Adkins v. EQT Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust and Eva Mae Adkins
Defendant: EQT Corporation and EQT Production Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00041
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Filing 358 Declaration re #356 MOTION to Certify Class by Eva Mae Adkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I (Part 1 of 5), #10 Exhibit I (Part 2 of 5), #11 Exhibit I (Part 3 of 5), #12 Exhibit I (Part 4 of 5), #13 Exhibit I (Part 5 of 5), #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O)(Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 357 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #356 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 356 MOTION to Certify Class by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #354 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/19/15. (flc)
March 16, 2015 Filing 354 MOTION for Extension of Time to File renewed Motion for Class Certification / Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - House Bill 2058, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffett, Larry)
March 4, 2015 Filing 353 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Scheduling Conference held on 2/27/15 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2015. (bad)
March 2, 2015 Filing 352 NOTICE of Hearing:Renewed Motions for Class Certification Hearing set for 9/8/2015 thru 9/10/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/2/15. (flc)
February 27, 2015 Filing 349 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Scheduling Conference held on 2/27/2015. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER in re: Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/18/15. (flc)
February 18, 2015 Filing 347 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference via Teleconference set for 2/27/2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 OPINION and ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/6/15. (ejs)
November 18, 2014 Filing 345 Response re #343 Brief/Memorandum / REPLY CONCERNING ADDITIONAL PRE-CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 11, 2014 Filing 344 Response re #343 Brief/Memorandum Concerning Additional Pre-Certification Discovery. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 28, 2014 Filing 343 Brief/Memorandum Plaintiffs' Submission Concerning Pre-Certification Discovery. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER that the plaintiff must file within 14 days the specific subject matter and method of any further discovery requested as to class certification, taking into account (1) the importance of any such discovery and (2) whether its burden and expense on the opposing party outweighs its likely benefits. The opposing party must respond within 14 days of service and the plaintiff may reply within 7 days of service. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/14/14. (ejs)
October 2, 2014 Filing 341 USCA ORDER directing petitioners to pay $505.00 filing fee to the district court for filing and docketing the appeal when the petition for permission to appeal was granted.(ejs)
September 29, 2014 Filing 340 Letter for Response to letters from CNX and EQT this relates to Docket No. 337 by Eva Mae Adkins (Seltz, Daniel)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER denying without prejudice to later assertion #307 Motion for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions; denying #317 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #319 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/26/14. (flc)
September 26, 2014 Filing 338 MANDATE by Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals filed on 9/26/14. (flc)
September 22, 2014 Filing 337 Letter for response to September 15, 2014 letter from plaintiffs by EQT Production Company (Massie, Wade)
September 16, 2014 Filing 336 Memorandum to Counsel setting deadline for defendants to reply to #335 Letter to Judge Jones by September 22, 2014. (ejs)
September 15, 2014 Filing 335 Letter for Judge Jones dated 9-15-2014 Re Scheduling Issues by Eva Mae Adkins (Seltz, Daniel)
August 27, 2014 Filing 334 Letter to Judge Jones from David Stellings (ejs)
August 19, 2014 Filing 333 USCA Judgment entered on 8/19/14; VACATED and REMANDED District Court's decision. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Judgment)(flc)
August 19, 2014 Filing 332 USCA Memorandum Opinion decided on 8/19/14.(flc)
May 5, 2014 Filing 331 REPLY to Response to Motion re #319 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John A. Bergonzi)(Massie, Wade)
May 5, 2014 Filing 330 REPLY to Response to Motion re #317 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
April 23, 2014 Filing 329 RESPONSE in Opposition re #317 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims . filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2014 Filing 328 AFFIDAVIT re #319 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations by Eva Mae Adkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2014 Filing 327 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #319 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations . filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Plaintiff's Responses due by 4/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/21/14. (ejs)
April 18, 2014 Filing 325 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 324 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #307 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions Declaration of Tore Hodne. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 323 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #307 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions Declaration of Shannon D. Wheatman. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 322 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #307 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions by Larry D. Moffett. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 321 RESPONSE to Motion re #307 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions . filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2014 Filing 320 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #319 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adair's Supplemental Responses to Interrogtories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Adair's Second Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Adkins's Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 5 - Adkins Dep. Ex. 12)(Massie, Wade)
April 4, 2014 Filing 319 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
April 4, 2014 Filing 318 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #317 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oil and Gas Lease dated October 4, 1989, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adair's Second Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Adkins' Responses to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kiser's Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 5 - Adair's Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories)(Massie, Wade)
April 4, 2014 Filing 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #315 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/19/14. (flc)
March 19, 2014 Filing 315 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #314 Response to Motion, by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaver, Jennifer) Modified on 3/19/2014 to remove docket text(flc).
