Addison v. CNX Gas Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Doris Betty Addison
Defendant: CNX Gas Company LLC, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, John Does A-Z, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC and Buckhorn Coal Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv00065
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Filing 378 Declaration re #376 MOTION to Certify Class by Doris Betty Addison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 377 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #376 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 376 MOTION to Certify Class by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting #373 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/19/15. (flc)
March 17, 2015 Filing 374 RESPONSE in Opposition re #373 MOTION for Extension of Time to File renewed Motion for Class Certification / Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Sneathern, Larissa)
March 16, 2015 Filing 373 MOTION for Extension of Time to File renewed Motion for Class Certification / Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - House Bill 2058, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffett, Larry)
March 4, 2015 Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Scheduling Conference held on 2/27/15 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2015. (bad)
March 2, 2015 Filing 371 NOTICE of Hearing:Renewed Motions for Class Certification Hearing set for 9/8/2015 thru 9/10/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/2/15. (flc)
February 27, 2015 Filing 368 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Scheduling Conference held on 2/27/2015. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER in re: Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/18/15. (flc)
February 18, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference via Teleconference set for 2/27/2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORAL ORDER granting #364 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lee Adair Floyd terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/10/15. (flc)
February 9, 2015 Filing 364 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lee Adair Floyd by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Gardner, Blair)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 OPINION and ORDER granting #358 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/6/15. (ejs)
November 24, 2014 Filing 362 REPLY to Response to Motion re #358 MOTION for Protective Order . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - obit & death certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - deed of gift, #3 Exhibit 3 - w9, #4 Exhibit 4 - email chain)(Sneathern, Larissa)
November 18, 2014 Filing 361 RESPONSE in Opposition re #358 MOTION for Protective Order . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 18, 2014 Filing 360 Response re #356 Brief/Memorandum / REPLY CONCERNING ADDITIONAL PRE-CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 11, 2014 Filing 359 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #356 Brief/Memorandum (Plaintiffs' Submission Seeking Additional Pre-Certification Discovery), Brief / Memorandum in Support re #358 MOTION for Protective Order . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (affidavit of Jamie Cox-Kidd))(Sneathern, Larissa)
November 11, 2014 Filing 358 MOTION for Protective Order by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sneathern, Larissa) Modified on 11/12/2014 to remove referral docket text (flc).
November 11, 2014 Filing 357 Letter for Future Discovery by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Buckhorn Coal Company, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC (Floyd, Lee)
October 28, 2014 Filing 356 Brief/Memorandum Plaintiffs' Submission Concerning Pre-Certification Discovery. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER denying without prejudice #352 Motion to Compel; and the plaintiff must file within 14 days the specific subject matter and method of any further discovery requested as to class certification, taking into account (1) the importance of any such discovery and (2) whether its burden and expense on theopposing party outweighs its likely benefits. The opposing party must respond within 14 days of service and the plaintiff may reply within 7 days of service.. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/14/14. (ejs)
October 3, 2014 Filing 354 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #352 MOTION to Compel . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Seltz, Daniel)
October 3, 2014 Filing 353 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #352 MOTION to Compel . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 3, 2014 Filing 352 MOTION to Compel by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 2, 2014 Filing 351 USCA ORDER directing petitioners to pay $505.00 filing fee to the district court for filing and docketing the appeal when the petition for permission to appeal was granted. (ejs)
September 29, 2014 Filing 350 Letter for Response to letters from CNX and EQT this relates to Docket No. #342 by Doris Betty Addison (Seltz, Daniel) Modified on 9/30/2014 - created link to docket entry 342 (ejs).
