County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company v. Blue Construction LLC et al

Plaintiff: County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company
Defendant: Blue Construction LLC and Timoteo Zuniga
Case Number: 4:2018cv00091
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Newport News Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Timoteo Zuniga.(clou )
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time. The Clerk is directed to docket attachment 1 to ECF No. 13 as Defendant Zuniga's Answer, and to Strike ECF No. 12 as improperly filed without leave of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/31/2018. (Leonard, Lawrence)
August 27, 2018 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference reset for 9/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. (lbax, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by Blue Construction LLC. (Voyles, Shawn)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2018 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/24/18. (lbax, )
August 24, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #13 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time (clou )
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 Response to #13 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by Timoteo Zuniga. (Kennedy, Kevin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Timoteo Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Kennedy, Kevin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Timoteo Zuniga.(Kennedy, Kevin) Modified on 8/31/2018 - Stricken from the record pursuant to ECF No. 18 this document was improperly filed without leave of Court (clou ).
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Blue Construction LLC. (Voyles, Shawn)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 CROSSCLAIM against Timoteo Zuniga, CROSSCLAIM against Timoteo Zuniga, filed by Blue Construction LLC.(Voyles, Shawn)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Blue Construction LLC.(Voyles, Shawn)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Blue Construction LLC. (Voyles, Shawn)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Blue Construction LLC. (Voyles, Shawn)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service in compliance with Va. Code 8.01-296(2)(b) by David Caldwell Hartnett on behalf of County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company (Hartnett, David)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company. Blue Construction LLC served on 8/21/2018. (clou )
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company. Timoteo Zuniga served on 7/24/2018. (jjon)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Blue Construction LLC, Timoteo Zuniga. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company. (epri)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Construction LLC, Timoteo Zuniga ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6187828.), filed by County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(epri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company v. Blue Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Construction LLC
Represented By: Shawn Ashley Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timoteo Zuniga
Represented By: Kevin Michael Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Mutual Insurance Company as successor to Middlesex Mutual Assurance Company
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?