March 14, 2014 Filing 314 RESPONSE to Motion re #307 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Publication Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Individual Notice for Adkins, #3 Exhibit 3 - Individual Notice for Adair, Kiser, Hale and Addison)(Massie, Wade)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER denying #308 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/12/2014. (lml)
March 12, 2014 Filing 312 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2014 re #308 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals filed by EQT Production Company. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
March 10, 2014 Filing 311 RESPONSE in Opposition re #308 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals Opposition to Second Motion to Stay Proceedings. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 10, 2014 Filing 310 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion via Teleconference(No Interpreter requested) #308 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. *COURT REPORTER REQUIRED*(flc)
March 7, 2014 Filing 309 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #308 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 7, 2014 Filing 308 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 28, 2014 Filing 307 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wheatman Declaration)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2013 Filing 306 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing set for 1/6/2014 at 2:30 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
November 19, 2013 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 10/16/13 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2014. (bad)
November 14, 2013 Filing 304 USCA Order consolidating cases as noted.(flc)
November 12, 2013 Filing 303 USCA Order denying motion for stay pending appeal.(flc)
October 21, 2013 Filing 302 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on 10/16/2013 reported by Court Reporter Bridget Dickert before Judge Jones. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 10/28/2013. (Massie, Wade)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER denying #293 Motion to Stay; and finding as moot #295 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedules on the Motions for Summary Judgment] by EQT Production Company.. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/17/13. (ejs)
October 16, 2013 Filing 299 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2013 re #295 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedules on the Motions for Summary Judgment] filed by EQT Production Company, #293 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal filed by EQT Production Company. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
October 16, 2013 Filing 297 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion held on 9/12/13 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2014. (bad)
October 15, 2013 Filing 296 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion via Teleconference (No Interpreter requested) #295 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedules on the Motions for Summary Judgment], #293 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal : Motion Hearing via Teleconference set for 10/16/2013 at 4:00 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. *COURT REPORTER REQUIRED*(flc)
October 14, 2013 Filing 295 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedules on the Motions for Summary Judgment] by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
October 11, 2013 Filing 298 Notification by 4CCA to the District Court in re: Petition for Permission to Appeal case to 4CCA; Appellate Case No.:13-415; Case Manager: Cathy Poulsen (Attachments: #1 Petition for permission to appeal to 4CCA, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(lml)
October 11, 2013 Filing 294 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #293 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 11, 2013 Filing 293 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade) Modified on 10/15/2013 to remove referral text from docket entry(flc).
October 10, 2013 Filing 292 Letter Re: Mediation by Eva Mae Adkins (ejs) Modified on 10/15/2013 to remove non applicable parties (lml).
October 4, 2013 Filing 291 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on 9/12/13 reported by Court Reporter Bridget Dickert before Judge James P. Jones. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 10/11/2013. (Massie, Wade)
October 3, 2013 Filing 290 Letter from Judge Sargent to counsel regarding her availability for settlement conference. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER denying #273 Objection; Granting #274 Objection to #266 Report and Recommendations; Adopting #266 Report and Recommendations re #71 Motion to Certify Class; Granting #71 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/30/2013. (lml)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #250 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/27/13. (ejs)
September 27, 2013 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/27/13. (ejs)
September 16, 2013 Filing 286 Letter regarding proposed class definitions by Eva Mae Adkins (Seltz, Daniel)
September 16, 2013 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lindsey Shaver on behalf of Eva Mae Adkins (Shaver, Jennifer)
September 12, 2013 Filing 284 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Oral Argument Hearing held on 9/12/2013. Matters were taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert, OCR.) (flc)
August 30, 2013 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2013 before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judy Webb, Telephone number 540-857-5100 X 5333/judyw@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2013. (jw)
August 13, 2013 Filing 282 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #278 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Eva Mae Adkins.(Barrett, Charles)
July 31, 2013 Filing 281 Response re #273 Objection to Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge on the Motions for Class Certification. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 31, 2013 Filing 280 Response re #266 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett, #2 Lease 1 for Exhibit 1, #3 Lease 2 for Exhibit 1, #4 Lease 3 for Exhibit 1, #5 Lease 4 for Exhbit 1, #6 Lease 5 for Exhibit 1, #7 Lease 6 for Exhibit 1, #8 Lease 7 for Exhibit 1, #9 Lease 8 for Exhibit 1, #10 Lease 9 for Exhibit 1, #11 Lease 10 for Exhibit 1, #12 Lease 11 for Exhibit 1, #13 Lease 12 for Exhibit 1)(Massie, Wade)
July 31, 2013 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on July 18, 2013 reported by Court Reporter Ella Surber before Judge Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 8/30/2013. (Massie, Wade)
July 23, 2013 Filing 278 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Eva Mae Adkins by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #256 Motion to Amend Answer; party shall file amended answer within 7 days of date of entry of this order; plt. shall file responsive pleading to the counterclaim within 21 days of the date of filing of the amended answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/22/13. (flc)
July 18, 2013 Filing 276 FTR Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Abingdon Division held before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/18/13. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Ella Surber (ejs)
July 18, 2013 Filing 275 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2013 re #250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs filed by Eva Mae Adkins, #256 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims filed by EQT Production Company. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
July 3, 2013 Filing 274 OBJECTION to #266 Report and Recommendations on Motions for Class Certification by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 19, 2013 Filing 273 OBJECTION to #266 Report and Recommendations by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
