Campbell v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Virginia Jean Campbell
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00130
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/30/2021, answer due 1/31/2022 (tamarm, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General. (tamarm, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration. (tamarm, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi and delivered to USM for service. (Attachments: #1 Motions Procedures, #2 USM 285 Forms)(tamarm, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue summons, and the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon the defendant(s), as directed by the plaintiff. All cost of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/9/2021. (tamarm, )
October 13, 2021 Notice of Correction re #6 NOTICE/Praecipe to Issue Summonses. There is a pending Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis under consideration. No summons can be issued until there is a ruling on the IFP motion. (tamarm, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Virginia Jean Campbell Praecipe to Issue Summonses (Gillikin, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Representation by Virginia Jean Campbell (Gillikin, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wayne Gillikin, II on behalf of Virginia Jean Campbell (Gillikin, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION In Forma Pauperis re #1 Complaint by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gillikin, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons All 3 Proposed Summonses with Form 285s by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Form 285s)(Gillikin, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Jean Campbell
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?