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #346 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Meghan Mitchell Cloud and Lisa M. Lorish terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/29/14. (ejs)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER denying without prejudice to later assertion #326 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #235 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #238 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #241 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #285 Motion for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition; denying #296 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/26/14. (flc)
September 26, 2014 Filing 347 MANDATE by Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals filed on 9/26/14. (flc)
September 24, 2014 Filing 346 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to Note Counsel No Longer of Record) by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, Jonathan)
September 24, 2014 Filing 345 NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Neale on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC (Neale, James)
September 24, 2014 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Larissa L. Paule-Carres Sneathern on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC (Sneathern, Larissa)
September 22, 2014 Filing 343 Letter for response to ECF No. 418 by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Buckhorn Coal Company, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC (Floyd, Lee)
September 22, 2014 Filing 342 Letter for response to Plaintiffs' 9/15/14 letter [ECF 418] by CNX Gas Company LLC (Sneathern, Larissa)
September 16, 2014 Filing 341 Memorandum to Counsel setting deadline for defendants to respond to #340 Letter to Judge Jones by September 22, 2014. (ejs)
September 15, 2014 Filing 340 Letter for Judge Jones dated 9-15-2014 Re Scheduling Issues by Doris Betty Addison (Seltz, Daniel)
August 27, 2014 Filing 339 Letter to Judge Jones from David Stellings (ejs)
August 19, 2014 Filing 338 USCA Judgment entered on 8/19/14; VACATED and REMANDED District Court's decision. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Judgment)(flc)
August 19, 2014 Filing 337 USCA Memorandum Opinion decided on 8/19/14.(flc)
July 25, 2014 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 1/6/14 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2014. (bad)
May 20, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oral Argument Schedule)(Floyd, Lee)
May 19, 2014 Filing 334 REPLY to Response to Motion re #326 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations and Laches . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
May 9, 2014 Filing 333 RESPONSE in Opposition re #326 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations and Laches . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
May 7, 2014 Filing 332 Response re #331 Response AND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS NOTICES AND NOTICE PROGRAM AND TO AMEND THE CLASS DEFINITION. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2014 Filing 331 SUR-REPLY by CNX Gas Company LLC. to #318 Omnibus Reply Brief in Support of Motion For Approval of the Form and Content of Notice and To Amend the Class Definition, (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C)(ejs)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MINUTE ORDER granting #328 DEFENDANT CNX GAS COMPANY LLC's MOTION TO FILE SUR-REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF THE FORM AND CONTENT OF NOTICE AND TO AMEND THE CLASS DEFINITION. The Clerk is directed to forthwith file the Sur-Reply, which is attached as an exhibit to the Motion. Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file a response to the Sur-Reply, provided it is filed within 14 days of this date. The Court does not intend to allow oral argument, in light of the extensive briefing permitted. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 4/23/2014. (JPJ)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTE ORDER granting #305 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to April 2, 2014, which response was filed on that day. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 4/23/2014. (JPJ)
April 22, 2014 Filing 328 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of the Form and Content of Notice and to Amend the Class Definition by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-reply with Exhibits)(Lorish, Lisa)
April 22, 2014 Filing 327 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #326 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations and Laches . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lorish, Lisa)
April 22, 2014 Filing 326 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations and Laches by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
April 21, 2014 Filing 325 Letter for Judge Sargent in response to CNX's letter requesting hearing by Doris Betty Addison (Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2014 Filing 324 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #319 Affidavit in Support of Motion Corrected Affidavit of Larry D. Moffett by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 18, 2014 Filing 323 Letter for Judge Pamela Sargent with Request for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motions for Approval for Class Notice and Notice Program by CNX Gas Company LLC (Blank, Jonathan)
April 17, 2014 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Evidentiary Hearing held on April 9, 2014 before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Jacobs, Telephone number carolj@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2014. (cj)
April 14, 2014 Filing 321 RESPONSE in Support re #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition Declaration of Tore Hodne. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 320 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 319 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 318 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 317 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) (FIRST COPY) by CNX Gas Company LLC for proceedings held on 4/9/2014 reported by Court Reporter Dameron before Judge Pamela Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 4/24/2014. (Lorish, Lisa)
April 10, 2014 Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by Doris Betty Addison for proceedings held on 4/9/14 reported by Court Reporter Dameron before Judge Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 4/21/2014. (Barrett, Charles)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER staying #309 Order only insofar as it required the defendant to produce payment histories for all of its Virginia coalbed methane, (CBM), wells (class and nonclass) for the month of January for each year from 2007 to the present; and setting deadlines for the parties to confer as to additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/9/14. (ejs)
April 9, 2014 Filing 314 FTR Log Notes for Evidentiary Hearing in the Abingdon Division held before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/9/14. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Ella Surber (ejs)
April 9, 2014 Filing 313 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/9/2014. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
April 2, 2014 Filing 312 RESPONSE in Opposition re #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lorish, Lisa)
April 2, 2014 Filing 311 RESPONSE in Opposition re #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition . filed by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wheatman Dep.)(Floyd, Lee)
March 31, 2014 Filing 310 NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/9/2014 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER that CNX shall produce various payment histories in a mutually agreed upon electronic format and such histories shall be treated as confidential attorneys' eyes only materials; taking under advisement plaintiff's request to reconsider 3/11/14 order; and counsel shall contact the Clerk's office within 7 days to schedule an evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/24/14. (ejs)
March 24, 2014 Filing 308 Response re #307 Response to CNX's response to memorandum order on motion to compel payment histories. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Blank, Jonathan)
March 22, 2014 Filing 307 Response re #306 Response to CNX's Response to Memorandum Order. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Moffett, Larry)
March 20, 2014 Filing 306 Response re #298 Response to Plaintiffs' Submission in Response to Memorandum Order on Motion to Compel Payment Histories. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Jason L. Mumford)(Lorish, Lisa)
March 19, 2014 Filing 305 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Blair)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting #289 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply( Defendant's Responses due by 4/2/2014); denying #302 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/14/14. (flc)
March 14, 2014 Filing 303 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #302 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Discovery Of Shannon Wheatman . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Depo. of K. Kinsella)(Blank, Jonathan)
March 13, 2014 Filing 302 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Discovery Of Shannon Wheatman by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2014 Filing 301 RESPONSE to Motion re #296 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER denying #286 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/12/2014. (lml)
March 12, 2014 Filing 299 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held via Conference call on 3/12/2014 re #289 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition filed by CNX Gas Company LLC, #286 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 Days filed by CNX Gas Company LLC, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Buckhorn Coal Company. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
March 12, 2014 Filing 298 Response / Submission re #295 Memorandum Order on Motion to Compel Payment Histories. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Moffett, Larry) Modified on 3/12/2014 adding hyperlink to docket text per counsel's request(flc).