June 17, 2013 Filing 272 NOTICE of Hearing on #250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs, #256 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims : Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2013 01:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 271 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 7/18/2013 01:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 270 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 7/18/2013 01:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 269 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing set for 9/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 CONSENT ORDER extending deadlines as to #266 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust :( Objections to R&R due by 7/3/2013; Replies due by 7/31/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/10/13. (flc)
June 5, 2013 Filing 267 Letter to counsel from Magistrate Judge Sargent regarding pending motions. (PMS)
June 5, 2013 Filing 266 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust. Objections to R&R due by 6/24/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/5/13. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #238 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/5/13. (ejs)
March 21, 2013 Filing 264 RESPONSE in Support re #256 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim)(Massie, Wade)
March 14, 2013 Filing 263 RESPONSE to Motion re #256 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (McMullan, David)
March 6, 2013 Filing 262 Response re #258 Letter. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 4, 2013 Filing 261 AFFIDAVIT re #260 Response in Support of Motion REPLY DECLARATION OF DANIEL E. SELTZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Eva Mae Adkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seltz, Daniel)
March 4, 2013 Filing 260 RESPONSE in Support re #250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #256 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims :(Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/15/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/1/13. (ejs)
February 28, 2013 Filing 258 Letter for Submitting United States Supreme Court Authority by Eva Mae Adkins (Seltz, Daniel)
February 27, 2013 Filing 257 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #256 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 27, 2013 Filing 256 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaim of EQT Production Company, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim of EQT Production Company, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Amended Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim of EQT Production Company)(Massie, Wade)
February 25, 2013 Filing 255 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Portions of Deposition of Nicole Atkison, #3 Exhibit 3 - Portions of Deposition of Michael Lancaster)(Massie, Wade)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs :(Defendant EQT Responses due by 2/26/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/12/13. (ejs)
February 11, 2013 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions Hearing held on 11/30/12 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2013. (bad)
February 8, 2013 Filing 252 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Atkison amended priv log, #2 Exhibit B - Crites amended priv log, #3 Exhibit C - Heflin priv log, #4 Exhibit D - Barrett priv log, #5 Exhibit E - Richey priv log, #6 Exhibit F - Minyard priv log, #7 Exhibit G - Bugna priv log, #8 Exhibit H - Kirk priv log, #9 Exhibit I - Seltz 1-20-12 email to Massie, #10 Exhibit J - Massie 12-31-12 email to Seltz, #11 Exhibit K - Seltz 1-8-13 ltr to Massie, #12 Exhibit L - Massie 1-14-13 ltr to Seltz, #13 Exhibit M - Seltz 1-23-13 email to Massie, #14 Exhibit N - Massie 1-25-13 email to Seltz, #15 Exhibit O - FN 7 - March 13 Transcript section, #16 Exhibit P - FN 8 - Sept 18 Transcript section, #17 Exhibit Q - EQT Response to 7-20-11 ROGS, #18 Exhibit R - EQT Response to 9-30-11 ROGS, #19 Exhibit S - EQT Response to 9-30-11 RFP in Adair, #20 Exhibit T - EQT Response to 9-30-11 RFP in Legard, #21 Exhibit U - Michael Lancaster depo excerpts)(Seltz, Daniel)
February 8, 2013 Filing 251 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 8, 2013 Filing 250 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
December 18, 2012 Filing 249 Response re #248 Response in Opposition to Motion. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
December 14, 2012 Filing 248 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Additional Argument]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
December 11, 2012 Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on 11/30/2012 before Judge Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter:Bridget Dickert. Transcript due by 1/10/2013. (Massie, Wade) Modified on 12/11/2012-added Bridget Dickert as reporter. (slt).
November 30, 2012 Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2012 re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert, OCR.) (ejs)
November 28, 2012 Filing 245 RESPONSE in Support re #238 MOTION to Strike #220 Affidavit of Daniel T. Reineke [Reply Memorandum]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
November 22, 2012 Filing 244 RESPONSE in Opposition re #238 MOTION to Strike #220 Affidavit of Daniel T. Reineke. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (McMullan, David)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/21/2012. (lml)
November 16, 2012 Filing 242 Additional Argument by Eva Mae Adkins Affidavit of Eva Mae Adkins re: Plaintiffs Motion to Certify Class. (Seltz, Daniel) Modified on 12/11/2012 - text corrected at the direction of Judge Sargent to reflect Additional Argument instead of Additional Evidence (ejs).
November 16, 2012 Filing 241 Response. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 9, 2012 Filing 240 Additional Evidence by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
November 9, 2012 Filing 239 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #238 MOTION to Strike #220 Affidavit of Daniel T. Reineke. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
November 9, 2012 Filing 238 MOTION to Strike #220 Affidavit of Daniel T. Reineke by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Massie, Wade)
November 7, 2012 Filing 237 MOTION to Amend/Correct #114 Order on Motion for Protective Order by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Re: Procedure for hearing set on November 30, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/16/12. (ejs)
September 21, 2012 Filing 235 Letter for Magistrate Judge Sargent regarding email production by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting in part and taking under advisement in part #223 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/14/12. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 14, 2012 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/14/12. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 11, 2012 Filing 232 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones and Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent (ejs)
September 6, 2012 Filing 231 REPLY to Response to Motion re #223 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Barrett, Don (John))
September 4, 2012 Filing 230 Letter for Class Certification Issues by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 30, 2012 Filing 229 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #223 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - October 26, 2009 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Affidavit of John Kevin West, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Privilege Log)(Massie, Wade)
August 21, 2012 Filing 228 Notice of Correction re #226 Response in Opposition to Motion; Document replaced with correct pdf correcting name and style of case, etc. (lmh)
August 20, 2012 Filing 227 Exhibits to Sur-Reply #226 re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Deposition of Daniel T. Reineke, #2 Exhibit 1B - Deposition of Daniel T. Reineke, #3 Exhibit 2 - Portions of Deposition of Eva Mae Adkins, #4 Exhibit 3 - Portions of Deposition of William G. Baker, Jr., #5 Exhibit 4 - Portions of Deposition of John Bergonzi, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett dated July 18, 2012, #7 Exhibit 6 - Portions of Deposition of Kenneth C. Kirk, #8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Will Clear, #9 Exhibit 8 - Portions of Deposition of Elizabeth Anne Cox, #10 Exhibit 9 - Portions of Deposition of Charles S. Bartlett, Jr., Ph.D.)(Massie, Wade) Modified on 8/21/2012 to correct text to reflect exhibits; filed by counsel as a response in Opposition to Motion (lmh).
