Dickson v. Former FBI Director James B. Comey Jr. et al
Plaintiff: John M. Dickson, Jr.
Defendant: Northampton Community Center, Ms. Lisa Taylor, John/Jane Doe (s) Employees, Nurse Doe Johnson of Eastern State Hospital, McDonals's Inc. John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees), Dr. Gregory Briscoe, MD Psychiatry, Mr. Korey Ballard (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., Dr. Charles Erdman, Walmart Jane Doe (employees), Derek Curran, Mr. John E. Smith (Owner) JSI FOODS, INC., Doctor Hasmukh Vyas of Eastern State Hospital, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. J. Dye, City of Hampton Virginia Police, Social Worker, Mr. Michael Frazier of Eastern State Hospital, Director Matthew Stearn, City of Hampton Virginia police department, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe(s), John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Farm Fresh Supermarkets, Former Chief of Police of the City of Newport News Virginia Mr. Richard W. Myers, Marissa Claiborne employee, Former FBI Director James B. Comey Jr., John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., Farm Fresh Supermarkets Incorporated, City of Hampton Virginia police Corporal Jane Doe, Barbara Robinson employee, Mrs. Deja Vinston (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., Mr. Scott Rutland, Tiffany Thompson DNP of Eastern State Hospital, Ms. Shanita Smith employee, Regina O'Halloran, City of Hampton Virginia, FBI Agent Mrs. /Ms. Katherine Andrews, City of Hampton Virginia police department records department, Walmart Corporation, City of Newport News Virginia, Ms. Melaney Cox, City of Newport News Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe (s), Mr. Mrs. / Ms. John, Jane Doe employee(s), Ms. Najeah Easmell, Jane Doe psychologist of Eastern State Hospital, Chief of Police Mr. Terry L. Sult for the City of Hampton Virginia, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer Mr. R. Foote, HELP program - Volunteers John/Jane Doe(s), FBI Newport News field office, John/Jane Doe(s) Teachnical and field agent(s), Hope In Home Care Personal Care Division, Annalisa Schaeperkoetter, City of Hampton Virginia Police lieutenant. F. Edmonds, City of Hampton Virginia police officer Mr. Doe Squire and City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. Jonathan Donker
Case Number: 4:2018cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Newport News Office
County: Hampton City
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 USCA Case Number 19-1430 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Tyree Herb for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Dickson, Jr.(19-1430) (epri, )
April 18, 2019 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #14 Notice of Appeal (epri, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Letter)(epri, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, ECF No. 11, is DENIED. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 3.19.19. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 3/19/2019. (epri, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT FOR RELIEF OF THE JUDGEMENT AND ORDER OF THE COURT DATED FEBRUARY 13th 2018 HAVING DISMISSED JOHN M. DICKSON, JR VS. FORMER FBI DIRECTOR JAMES B. COMEY ET,. AL, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA, NEWPORT NEWS DIVISION, CIVIL ACTION NO: 4:18-CV-00002. filed by John M. Dickson, Jr. (epri, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2019: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, #6 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #10 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #11 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 6 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 6 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #17 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #18 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #19 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #20 Exhibit 9 Part 3, #21 Exhibit 10 Part 1, #22 Exhibit 10 Part 2, #23 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #24 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #25 Exhibit 11 Part 3, #26 Exhibit 12 Part 1, #27 Exhibit 12 Part 2, #28 Exhibit 13, #29 Exhibit 14 Part 1, #30 Exhibit 14 Part 2, #31 Exhibit 14 Part 3, #32 Exhibit 14 Part 4, #33 Exhibit 14 Part 5, #34 Exhibit 15 Part 1, #35 Exhibit 15 Part 2, #36 Exhibit 16 #37 Exhibit Disc Audio & Visual files) (epri, ).