March 12, 2014 Filing 297 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #296 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
March 12, 2014 Filing 296 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa) Modified on 3/13/2014 to remove referral text (flc).
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #266 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 03/11/14. (Bordwine, Robin)
March 10, 2014 Filing 294 Letter for attachment of affidavit from Jason L. Mumford regarding the burden in responding to Request for Production No. 12 by CNX Gas Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jason L. Mumford)(Lorish, Lisa)
March 10, 2014 Filing 293 RESPONSE in Opposition re #286 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 Days Opposition to Second Motion to Stay Proceedings. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 10, 2014 Filing 292 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion via Teleconference (No Interpreter requested) #289 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition , #286 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 Days : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. *COURT REPORTER REQUIRED*(flc)
March 10, 2014 Filing 291 REPLY to Response to Motion re #289 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
March 8, 2014 Filing 290 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #289 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seltz, Daniel)
March 7, 2014 Filing 289 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa) Modified on 3/10/2014 to remove referral text(flc).
March 7, 2014 Filing 288 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2014 re #266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert, OCR.) (ejs)
March 6, 2014 Filing 287 Email from Daniel E. Seltz to Judge Jones and Judge Sargent regarding Motion to Stay (ejs)
March 5, 2014 Filing 286 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 Days by Buckhorn Coal Company, CNX Gas Company LLC, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Appeal, #2 Exhibit Swords Creek Petition for Appeal, #3 Exhibit Oral Argument Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Floyd, Lee)
February 28, 2014 Filing 285 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definition by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wheatman Declaration)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2014 Filing 284 NOTICE of Hearing (CONFERENCE CALL) on Motion #266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories : Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2014 10:00 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
February 12, 2014 Filing 283 Notice of Cancellation of Motion Hearing set on 2/13/14 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (To be rescheduled) (ejs)
January 22, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories : Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 01:30 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
January 8, 2014 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) (First Copy) by CNX Gas Company LLC for proceedings held on 1/6/2014 reported by Court Reporter Bridget Dickert before Judge James P. Jones. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 2/7/2014. (Lorish, Lisa)
January 8, 2014 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (COPY *Only applies if original transcript has been ordered Service) by Doris Betty Addison for proceedings held on 1/6/14 before Judge James P. Jones. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: (Barrett, Charles)
January 8, 2014 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC for proceedings held on January 6, 2014 before Judge James P. Jones. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 2/7/2014. (Gardner, Blair)
January 6, 2014 Filing 278 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2014 re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Doris Betty Addison, #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Doris Betty Addison, #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
December 16, 2013 Filing 277 RESPONSE in Support re #266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Moffett, Larry)
December 6, 2013 Filing 276 REPLY to Response to Motion re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the BCH-W Defendants' claims. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter opinion)(Herrington, Brian)
December 6, 2013 Filing 275 RESPONSE in Opposition re #266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Blank, Jonathan)
November 26, 2013 Filing 274 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions (No Interpreter requested) #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2014 at 2:30 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
November 22, 2013 Filing 273 REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Accounting. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (McMullan, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 272 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I)(Seltz, Daniel)
November 22, 2013 Filing 271 RESPONSE in Support re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Ownership. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting re #268 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #258 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Responses due by 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/21/13. (flc)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories :(Defendant's Responses due by 12/6/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/22/13. (ejs)
November 21, 2013 Filing 268 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #258 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaver, Jennifer)
November 20, 2013 Filing 267 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2013 Filing 266 MOTION to Compel Payment Histories by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CNX response to 8-2-13 requests, #2 Exhibit B - 10-14-13 email, #3 Exhibit C - 11-18-13 email)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2013 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 10/16/13 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2014. (bad)
November 14, 2013 Filing 264 USCA Order consolidating cases as noted.(flc)
November 13, 2013 Filing 263 USCA Order denying Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Re: CNX Gas Attachment: #1 Order denying Motion for Stay Re: Buckhorn Coal) (ejs).
