Barnes-Baymon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Toni L Barnes-Baymon
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00079
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toni L Barnes-Baymon. Andrew M Saul served on 6/30/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Gillikin, Robert)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate Reporting Service by Andrew M Saul. Andrew M Saul served on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Hartlieb, Garry)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Andrew M Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons All 3 Proposed Summonses by Toni L Barnes-Baymon. (Gillikin, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7846457.), filed by Toni L Barnes-Baymon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert)
June 17, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes-Baymon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni L Barnes-Baymon
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?