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF OF THE JUDGEMENT AND ORDER OF THE COURT DATED FEBRUARY 13 2018 HAVING DISMISSED JOHN M. DICKSON, JR VS. FORMER FBI DIRECTOR JAMES B. COMEY ET,. AL, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA, NEWPORT NEWS DIVISION, CIVIL ACTION NO: 4:18-CV-00002. by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 10 USCA Mandate re #5 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of this court, entered 05/18/2018, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (18-1299) (epri)
May 18, 2018 Filing 9 USCA JUDGMENT as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Dickson, Jr. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is affirmed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (18-1299) (epri)
May 18, 2018 Filing 8 Opinion of USCA (Copy) AFFIRMED re #5 Notice of Appeal. Attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. Affirmed by unpublished per curiam opinion. (18-1299) (epri)
March 16, 2018 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 18-1299 4CCA Case Mangager - Cyndi Halupa - for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by John M. Dickson, Jr.(18-1299) (epri)
March 15, 2018 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #5 Notice of Appeal (epri)
March 15, 2018 Filing 6 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #5 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Letter)(epri)
March 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Dismissal Order by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri)
February 13, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2018.(epri)
February 13, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Dr. Gregory Briscoe, MD Psychiatry, Chief of Police Mr. Terry L. Sult for the City of Hampton Virginia, City of Hampton Virginia, City of Hampton Virginia Police, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer Mr. R. Foote, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. J. Dye, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. Jonathan Donker, City of Hampton Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe(s), City of Hampton Virginia Police lieutenant. F. Edmonds, City of Hampton Virginia police Corporal Jane Doe, City of Hampton Virginia police department, City of Hampton Virginia police department records department, City of Hampton Virginia police officer Mr. Doe Squire, City of Newport News Virginia, City of Newport News Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe (s), Marissa Claiborne employee, Ms. Melaney Cox, Derek Curran, Director Matthew Stearn, Doctor Hasmukh Vyas of Eastern State Hospital, Dr. Charles Erdman, FBI Agent Mrs. /Ms. Katherine Andrews, FBI Newport News field office, John/Jane Doe(s) Teachnical and field agent(s), Farm Fresh Supermarkets Incorporated, Former Chief of Police of the City of Newport News Virginia Mr. Richard W. Myers, Former FBI Director James B. Comey Jr., HELP program - Volunteers John/Jane Doe(s), Hope In Home Care Personal Care Division, Jane Doe psychologist of Eastern State Hospital, John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Farm Fresh Supermarkets, John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., John/Jane Doe (s) Employees(In their individual capacities, as persons acting under Color of State Law ), McDonals's Inc. John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees), Mr. John E. Smith (Owner) JSI FOODS, INC., Mr. Korey Ballard (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., Mr. Mrs. / Ms. John, Jane Doe employee(s), Mrs. Deja Vinston (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc., Ms. Lisa Taylor, Ms. Najeah Easmell, Northampton Community Center, Nurse Doe Johnson of Eastern State Hospital, Regina O'Halloran, Barbara Robinson employee, Scott Rutland, Annalisa Schaeperkoetter, Shanita Smith employee, Social Worker, Mr. Michael Frazier of Eastern State Hospital, Tiffany Thompson DNP of Eastern State Hospital, Walmart Corporation, Walmart Jane Doe (employees), filed by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2, #2 Complaint Part 3, #3 Complaint Part 4, #4 Letter)(epri)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISMISSAL ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's IFP Motion, ECF No. 1, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff on 2.13.18 as DIRECTED. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 2/13/2018. (epri)
January 3, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John M. Dickson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint Part 1, #2 Proposed Complaint Part 2, #3 Proposed Complaint Part 3, #4 Proposed Complaint Part 4, #5 Letter)(epri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickson v. Former FBI Director James B. Comey Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northampton Community Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Lisa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (s) Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Doe Johnson of Eastern State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonals's Inc. John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gregory Briscoe, MD Psychiatry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Korey Ballard (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Charles Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Jane Doe (employees)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John E. Smith (Owner) JSI FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Hasmukh Vyas of Eastern State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. J. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Worker, Mr. Michael Frazier of Eastern State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Matthew Stearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia police department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Farm Fresh Supermarkets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former Chief of Police of the City of Newport News Virginia Mr. Richard W. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Claiborne employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former FBI Director James B. Comey Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (s) (Employees) of Octapharma Plasma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Fresh Supermarkets Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia police Corporal Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Robinson employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Deja Vinston (employee) of Octapharma Plasma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Scott Rutland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Thompson DNP of Eastern State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Shanita Smith employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI Agent Mrs. /Ms. Katherine Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia police department records department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newport News Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Melaney Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Newport News Virginia Police Officers John/Jane Doe (s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mrs. / Ms. John, Jane Doe employee(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Najeah Easmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe psychologist of Eastern State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Mr. Terry L. Sult for the City of Hampton Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer Mr. R. Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HELP program - Volunteers John/Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI Newport News field office, John/Jane Doe(s) Teachnical and field agent(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope In Home Care Personal Care Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annalisa Schaeperkoetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia Police lieutenant. F. Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia police officer Mr. Doe Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hampton Virginia Police Officer. Jonathan Donker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Dickson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?