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting re #261 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Rep Responses due by 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/12/13. (ejs)
November 11, 2013 Filing 261 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Reply Briefs by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 5, 2013 Filing 260 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Accounting. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 1998 VGOB Hearing Transcript (excerpts), #2 Exhibit 2 - Addison Deposition (excerpts), #3 Exhibit 3 - June 2006 VGOB Minutes, #4 Exhibit 4 - September 2006 VGOB Minutes, #5 Exhibit 5 - September 2006 VGOB Hearing Transcript, #6 Exhibit 6 - CNX Gas Collection Data, #7 Exhibit 7 - April 2008 VGOB Minutes, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 2008 VGOB Minutes, #9 Exhibit 9 - December 2008 VGOB Work Committee Meeting Transcript, #10 Exhibit 10 - March 2009 VGOB Minutes, #11 Exhibit 11 - 2007 CNX Gas Collection, #12 Exhibit 12 - December 2009 VGOB Minutes)(Lorish, Lisa)
November 5, 2013 Filing 259 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Ownership. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Anita Duty, #2 Exhibit 2 - Harrison-Wyatt Severance Deed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Harrison-Wyatt Severance Deed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Commonwealth Coal Corp Letter)(Lorish, Lisa)
November 5, 2013 Filing 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Buckhorn Lease, #2 Exhibit Commonwealth Lease, #3 Exhibit Harrison-Wyatt Lease, #4 Exhibit Opinion Letter (May 2, 2013), #5 Exhibit Addison Deposition, #6 Exhibit Pooling Order, #7 Exhibit Addison Severance Deed, #8 Exhibit Hale Severance Deed, #9 Exhibit Harrison-Wyatt Mineral Cards, #10 Exhibit Commonwealth Abstract of Title, #11 Exhibit Hearing Transcript (August 23, 2013))(Gardner, Blair)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER denying #245 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part re #247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions ( Responses due by 11/5/2013); denying #248 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/17/13. (ejs)
October 16, 2013 Filing 255 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2013 re #248 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Harrison-Wyatt, LLC, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Buckhorn Coal Company, #245 MOTION to Stay Pending Interlocutory Review filed by CNX Gas Company LLC, #247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
October 16, 2013 Filing 254 Notice of Permission to Appeal by Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP (Attachments: #1 Petition)(ejs)
October 16, 2013 Filing 253 Notice of Permission to Appeal by CNX Gas (Attachments: #1 Petition/Corporate Disclosure)(ejs)
October 16, 2013 Filing 252 Letter to the Court re: courtesy copies of pleadings by Doris Betty Addison (lml)
October 16, 2013 Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 9/12/13 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2014. (bad)
October 15, 2013 Filing 250 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion via Teleconference (No Interpreter requested) #248 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, #245 MOTION to Stay Pending Interlocutory Review, #247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions : Motion Hearing via Teleconference set for 10/16/2013 at 4:00 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. *COURT REPORTER REQUIRED* (flc)
October 15, 2013 Filing 249 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #248 MOTION to Stay Proceedings . filed by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
October 15, 2013 Filing 248 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Gardner, Blair)
October 14, 2013 Filing 247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lorish, Lisa)
October 12, 2013 Filing 246 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #245 MOTION to Stay Pending Interlocutory Review . filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
October 12, 2013 Filing 245 MOTION to Stay Pending Interlocutory Review by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa) Modified on 10/15/2013 to remove referral text from docket entry(flc).
October 10, 2013 Filing 244 Letter Re: Mediation by Doris Betty Addison (ejs)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER setting response deadline as to #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment :(Defendant's Responses due by 10/25/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/10/13. (ejs)
October 10, 2013 Filing 242 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (McMullan, David)
October 10, 2013 Filing 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Doris Betty Addison. (McMullan, David)
October 9, 2013 Filing 240 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Shaver, Jennifer)
October 9, 2013 Filing 239 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #238 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Shaver, Jennifer)
October 9, 2013 Filing 238 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Doris Betty Addison. (Shaver, Jennifer)
October 9, 2013 Filing 237 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seltz, Daniel)
October 9, 2013 Filing 236 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 9, 2013 Filing 235 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 3, 2013 Filing 234 Letter from Judge Sargent to counsel regarding her availability for settlement conference. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting #118 Motion to Certify Class; and adopting #204 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/30/13. (ejs)
September 25, 2013 Filing 232 Letter response to Plaintiffs' 9/16/13 letter by CNX Gas Company LLC (Lorish, Lisa)
September 16, 2013 Filing 231 Letter regarding proposed class definitions by Doris Betty Addison (Seltz, Daniel)
September 16, 2013 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lindsey Shaver on behalf of Doris Betty Addison (Shaver, Jennifer)