August 20, 2012 Filing 226 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Sur-Reply]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade) (Main Document 226 replaced on 8/21/2012) (lmh).
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER setting response deadline as to #223 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails :(Defendant's Response due by 8/30/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/15/12. (ejs)
August 15, 2012 Filing 224 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #223 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Fourth Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit West Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Adkins Deposition)(Barrett, Don (John))
August 15, 2012 Filing 223 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Barrett, Don (John))
August 9, 2012 Filing 222 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel T. Reineke by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
July 31, 2012 Filing 221 AFFIDAVIT re #219 Reply to Response to Motion Reply Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Seltz, Daniel)
July 31, 2012 Filing 220 AFFIDAVIT re #219 Reply to Response to Motion Affidavit of Daniel T. Reineke, P.E. by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 31, 2012 Filing 219 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #217 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Replies in Opposition to Class Certification. Response due 8/20/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/27/12. (eps)
July 27, 2012 Filing 217 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Replies in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OPINION AND ORDER denying Objections to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated March 20, 2012. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/24/12. (sc)
July 19, 2012 Filing 215 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (lmh)
July 9, 2012 Filing 214 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eva Mae Adkins by EQT Production Company.(Hodges, Stephen)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 OPINION AND ORDER denying objections #205 , modifying magistrate judge's order #201 and vacating stay of the magistrate judge's order #207 . Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/29/12. (sc)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #202 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/28/12. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/28/12. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 19, 2012 Filing 210 Response re #201 Order on Motion for Protective Order, #200 Memorandum Opinion [Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Objections]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Minute Order. Leave is granted to Defendant EQT Production Company to file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order of May 31, 2012, PROVIDED that such Reply is filed no later than June 19, 2012. No further briefing shall occur and the Objections shall be deemed submitted to the court for decision upon the expiration of that date. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/13/2012. (JPJ)
June 12, 2012 Filing 208 Response re #205 Objections Response To EQT Production Companys Objections To Magistrate Judges Memorandum Opinions And Orders Dated May 31, 2012. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/8/2012. VACATED PER ORDER OF 6/29/12 #213 (lmh)
June 7, 2012 Filing 206 MOTION to Stay re #201 Order on Motion for Protective Order, #200 Memorandum Opinion by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
June 7, 2012 Filing 205 Objections by Defendant EQT Production Company re #201 Order on Motion for Protective Order, #200 Memorandum Opinion. (Massie, Wade)
June 6, 2012 Filing 204 Response re #199 Response EQT's Opposition to Motion to Compel. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Barrett, Don (John))
June 5, 2012 Filing 203 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #202 MOTION to Compel. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EQT's Amended Third Priviledge Log)(Barrett, Don (John))
June 5, 2012 Filing 202 MOTION to Compel by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Barrett, Don (John))
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #170 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/31/12. (ejs)
May 31, 2012 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/31/12. (ejs)
May 29, 2012 Filing 199 Response re #167 Order on Motion to Compel [Memorandum of Defendant EQT Production Company in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Massie, Wade)
May 18, 2012 Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Pretrial Motions and Scheduling Conference held on April 3, 2012 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., Telephone number 361-949-2988. Tape Number: FTR. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (bkd)
May 15, 2012 Filing 197 AFFIDAVIT re #196 Brief/Memorandum Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposal Regarding Search Terms and Exhibits A through G by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Seltz, Daniel)
May 15, 2012 Filing 196 Brief/Memorandum Plaintiffs' Proposal Regarding Search Terms. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
May 15, 2012 Filing 195 Additional Evidence by EQT Production Company [Proposed Search Terms]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Massie, Wade)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER allowing the parties until 5/15/12 to file any proposal with regard to search terms that may be used to limit number of emails as to #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information and other deadlines as stated in the order regarding deadline to produce remaining document in response to request for production; and plaintiff's reply to Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/8/12. (ejs)
May 7, 2012 Filing 193 Notice of Correction re #188 Motion Hearing - deleted incorrect minutes and attached updated minutes of hearing held 5/1/2012 (ejs)
May 4, 2012 Filing 192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eva Mae Adkins re #190 Response (Seltz, Daniel)
May 3, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE by EQT Production Company re #169 Objections [of Filing of Additional Evidence] (Attachments: #1 Deposition Testimony of William G. Baker, Jr., #2 Deposition Testimony of Elizabeth Anne Cox)(Massie, Wade)
May 3, 2012 Filing 190 Response re #189 Response to EQT's Filing of Supplemental Authority. filed by Eva Mae Adkins, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
May 2, 2012 Filing 189 Response re #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information [Citation of Supplemental Authority in Support]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
May 1, 2012 Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2012 re #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information filed by EQT Production Company. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs) (Main Document 188 replaced on 5/7/2012) (ejs). Modified on 5/7/2012 - deleted incorrect minutes and attached updated minutes of hearing held (ejs).
