7/31/2015. (bgra)
July 31, 2015 Filing 50 Redacted Version of 48 Transcript (afar)
July 30, 2015 Filing 49 Transcript Redaction Request re 48 Transcript,,, by attorney Rebecca Kim Glenberg. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
July 27, 2015 Filing 47 Motion Hearing before District Judge Robert G. Doumar held on 7/27/2015 re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by G.G., 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gloucester County School Board. Appearances: Rebecca K. Glenberg, Gail Deady, Leslie J. Cooper and Joshua A. Block appeared for the Plaintiff. David P. Corrigan and Jeremy D. Capps appeared for the Defendant. Clare P. Wuerker and Victoria Lill appeared on behalf of the Interested Party, The United States. Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. The Court DISMISSED the Title IX claim but takes the remainder of the motions under advisement. The Court will issue a written opinion as to its findings. The Defendants will have 21 days from the filing of the Court's opinion to file an answer. The case will be referred for scheduling at that time. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Heidi Jeffreys, OCR.)(lbax, )
July 22, 2015 Filing 46 Reply to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , REPLY to Response to Motion , Reply filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
July 17, 2015 Reset Hearing as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , and Motions. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2015 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (Courtroom change from Grand Jury Room to Mag Courtroom 1) (ptom, )
July 17, 2015 Reset Hearing as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , and Motions :. Motion Hearing reset for 7/27/2015 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (ptom, )
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: This Court will hear the fully briefed Motion to Dismiss before it will consider any other motions. The hearing set on July 20, 2015, is hereby VACATED, and no motions will be heard at that time. Instead, all motions then pending and responded to will be heard on July 27, 2015 at11:00 a.m. in this Court. Copies distributed to all counsel of record. re 36 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 7/16/2015. (bgra)
July 16, 2015 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by G. G.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Tudor Opinion, # 2 Exhibit B - Tudor Intervenor Complaint)(Glenberg, Rebecca)
July 16, 2015 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Service re 41 Reply, Reply to Response to Motion by Gail Marie Deady on behalf of G. G. (Deady, Gail)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Pro hac vice for Victoria Lill as to The United States. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 7/15/15. (tlev, )
July 13, 2015 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. re 41 Reply to Response to Motion (bgra)
July 13, 2015 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by G. G.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deady, Gail)
July 10, 2015 Filing 40 Reply to Motion re 36 MOTION for Hearing re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
July 10, 2015 Filing 39 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Victoria Lill and Certification of Local Counsel Clare P. Wuerker by The United States. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application)(Wuerker, Clare)
July 8, 2015 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Hearing re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by G. G.. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
July 8, 2015 Filing 37 Brief in Support to 36 MOTION for Hearing (Corrigan, David) Modified docket text on 7/8/2015 (ccol); Modified docket text to correct linkage to motion on 7/10/2015 (bgra).
July 8, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Hearing re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David) Mo
July 7, 2015 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Service re 32 Brief in Support by David P. Corrigan on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Corrigan, David)
July 7, 2015 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Service re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by David P. Corrigan on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Corrigan, David)
July 7, 2015 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Service re 30 Opposition by David P. Corrigan on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Corrigan, David)
July 7, 2015 Filing 32 Brief in Support to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Corrigan, David)
July 7, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gloucester County School Board. (Corrigan, David)
July 7, 2015 Filing 30 Opposition to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A -, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Corrigan, David)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Response due July 7, 2015.Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on 6/30/2015. (bgra)
June 30, 2015 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Tommy E. Miller. 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (bgra)
June 30, 2015 Motion Hearing as to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 7/20/2015 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (lbax, )
June 29, 2015 Filing 28 Statement of Interest of The United States by The United States. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(bgra)
June 29, 2015 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by G. G.. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
June 29, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Gloucester County School Board. (Fisher, Maurice)
June 29, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Fisher, Maurice)
June 29, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Capps on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Capps, Jeremy)
June 29, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Corrigan on behalf of Gloucester County School Board (Corrigan, David)
June 29, 2015 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service by G. G. (bgra, ).
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Pro hac vice for Leslie Jill Cooper as to G. G.. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 6/23/15. (tlev, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Joshua Abraham Block as to G. G.. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 6/23/15. (tlev, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 19 Request for Hearing by G. G. re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Deady, Gail)
June 18, 2015 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by G. G.. (Deady, Gail)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to File a brief in excess of thirty pages in support of the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on 6/17/2015. (Miller, Tommy)
June 17, 2015 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Jill Cooper and Certification of Local Counsel Rebecca Kim Glenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4501506. by G. G.. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
June 17, 2015 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Abraham Block and Certification of Local Counsel Rebecca Kim Glenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-4501488. by G. G.. (Glenberg, Rebecca)
June 16, 2015 Filing 14 One Summons, with service copy, Issued as to Gloucester County School Board. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Sealed ORDER Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 6/15/2015. (epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages re 11 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Leave to File Brief in excess of thirty pages filed by G. G. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Memorandum of law in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Leave to File Brief in excess of thirty pages by G. G. (epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by G. G. (epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 10 Expert Declaration of Randi Ettner, Ph.D Preliminary Statement re 8 Complaint (epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 9 Declaration of G. G. re 8 Complaint (epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 8 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against Gloucester County School Board ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683027454.), filed by G. G. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet (Redacted), # 2 Letter (Redacted), # 3 Receipt)(epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 7 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages re 5 SEALED PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, by G. G 6 SEALED PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF THIRTY PAGES by G. G. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Memorandum of law in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 6 SEALED PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF THIRTY PAGES by G. G. (epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 5 SEALED PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, by G. G. (epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 4 Sealed Expert Declaration of Randi Ettner, Ph.D. re 2 Sealed Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 3 Sealed Declaration of G.G. Document re 2 Sealed Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(epri)
June 11, 2015 Filing 2 Sealed Complaint per 1 Order entered on 6.16.15. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Letter, # 4 Receipt) (epri).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.G. v. Gloucester County School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. G.
Represented By: Joshua Abraham Block
Represented By: Leslie Jill Cooper
Represented By: Gail Marie Deady
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Glenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloucester County School Board
Represented By: Jeremy David Capps
Represented By: David P. Corrigan
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?