Laliemthavixay v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda Laliemthavixay
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, WebBank and Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00111
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 12/13/2019. (clou )
December 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask. #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint (clou )
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gettings, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gettings, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement regarding Defendant WebBank by Linda Laliemthavixay (Yao, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Theseus Danger Schulze on behalf of Linda Laliemthavixay (Schulze, Theseus)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Four (4) Summonses Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Kohls Department Stores, Inc., WebBank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Kohl's Department Store Inc. by Linda Laliemthavixay. (Yao, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons WebBank by Linda Laliemthavixay. (Yao, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Wells Fargo Bank, N.A by Linda Laliemthavixay. (Yao, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC by Linda Laliemthavixay. (Yao, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6923708.), filed by Linda Laliemthavixay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yao, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laliemthavixay v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A
Represented By: David Michael Gettings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohls Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Laliemthavixay
Represented By: Matthew J. Yao
Represented By: Theseus Danger Schulze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?