September 12, 2013 Filing 229 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Settlement Conference held on 9/12/2013 with counsel for plaintiffs and for CNX. (PMS)
September 12, 2013 Filing 228 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Oral Argument Hearing held on 9/12/2013. Matters were taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert, OCR.) (flc)
September 9, 2013 Filing 227 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Telephone Conference held on 9/9/2013 with Counsel Shaver and Blank scheduling Settlement Conference for 1:30 p.m. September 12, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Sargent. (PMS)
September 6, 2013 Filing 226 NOTICE by CNX Gas Company LLC re #212 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lorish, Lisa)
August 30, 2013 Filing 225 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2013 before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judy Webb, Telephone number 540-857-5100 X 5333/judyw@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2013. (jw)
August 19, 2013 Filing 224 Response re #217 Amended Answer to Complaint (Pl's Response to Def CNX's CounterClaim. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Barrett, Charles)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER that the issues raised in MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents #200 filed by Robinson Farmer Cox Associates, PLLC are resolved, and no adjudication by this Court is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/5/13. (ejs)
August 1, 2013 Filing 222 AFFIDAVIT re #220 Response, #211 Objection to Report and Recommendations, On Motions for Class Certification by Doris Betty Addison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cox-Kidd Deposition, #2 Exhibit Duty Deposition, #3 Exhibit BCH-W Discovery Responses)(McMullan, David)
August 1, 2013 Filing 221 Notice of Correction - Per request of counsel, Jen Shaver, Docket Entry 221 deleted as it contained confidential information. Document to be refiled by counsel. (ejs)
July 31, 2013 Filing 220 Response re #211 Objection to Report and Recommendations, On Motions for Class Certification. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (McMullan, David)
July 31, 2013 Filing 219 AFFIDAVIT re #212 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, on Motions for Class Certification by Doris Betty Addison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Seltz, Daniel)
July 31, 2013 Filing 218 Response re #212 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, on Motions for Class Certification. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 28, 2013 Filing 217 AMENDED ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
July 25, 2013 Filing 216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Telephone conference held with Counsel Moffet and Blank on 7/25/2013 regarding scheduling of settlement conference. (PMS)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #193 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer; party shall file amended answer within 7 days of date of entry of this order; plt. shall file responsive pleading to the counterclaims within 21 days of the date of filing of the amended answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/22/13. (flc)
July 18, 2013 Filing 214 FTR Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Abingdon Division held before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/18/13. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Ella Surber (ejs)
July 18, 2013 Filing 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2013 re #193 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim filed by CNX Gas Company LLC, #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
July 3, 2013 Filing 212 OBJECTION to #204 Report and Recommendations by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AZ109 Repooling Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - EE24 Supplemental Pooling Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stuart Buckhorn Deed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Master Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Jason L. Mumford, #6 Exhibit 6 - VGOB Work Cmte. Trans. Dec. 18, 2008, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pla. Interrog. Response Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 8 - Heirs of Deskins Leases, #9 Exhibit 9 - Jessee Lease)(Lorish, Lisa)
July 3, 2013 Filing 211 OBJECTION to #204 Report and Recommendations by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addison Deposition Testimony, #2 Exhibit Example E-Mail, #3 Exhibit Example Pooling Designations, #4 Exhibit Circuit Court Scheduling Order)(Gardner, Blair)
June 17, 2013 Filing 210 NOTICE of Hearing on #193 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim, #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions : (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 209 NOTICE of Hearing on #200 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 208 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 7/18/2013 01:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 207 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing set for 9/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 CONSENT ORDER extending deadlines as to #204 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative filed by Doris Betty Addison :( Objections to R&R due by 7/3/2013; Replies due by 7/31/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/10/13. (flc)
June 5, 2013 Filing 205 Letter to counsel from Magistrate Judge Sargent regarding pending motions. (PMS)
June 5, 2013 Filing 204 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative filed by Doris Betty Addison. Objections to R&R due by 6/24/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/5/13. (Bordwine, Robin)
May 22, 2013 Filing 203 AFFIDAVIT re #202 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz In Support Of Plaintiffs Response To Non-Party Robinson, Farmer, Cox Associates, Pllcs Objection And Motion To Quash Plaintiffs Subpoena To Produce Documents by Doris Betty Addison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Seltz, Daniel)