April 30, 2012 Filing 187 Response re #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information [Reply in Support]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email dated December 16, 2011, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email dated February 24, 2012)(Massie, Wade)
April 27, 2012 Filing 186 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William G. Baker, Jr. by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
April 27, 2012 Filing 185 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Edwin F. Legard, Jr. by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
April 27, 2012 Filing 184 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Elizabeth Anne Cox by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
April 27, 2012 Filing 183 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Charles Bartlett by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
April 25, 2012 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2012 Filing 181 Objections by Defendant EQT Production Company re #163 Memorandum Opinion, #164 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,. (Massie, Wade)
April 16, 2012 Filing 180 Response re #169 Objections to Memorandum Opinion and Order dated March 20, 2012. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
April 13, 2012 Filing 179 AGREE ORDER resetting response deadline as to #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information :( Plaintiff's Responses due by 4/25/2012) (ejs)
April 12, 2012 Filing 178 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 5, 2012 Filing 176 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information : Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2012 at 2:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (flc)
April 5, 2012 Filing 175 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2012 at 2:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (flc)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #154 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #156 Motion for Protective Order; ORDER for plaintiff's to respond to #170 Dft's Motion for a Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information by April 13, 2012; ORDER for plaintiff's to reply to his #71 Motion for Class Certification by no later than 6/28/2012; and all other directives as noted in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/5/2012. (flc)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order to Respond re #169 Objections; Responses due by 4/16/2012. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 4/4/2012. (flc)
April 3, 2012 Filing 177 Exhibit List for PTM/Scheduling Conference hearing held on 4/3/2012. (Attachments: #1 Court Exhibit 1, #2 Court Exhibit 2)(flc)
April 3, 2012 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2012 re #154 MOTION to Compel filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, #170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information filed by EQT Production Company, #156 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by EQT Production Company, Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2012. (Court Reporter Felicia Clark, FTR.) (flc) Modified on 4/4/2012 to correct hearing date (flc).
March 30, 2012 Filing 170 MOTION for Protective Order on Production of Emails and Other Electronically Stored Information by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Nicole Atkison, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of James Perkins, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Rick Crites)(Massie, Wade)
March 30, 2012 Filing 169 Objections by Defendant EQT Production Company re #163 Memorandum Opinion, #164 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,. (Massie, Wade)
March 28, 2012 Filing 168 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2012 02:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #131 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/28/12. (ejs)
March 20, 2012 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #154 MOTION to Compel. filed by Eva Mae Adkins, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2012 Filing 165 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #156 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition [Reply]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #126 Motion to Substitute Party. Eva Mae Adkins added. Edwin F. Legard, Jr, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust and Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust terminated; granting in part and denying in part #127 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part #137 Motion to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/20/12. (ejs)
March 20, 2012 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/20/12. (Bordwine, Robin)
March 13, 2012 Filing 162 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #156 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2012 Filing 161 RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION to Compel of February 27, 2012. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #154 MOTION to Compel Responses due by 3/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/9/12. (ejs)
March 9, 2012 Filing 159 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #154 MOTION to Compel by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
March 8, 2012 Filing 158 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #154 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2012 02:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #156 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/13/2012), and as to #154 MOTION to Compel ( Defendant's Responses due by 3/13/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/28/12. (ejs)
February 27, 2012 Filing 156 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Massie, Wade)
February 27, 2012 Filing 155 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #154 MOTION to Compel. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - emails)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2012 Filing 154 MOTION to Compel by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2012 Filing 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2012 re #131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, #137 MOTION for Rule to Show Cause filed by EQT Production Company, #136 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiffs filed by EQT Production Company, #127 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, #126 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Edwin F. Legard, Jr.. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
February 6, 2012 Filing 152 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #136 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiffs [Reply]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 6, 2012 Filing 151 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #136 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiffs : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2012 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
February 3, 2012 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #136 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiffs. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Herrington, Brian)
February 3, 2012 Filing 149 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seltz, Daniel)
February 3, 2012 Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re #131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 3, 2012 Filing 147 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #137 MOTION for Rule to Show Cause, #126 MOTION to Substitute Party : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2012 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
February 3, 2012 Filing 146 Notice of Correction re 145 Notice of Hearing on Motion, - Corrected docket entry to reflect Judge Sargent as the presiding Judge for this hearing (ejs)
February 2, 2012 Filing 145 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #127 MOTION for Protective Order, #131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2012 09:30 AM before Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs) Corrected to reflect Judge Sargent as presiding judge
February 1, 2012 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion re #137 MOTION for Rule to Show Cause [in Support of Motion for Rule to Show Cause]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 1, 2012 Filing 143 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. Amendment to #140 Affidavit in Support of Motion Declaration of Barrett (correcting pleading caption and second sentence). (Seltz, Daniel)
January 31, 2012 Filing 142 Response re #131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
January 30, 2012 Filing 141 RESPONSE in Support re #127 MOTION for Protective Order. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Herrington, Brian)
