AXA Insurance Co. v. Fagioli, Inc
Plaintiff: AXA Insurance Co. and AXA Insurance Company
Defendant: Fagioli, Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00076
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AXA Insurance Company. (Habib, Ameet)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice for James Papadakis as to AXA Insurance Co. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 2/1/22. (tlev, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/15/2022 at 10:30 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial is set for 7/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on February 1, 2022. (sche)
February 1, 2022 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 2/1/2022. (sche)
January 31, 2022 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Papadakis and Certification of Local Counsel Adam M. Carroll Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8221419. by AXA Insurance Co.. (Carroll, Adam)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2022 at 09:30 AM by conference call to be initiated by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on January 14, 2022. (sche)
January 3, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Fagioli, Inc. (bpet, )
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time. ORDERED that the Answer included as an Exhibit to ECF #12 be deemed a timely responsive pleading in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 1/3/22; nunc pro tunc 12/31/21. (bpet, )
January 3, 2022 Refer for 16(b). (bpet, )
January 3, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Leonard. #11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time on or Before December 31, 2021 (tamarm, )
December 31, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Fagioli, Inc. (Ottinger, Richard)
December 31, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time on or Before December 31, 2021 filed by Fagioli, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Ottinger, Richard)
December 31, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time on or Before December 31, 2021 by Fagioli, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ottinger, Richard)
December 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas Chappell on behalf of Fagioli, Inc (Chappell, William)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AXA Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Habib, Ameet)
November 16, 2021 Notice of Correction re #8 Summons Returned Executed. The Summons should have been uploaded along with the Affidavit. Please refile.(tamarm, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AXA Insurance Co. Fagioli, Inc served on 11/9/2021, answer due 11/30/2021 (Habib, Ameet)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Fagioli, Inc, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Motions Procedures)(tamarm, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by AXA Insurance Co.. (Habib, Ameet)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - service is to be made within 45 days. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 10/12/2021. (tamarm, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 Response to Show Cause Order filed by AXA Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Habib, Ameet)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE ORDER - Plaintiff is to show cause, if any, why this civil action should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Show Cause Response due by 10/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 9/21/2021. (tamarm, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by AXA Insurance Co. re #1 Complaint Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Habib, Ameet)
June 16, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. This document was the party's first appearance which should have been accompanied by a financial disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Failure to file the financial disclosure statement within this period of time will subject #1 to be stricken from the record. (epri, )
June 15, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by AXA Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Habib, Ameet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXA Insurance Co. v. Fagioli, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA Insurance Co.
Represented By: Ameet I Habib
Represented By: Adam Michael Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Michael Carroll
Represented By: Ameet I Habib
Represented By: James Papadakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fagioli, Inc
Represented By: Richard Hooper Ottinger
Represented By: William Thomas Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?