May 22, 2013 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #200 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents . filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Order to Respond to Non-Party Robinson, Farmer, Cox Associates' Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena #200 . Plaintiff's responses due by 5/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/14/13. (Bordwine, Robin)
May 10, 2013 Filing 200 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents by Robinson Farmer Cox Associates, PLLC. (Schlichting, Nancy)
April 11, 2013 Filing 199 Correspondence to and from counsel and Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
March 11, 2013 Filing 198 Response re #196 Letter Providing Notice of Supplemental Authority. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
March 6, 2013 Filing 197 REPLY to Response to Motion re #193 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim)(Lorish, Lisa)
February 28, 2013 Filing 196 Letter for Submitting United States Supreme Court Authority by Doris Betty Addison (Seltz, Daniel)
February 27, 2013 Filing 195 RESPONSE to Motion re #193 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim and Memorandum In Support Thereof. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (McMullan, David)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER setting response deadline to #193 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim #193 filed by CNX Gas Company LLC, (Plaintiff's Responses due by 2/28/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/14/13. (ejs)
February 13, 2013 Filing 193 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim)(Lorish, Lisa)
February 11, 2013 Filing 192 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions Hearing held on 11/30/12 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2013. (bad)
January 17, 2013 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2012 before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judy Webb, Telephone number 540-857-5100 X 5333/judyw@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2013. (jw)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE ORDER granting #179 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/14/13. (PMS)
January 11, 2013 Filing 189 NOTICE by Doris Betty Addison of Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production of Documents to Harrison-Wyatt, LLC (Herrington, Brian)
January 11, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE by Doris Betty Addison of Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production of Documents to Commonwealth Coal Corporation (Herrington, Brian)
January 11, 2013 Filing 187 NOTICE by Doris Betty Addison of Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production of Documents to Buckhorn Coal Company (Herrington, Brian)
December 21, 2012 Filing 186 Response re #184 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to CNX Gas Company, LLC's Notice of Supplemental Authority. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
December 20, 2012 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by Doris Betty Addison for proceedings held on 11/30/12 reported by Court Reporter Dickert before Judge Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter:. Transcript due by 1/22/2013. (Barrett, Charles) Modified on 1/3/2013 (bkd). Order for copies cancelled by party. Court Reporter notfied.
December 18, 2012 Filing 184 Additional Argument by CNX Gas Company LLC re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative, #181 Additional Evidence (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Soutter v. Equifax))(Blank, Jonathan)
December 18, 2012 Filing 183 Notice of Correction re #179 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Class Certification Motion - Exhibit A contained a typographical error in the footnote 4 on page 10; at request of counsel pleading has been corrected and replaced by clerk (ejs)
December 17, 2012 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by Doris Betty Addison for proceedings held on 6/4/2012 reported by Court Reporter Felicia Clark before Judge Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter:. Transcript due by 1/16/2013. (Barrett, Charles)
December 7, 2012 Filing 181 Additional Argument by Doris Betty Addison Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Seltz, Daniel) Modified on 12/11/2012 - text corrected at the direction of Judge Sargent to reflect Additional Argument instead of Additional Evidence (ejs).
November 30, 2012 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2012 re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert, OCR.) (ejs)
November 28, 2012 Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Class Certification Motion by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sur-Reply), #2 Exhibit 1 to Sur-Reply, #3 Exhibit 2 to Sur-Reply, #4 Exhibit 3 to Sur-Reply, #5 Exhibit 4 to Sur-Reply, #6 Exhibit 5 to Sur-Reply, #7 Exhibit 6 to Sur-Reply)(Blank, Jonathan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/18/2012) (ejs). Modified on 12/18/2012 - Exhibit A contained a typographical error in the footnote 4 on page ten; at request of counsel pleading has been corrected and replaced by clerk (ejs).
November 28, 2012 Filing 178 Notice of Correction re #174 Reply to Response to Motion; clerk replaced exhibit with corrected exhibit per 176 minute order. (flc)
November 27, 2012 Filing 177 Notice of Cancellation of Motion hearing set on 11/29/12 at 2:00 p.m. (ejs)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MINUTE ORDER granting #175 MOTION to Withdraw and Replace Exhibit Unopposed Dkt No. 174. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/27/12. (PMS)
November 26, 2012 Filing 175 MOTION to Withdraw and Replace Exhibit Unopposed Dkt No. 174 by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Herrington, Brian)
November 19, 2012 Filing 174 REPLY to Response to Motion re #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions re #160 Def CNX Response. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11.6.12 Anitia Duty Depo)(Herrington, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/28/2012 per 176 minute order) (flc).