January 30, 2012 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #126 MOTION to Substitute Party Declaration of Barrett. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seltz, Daniel)
January 30, 2012 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re #126 MOTION to Substitute Party. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
January 25, 2012 Filing 138 RESPONSE to Motion re #137 MOTION for Rule to Show Cause. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit January 25th Letter to Wade Massie regarding subpoena to Charlie Bartlett)(Barrett, Richard)
January 23, 2012 Filing 137 MOTION for Rule to Show Cause by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Massie, Wade)
January 23, 2012 Filing 136 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiffs by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Massie, Wade)
January 23, 2012 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #127 MOTION for Protective Order. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
January 23, 2012 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #126 MOTION to Substitute Party. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Massie, Wade)
January 17, 2012 Filing 133 AFFIDAVIT re #131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories /Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Seltz, Daniel)
January 17, 2012 Filing 132 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
January 17, 2012 Filing 131 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER setting response deadline as to #127 MOTION for Protective Order, and #126 MOTION to Substitute Party (Defendant's Responses due by 1/23/2012); staying deadline regarding briefing on the issue of class certification; and staying depositions set on 1/16/12 & 1/17/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/10/12. (ejs)
January 10, 2012 Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Telephone Conference held with counsel on 1/10/2012 regarding scheduling. (PMS)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORAL ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #127 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, #126 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent.. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on 1/9/2012. (lmh)
January 6, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION for Protective Order by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Barrett, Don (John))
January 6, 2012 Filing 126 MOTION to Substitute Party by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Barrett, Don (John))
December 22, 2011 Filing 125 RETURN of service of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action on 12/22/11 upon Dr. Charles S. Bartlett(Massie, Wade)
December 16, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Charles Bartlett by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
December 16, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Elizabeth Anne Cox, and William G. Baker, Jr. by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
December 13, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Hodges on behalf of EQT Production Company (Hodges, Stephen)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/2/11. (eps)
December 1, 2011 Filing 120 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery [Entry of an Order Extending Certain Deadlines] by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/29/11. (ejs)
November 28, 2011 Filing 118 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Allowing Clawback Rights by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
November 14, 2011 Filing 117 RETURN of service of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects on 11/11/11 upon Charles S. Bartlett(Massie, Wade)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #98 Motion to Compel; lifting discovery stay; and setting response deadline to 1/6/12 for plaintiff to file reply regarding class certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/8/11. (ejs)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying #101 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/2/2011. (lmh)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/2/11. (ejs)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER suspending plaintiff's time to file reply brief in support of motion for class certification and pending motion to compel until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/2/11. (ejs) (ejs)
November 1, 2011 Filing 112 Joint MOTION for Protective Order [Entry of] by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
November 1, 2011 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Status Conference held on 11/1/2011. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
October 31, 2011 Filing 110 Response re #101 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability [to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal] [Reply in Support]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 24, 2011 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability [to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal]. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Herrington, Brian)
October 20, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2011 12:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER suspending deadlines to file brief in support of Motion for Class Certification and defendant's discovery response until after status conference set on November 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/20/11. (ejs)
October 20, 2011 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Telephone Conference held on 10/20/2011 with Mr. Barrett and Mr. Massie scheduling Scheduling Conference for 10 a.m. on November 1, 2011, in Abingdon before Judge Sargent. (PMS)
October 14, 2011 Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett, #2 Exhibit Gillespie Order, #3 Exhibit Watts Order, #4 Exhibit Barnaby Order)(Massie, Wade)
October 12, 2011 Filing 104 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #98 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY [REPLY}. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 11, 2011 Filing 103 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
October 10, 2011 Filing 102 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #101 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability [to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 10, 2011 Filing 101 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability [to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal] by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 7, 2011 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #98 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Massie, Wade)
October 7, 2011 Filing 99 AFFIDAVIT re #98 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seltz, Daniel)
October 7, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying Objections #95 filed by EQT Production Company. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/29/2011. (lmh)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion to Dismiss; fully adopting/accepting #60 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/28/2011. (lmh)
September 28, 2011 Filing 95 Objections by Defendant EQT Production Company re #94 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings. (Massie, Wade)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Setting response deadline as to #71 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Defendants Responses due by 10/14/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/23/11. (ejs)
August 4, 2011 Filing 93 Letter for (regarding request for discovery) by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 29, 2011 Filing 92 DISCOVERY LETTER re: in opposition to Mr. Stellings' letter of July 20, 2011 by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
July 27, 2011 Filing 91 Letter from Wade Massie in response to Mr. Stellings' letter #90 . (Bordwine, Robin)
July 20, 2011 Filing 90 Letter for (request for approval of discovery) by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 24, 2011 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2011 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judy Webb, Telephone number 540-857-5100 X 5333/judyw@vawd.uscours.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2011. (jw)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPINION AND ORDER denying #63 Motion to Certify a Question to the Supreme Court of Virginia. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/24/11. (sc)
March 23, 2011 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Edwin F. Legard, Jr for proceedings held on 3/17/2011 transcribed by Court Reporter Judy Webb before Judge Jones.. (McMullan, David)
