Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Rosa Little, Joseph Connor Hennessey and Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00096
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rosa Little (afar)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Mumford, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Responsive pleadings to the complaint have not been filed by defendant Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Counsel is requested to file a status report within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleadingthat conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures. A party seeking reasonable extension of time to respond to the complaint must obtain court approvalby filing an appropriate motion with a proposed order. If a party is in default, plaintiff's counsel may file a request for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Therequest for entry of default should be in the form of a pleading which conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures.(afar)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company by Joseph Connor Hennessey.(Casey, Brian)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019 (Mumford, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company Rosa Little served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019 (Mumford, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company Joseph Connor Hennessey served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019 (Mumford, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Joseph Connor Hennessey, Rosa Little, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
October 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Sinclair Willis on behalf of Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company (Willis, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Joseph Connor Hennessey by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Mumford, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Rosa Little by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Mumford, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Mumford, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Mumford, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6872431.), filed by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mumford, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Connor Hennessey
Represented By: Brian Nelson Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Sinclair Willis
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?