November 16, 2012 Filing 173 Response re #143 Response in Opposition to Motion,, REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Herrington, Brian)
November 16, 2012 Filing 172 Notice of Correction re #160 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #145 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition, - Documents replaced as directed in #169 Order and #170 Order (ejs)
November 16, 2012 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions (Corrected). filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Blank, Jonathan)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #166 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/16/12. (ejs)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #165 Motion to Withdraw and Replace It's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/16/12. (ejs)
November 16, 2012 Filing 168 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative Declaration of Daniel in Support with Exhibits A-GG. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG)(Seltz, Daniel)
November 16, 2012 Filing 167 REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative and for Appointment of Class Representative. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 16, 2012 Filing 166 MOTION to Amend/Correct #145 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition (UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DELETE THE LAST SENTENCE ON PAGE 32 AND FIRST SENTENCE ON PAGE 33 OF ITS OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION AND TO REPLACE PAGES 32 AND 33 WITH CORRECTED PAGES) by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Pages, #2 Proposed Consent Order)(Blank, Jonathan)
November 16, 2012 Filing 165 MOTION to Withdraw #160 Response in Opposition to Motion, (UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REPLACE OPPOSITION TO MOTION) by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Opposition to Motion, #2 Proposed Consent Order)(Blank, Jonathan)
November 15, 2012 Filing 164 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions : Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting motion for extension of time for Plaintiff to reply to #160 CNX Gas Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions. Responses due by 11/19/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/13/12. (ejs)
November 13, 2012 Filing 162 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions (Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Reply Brief) by Doris Betty Addison, CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, Jonathan)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #159 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/6/12. (ejs)
November 5, 2012 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Escrow Account Reports), #2 Exhibit 2 (Affidavit of Anita Duty), #3 Exhibit 3 (Affidavit of Jamie Cox-Kidd))(Blank, Jonathan) (Main Document 160 replaced on 11/16/2012) (ejs). Modified on 11/16/2012 - by agreement of the parties and per #169 order, document has been replaced with corrected document(ejs).
November 5, 2012 Filing 159 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Whitesell, Eric)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Motion for extension of time to respond to #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative Plaintiff's Responses due by 11/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/31/12. (ejs)
October 31, 2012 Filing 157 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply BRIEFS by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 29, 2012 Filing 156 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CNX Gas Company LLC.(Blank, Jonathan)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Set Response Deadlines to #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions :( Defendant's Responses due by 11/5/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/23/12. (ejs)
October 16, 2012 Filing 154 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Barrett, Don (John))
October 16, 2012 Filing 153 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Regarding Internal Suspense Accounts and Title Opinions by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Barrett, Don (John))
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Re: Procedure for hearing set on November 30, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/16/12. (ejs)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 OPINION and ORDER denying #128 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/15/2012. (flc)
October 3, 2012 Filing 150 Response re #147 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in further opposition to motion to dismiss. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Blank, Jonathan)
October 3, 2012 Filing 149 Sur-Reply Memorandum re #146 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Doris Betty Addison. (ejs)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/3/12. (ejs)
October 2, 2012 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in further opposition to motion to dismiss by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel) Modified on 10/3/2012 - removed referral (ejs).
September 28, 2012 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Blank, Jonathan)
September 19, 2012 Filing 145 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Blank, Jonathan) (Main Document 145 replaced on 11/16/2012) (ejs). Modified on 11/16/2012 - by agreement of the parties and by order #170 document replaced to correct pages 32 & 33 (ejs).
September 18, 2012 Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
September 14, 2012 Filing 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative. filed by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addison Deposition Testimony, #2 Exhibit Glubiak Hearing Testimony)(Gardner, Blair)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative ; Responses due by 9/19/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/12/12. (ejs)
September 12, 2012 Filing 141 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative (UNOPPOSED) by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blank, Jonathan)
September 11, 2012 Filing 140 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones and Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
September 5, 2012 Filing 139 ANSWER to #114 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Doris Betty Addison.(Herrington, Brian)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #41 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/31/2012. (JPJ)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #136 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative Responses due by 9/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/31/12. (ejs)
August 30, 2012 Filing 136 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Wood, Blair)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #128 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Responses due by 9/18/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/29/12. (ejs)
August 29, 2012 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to CNX's Motion to Dismiss] by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative; Responses due by 9/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/24/12. (ejs)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Plaintiff's Responses to Counterclaims due by 9/5/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/24/12. (ejs)
August 23, 2012 Filing 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Gardner, Blair)
August 23, 2012 Filing 130 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #114 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Doris Betty Addison.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herrington, Brian)
August 20, 2012 Filing 129 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #128 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addison Complaint-Amended Complaint Redline, #2 Exhibit May 19 2011 Letter from Brian Herrington Regarding 90 Day Notice Issue, #3 Exhibit 2011-0812 Blank to Harrington re Addison notice of breach or default)(Wood, Blair)
August 20, 2012 Filing 128 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Wood, Blair)
August 8, 2012 Filing 127 ANSWER to #113 Amended Complaint by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.(Gardner, Blair)
August 7, 2012 Filing 126 NOTICE by Doris Betty Addison re #125 Brief / Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 replacement page)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2012 Filing 125 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative -- Declaration of Larry Moffett. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative -- Declaration of Jackson White. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative -- Declaration of David Stellings. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative -- Affidavit of Peter Glubiak. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative -- Affidavit of Don Barrett. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative -- Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz with Exhibits A through M. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Seltz, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 118 MOTION to Certify Class and for Appointments of Class Counsel and Class Representative by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/3/2012. (lmh)
August 2, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Gardner, Blair)
August 2, 2012 Filing 115 Notice of Correction re #114 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim - added Harrison-Wyatt, LLC as a filer in addition to Buckhorn Coal Company. (ejs)
August 1, 2012 Filing 114 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Doris Betty Addison by Buckhorn Coal Company and Harrison-Wyatt, LLC.(ejs) Modified on 8/2/2012 to add Harrison-Wyatt, LLC as a filer (ejs).