March 18, 2011 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on March 17, 2011 transcribed by Court Reporter Judy Webb before Judge Jones.. (Massie, Wade)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORAL ORDER taking under advisement the objections to the report and recommendation in this matter. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on March 17, 2011. (aec)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORAL ORDER taking under advisement #63 Motion to certify a question to the Virginia Supreme Court. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on March 17, 2011. (aec)
March 17, 2011 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Court Hearing on objections to report and recommendation held on 3/17/2011 and Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2011 re #63 MOTION Certify a Question to the Supreme Court of Virginia filed by EQT Production Company. (Court Reporter Judy Webb.) (aec)
February 17, 2011 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Opinion in Poplar Creek Development Co. v. Chesapeake Appalachia, L.L.C., Case No. 09-5914 (6th Cir. Feb. 17, 2011))(Massie, Wade)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER entered wherein the deadline for filing of thedefendants response to the plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification,Appointment Of Class Counsel, And Appointment Of Class Representatives,is STAYED pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on February 16, 2011. (aec)
February 15, 2011 Filing 80 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #63 MOTION Certify a Question to the Supreme Court of Virginia [Reply]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 15, 2011 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION Extend the Schedule for Determining Whether to Certify a Class. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Barrett, Don (John))
February 15, 2011 Filing 78 Notice of Correction re #71 MOTION to Certify Class; MOTION to Appoint Class Counsel and Motion to appoint class representatives. Modified docket entry to add additional types of motions (to appoint class counsel and class representatives). (aec)
February 14, 2011 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #71 MOTION to Certify Class of Jackson S. White, Jr.. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 14, 2011 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #71 MOTION to Certify Class of Peter G. Glubiak. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 14, 2011 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #71 MOTION to Certify Class of Larry D. Moffett. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 14, 2011 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #71 MOTION to Certify Class of John W. (Don) Barrett. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 14, 2011 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #71 MOTION to Certify Class by David S. Stellings. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 14, 2011 Filing 72 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #71 MOTION to Certify Class. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 14, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION to Certify Class, by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Seltz, Daniel) (aec) Modified on 9/30/2011 to clarify docket at the direction of the Court (lmh).
February 8, 2011 Filing 70 Response re #62 Objection to Report and Recommendations. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Herrington, Brian)
February 8, 2011 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION Certify a Question to the Supreme Court of Virginia. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Herrington, Brian)
February 7, 2011 Filing 68 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #67 MOTION Extend the Schedule for Determining Whether to Certify a Class. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 7, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION Extend the Schedule for Determining Whether to Certify a Class by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
February 4, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #63 MOTION to Certify a Question to the Supreme Court of Virginia : Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2011 @ 1:00 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (aec)
February 4, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing on objections to Report and Recommendation set for 3/17/2011 @ 1:00 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (aec)
January 25, 2011 Filing 64 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #63 MOTION Certify a Question to the Supreme Court of Virginia. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
January 25, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION Certify a Question to the Supreme Court of Virginia by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
January 25, 2011 Filing 62 OBJECTION to #60 Report and Recommendations by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
January 14, 2011 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Status / Scheduling Conference held on December 14, 2010 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., Telephone number 361/949-2988. Tape Number: FTR. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2011. (bkd)
January 11, 2011 Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EQT Production Company, EQT Corporation. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/11/11. (Bordwine, Robin)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER setting deadline for plaintiff to file motion to certify as a class action ( Responses due by 2/15/2011); also setting routine status conferences, as necessary, on the first Tuesday of each month; and whatever else the order states. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/11/11. (ejs)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Walter Thomas McGough, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/30/10. (ejs)
December 29, 2010 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Thomas W. McGough] by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
December 14, 2010 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Status Conference held on 12/14/2010. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER staying discovery with the exception of initial disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/8/10. (lmh)
December 6, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
December 2, 2010 Filing 53 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Massie, Wade)
November 24, 2010 Filing 52 DISCOVERY LETTER re: Service of Initial Disclosures by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr.(Moffett, Larry)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #43 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/26/10. (ejs)
October 25, 2010 Filing 50 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery and Rule 26(f) Conference. filed by Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/21/10. (ejs)
October 20, 2010 Filing 48 Additional Evidence by EQT Production Company [Notice of Filing of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss]. (Massie, Wade)
October 20, 2010 Filing 47 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel E. Seltz by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Glubiak, Peter)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order to Respond re #43 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery and Rule 26(f) Conference. Responses due by 10/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/14/10. (eps)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORAL ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #43 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery and Rule 26(f) Conference filed by EQT Production Company Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent.. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on 10/13/10. (lmh)
October 12, 2010 Filing 44 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #43 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery and Rule 26(f) Conference. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 12, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery and Rule 26(f) Conference by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 4, 2010 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Pretrial Motion Hearing held on September 28, 2010 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., Telephone number 361/949-2988. Tape Number: FTR. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (bkd)
October 1, 2010 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Edwin F. Legard, Jr for proceedings held on 9/28/2010 before Judge Pamela Sargent.. (McMullan, David)
October 1, 2010 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Wade Massie for proceedings held on 9-28-2010 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. (Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc.) (jfs)
October 1, 2010 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Wade W. Massie for proceedings held on 9-28-2010 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent.(Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc.) (jfs)
