Davis v. Davis Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas G. Davis
Defendant: Tom Bendetti, Peter Ill, Davis Media, LLC doing business as Local Voice Media, Michael Dufort, E. Jack Stewart and C/O Corporation Service Company
Counter Claimant: Davis Media, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00147
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
2 Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 11) and Counterclaim (ECF No. 13) is hereby extended to January 8,2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 11/13/20. (afar)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/12/20. (bpet, )
November 12, 2020 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #18 MOTION for Extension Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. (bpet, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Faraci, Stephen)
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Substitution by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Faraci, Stephen)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Plaintiff to respond to the #11 Motion to Dismiss and the #14 Counterclaim by 11/13/2020; Defendant may reply re #11 by 12/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 10/30/20. (bpet, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending time)(Strickland, Elyse)
October 19, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge Roderick C. Young. District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen no longer assigned to the case. (bpet, )
October 19, 2020 Notice of Correction re #14 Counterclaim: The filing user has been advised that a Counterclaim does not need to be filed separately from the Answer when they are both contained in a single document. The Clerk's Office will remove the duplicative parties created by this docket entry. (bpet, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas G. Davis, COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas G. Davis, filed by Davis Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spain, Brett)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas G. Davis by Davis Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spain, Brett)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott C. Paton)(Spain, Brett)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Spain, Brett)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 , a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Massaroni as certified by local counsel Brett A. Spain for Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, and E. Jack Stewart. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/02/2020. (Allen, Arenda)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 , a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Christopher Paton as certified by local counsel Brett A. Spain for Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/02/2020. (Allen, Arenda)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Massaroni and Certification of Local Counsel Brett A. Spain Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7420220. by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Spain, Brett)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Christopher Paton and Certification of Local Counsel Brett A. Spain Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7420206. by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Spain, Brett)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File; all defendants to respond to the Complaint by 10/16/20. Order entered AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 9/24/20. (bpet, )
September 23, 2020 SetDeadlines as to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 12:30 PM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order)(Spain, Brett)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark. (epri, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Davis Media, LLC. (Spain, Brett)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7406437.), filed by Peter Ill, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Tom Bendetti, E. Jack Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Spain, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Davis Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bendetti
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Represented By: Scott Christopher Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ill
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Represented By: Scott Christopher Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Media, LLC doing business as Local Voice Media
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Represented By: Scott Christopher Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dufort
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Represented By: Scott Christopher Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Jack Stewart
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Represented By: Scott Christopher Paton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Corporation Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G. Davis
Represented By: Elyse L. Strickland
Represented By: David Lee Amos
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Faraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Davis Media, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Massaroni
Represented By: Scott Christopher Paton
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?