Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company v. Legynd Transportation, LLC
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Legynd Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00122
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant, Legynd Transportation, LLC, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for failure to file an answer in this action. This default is noted on the Court's docket this date. (epri, )
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company of Mailing (Robey, Daniel)
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Entry of Default as to by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
January 9, 2023 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
January 9, 2023 Filing 6 Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel for answer status (epri, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company Legynd Transportation, LLC served on 12/16/2022, answer due 1/6/2023 (Robey, Daniel)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Legynd Transportation, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8671553.), filed by Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robey, Daniel)
November 21, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company v. Legynd Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalgamated Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legynd Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?