October 1, 2010 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by EQT Corporation, EQT Production Company for proceedings held on September 28, 2010 before Judge Pamela Sargent.. (Massie, Wade)
September 30, 2010 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jonathan T. Blank for proceedings held on 9-28-2010 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. (Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc.) (jfs)
September 28, 2010 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2010 re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EQT Production Company, EQT Corporation. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
September 28, 2010 Filing 35 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel E. Seltz by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Glubiak, Peter)
September 16, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #21 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2010 02:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (eps)
September 9, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Frye on behalf of EQT Production Company (Frye, Mark)
August 30, 2010 Filing 32 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss [Reply]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
August 20, 2010 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Edwin F. Legard, Jr, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease)(Moffett, Larry)
August 20, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Edwin F. Legard, Jr, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust (Moffett, Larry)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Referring #21 Motion to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Sargent and whatever else the order states. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on August 18, 2010. (aec)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION to Dismiss; Response due by 8/20/2010. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on August 9, 2010. (aec)
August 6, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Edwin F. Legard, Jr, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Moffett, Larry)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for W. Thomas McGough, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/6/10. (eps)
August 5, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice W. Thomas McGough, Jr. by EQT Corporation, EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
July 28, 2010 Filing 24 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
July 28, 2010 Filing 23 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQT Corporation. (Massie, Wade)
July 28, 2010 Filing 22 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by EQT Corporation, EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oil and Gas Lease dated November 19, 1975, between W. G. Baker, et al and Philadelphia Oil Company, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oil and Gas Lease dated November 10, 2004, between Elizabeth Anne Cox, et al and Equitable Production Company, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oil and Gas Lease dated November 10, 2004, between Emily P. Baker and Equitable Production Company, #4 Exhibit 4 - Oil and Gas Lease dated November 10, 2004, between Pauline B. Legard and Equitable Production Company, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Rick Crites)(Massie, Wade)
July 28, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by EQT Corporation, EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
July 22, 2010 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwin F. Legard, Jr re #8 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David S. Stellings Amended (Glubiak, Peter)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/22/10. (eps)
July 21, 2010 Filing 18 Supplemental MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth A. Alexander by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Glubiak, Peter)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/21/10. (eps)
July 21, 2010 Filing 16 Notice of Correction: Incorrect event selected - document #12 deleted; event to be refiled. (lmh)
July 20, 2010 Filing 15 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven E. Fineman by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Glubiak, Peter)
July 20, 2010 Filing 14 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer Gross by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Glubiak, Peter)
July 20, 2010 Filing 13 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth A. Alexander by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Glubiak, Peter)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, EQT Corporation answer due 7/29/2010; EQT Production Company answer due 7/29/2010. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/16/10. (eps)
July 16, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motions by EQT Corporation, EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for David S. Stellings to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/15/10. (lmh)
July 15, 2010 Filing 8 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David S. Stellings by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Glubiak, Peter)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Charles Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/15/10. (lmh)
July 14, 2010 Filing 6 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles Barrett by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Glubiak, Peter)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Don Barrett; Richard Barrett; Katherine Riley; David McMullan and Brian Herrington. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on July 6, 2010. (aec)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Larry Moffett. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on July 6, 2010. (aec)
July 6, 2010 Filing 3 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard R. Barrett, John W. "Don" Barrett, David M. McMullan, Katherine B. Riley, and Brian Herrington by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Glubiak, Peter)
July 6, 2010 Filing 2 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Larry Moffett by Edwin F. Legard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, Glubiak, Peter) Modified on 7/7/2010 to remove Exhibit #3 - Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in document #1:10CV39 (lmh).
June 28, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQT Corporation, EQT Production Company filed by Edwin F. Legard, Jr, Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust, Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust. 100 Day Notice due by 10/15/2010 and 120 Day Service due by 11/4/2010 (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. EQT Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin F. Legard, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: David Malcom McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Don (John) William Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Brian Herrington
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jennifer Gross
Represented By: Larry D. Moffett
Represented By: Peter Gerard Glubiak
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Sara Katherine Riley
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Anne Cox Trust
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: David Malcom McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Don (John) William Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Brian Herrington
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jennifer Gross
Represented By: Larry D. Moffett
Represented By: Peter Gerard Glubiak
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Sara Katherine Riley
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily P. Baker Generation Skipping Trust
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: David Malcom McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Don (John) William Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Brian Herrington
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jennifer Gross
Represented By: Larry D. Moffett
Represented By: Peter Gerard Glubiak
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Sara Katherine Riley
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Mae Adkins
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: David Malcom McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Don (John) William Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: Larry D. Moffett
Represented By: Jennifer Lindsey Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT Corporation
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: Walter Thomas McGough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT Production Company
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: Walter Thomas McGough, Jr.
Represented By: Mark E. Frye
Represented By: Stephen M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?