August 1, 2012 Filing 113 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CNX Gas Company LLC, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ejs)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION AND ORDER granting #90 Motion to Intervene; granting #91 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #96 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/1/12. (sc)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/31/12. (ejs)
July 20, 2012 Filing 110 Response re #103 Response in Opposition to Motion to Commonwealth Resp to Pls Mtn to File Amd Cpt. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Probst Final Order, #2 Exhibit B - Belcher v. Swords)(Herrington, Brian)
July 20, 2012 Filing 109 Response re #101 Response in Opposition to Motion, to CNX of Pls Mtn for Leave to File Amd Cpt. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Belcher v. Swords Creek)(Herrington, Brian)
July 20, 2012 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION to Intervene, #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #68 Answer to Complaint. filed by Buckhorn Coal Company, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gardner, Blair)
July 16, 2012 Filing 107 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ejs)
July 13, 2012 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Telephone Conference from Jonathan Blank for CNX on 7/13/2012. Mr. Blank notified court that counsel had authorized him to contact court to request a couple more days to present agreed protective order to court for entry. Counsel will forward order to Judge Sargent next week. (PMS)
July 13, 2012 Filing 105 DISCOVERY LETTER re: Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Doris Betty Addison.(Moffett, Larry)
July 10, 2012 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION to Intervene, #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #68 Answer to Complaint. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pobst Opinion, #2 Exhibit Belcher Opinion)(Herrington, Brian)
July 10, 2012 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #96 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ratliff v. Harrison-Wyatt (December 6, 2002))(Gardner, Blair)
July 10, 2012 Filing 102 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #90 MOTION to Intervene, #91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #68 Answer to Complaint. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Lorish, Lisa)
July 10, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #96 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stras Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Dye Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Breedlove Deed, #4 Exhibit D - Looney Deed, #5 Exhibit E - Stiltner Deed, #6 Exhibit F - Stuart Deed, #7 Exhibit G - Jan 20, 2004 Hearing Transcript)(Lorish, Lisa)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER regarding MOTION for Entry of Consent Order #98 filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/21/12. (ejs)
June 19, 2012 Filing 99 Letter for concerning class certification briefing schedule by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 19, 2012 Filing 98 MOTION for Discovery - Motion for Entry of Consent Order by CNX Gas Company LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Lorish, Lisa)
June 15, 2012 Filing 97 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #96 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Barrett, Don (John))
June 15, 2012 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Doris Betty Addison.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit To Motion, #2 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to First Amended Complaint)(Barrett, Don (John) (ejs).
June 14, 2012 Filing 95 Notice of Correction re #90 MOTION to Intervene - Memorandum in support was attached to the motion - however, memorandum should have been docketed as a separate entry - memorandum has been deleted by Clerk and redocketed at DE 94. (ejs)
June 13, 2012 Filing 94 Memorandum in Support re #90 MOTION to Intervene. filed by Buckhorn Coal Company, Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (ejs)
June 13, 2012 Filing 93 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buckhorn Coal Company. (Gardner, Blair)
June 13, 2012 Filing 92 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harrison-Wyatt, LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
June 13, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION to Amend/Correct #68 Answer to Complaint by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Gardner, Blair)
June 13, 2012 Filing 90 MOTION to Intervene by Harrison-Wyatt, LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company. (Attachments: #2 Answer and Counterclaim)(Gardner, Blair) Modified on 6/14/2012 - deleted attachment 1 - has been redocketed by clerk at DE 94(ejs).
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER lifting any previous stay of deadlines, Setting deadline for plaintiff to file any motion to amend initial pleading by 6/15/2012; other deadlines as stated in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/5/12. (ejs)
June 4, 2012 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2012. (Court Reporter Felicia Clark, FTR.) (flc)
May 25, 2012 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Telephone Conference held on 5/23/2012 with Barret, Blank and Creekmore regarding settlement. Parties at impasse. Court will set scheduling conference for 2 p.m. on June 4, 2012. Judge Sargent meet with parties with regard to settlement after conference. (PMS)
May 25, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2012 02:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
May 15, 2012 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Settlement Conference held with plaintiffs' counsel and counsel for CNX, collectively and in private, by telephone conference call on 5/14/2012. Counsel reported on status of settlement negotiations. Counsel for plaintiffs' and CNX will consult and confer again with Judge Sargent by Thursday, May 17. (PMS)
May 7, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Hearing (CONFERENCE CALL): Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2012 03:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
May 4, 2012 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Settlement Conference held on 5/4/2012. Compromise settlement not reached but discussions will continue tomorrow. (PMS)
May 3, 2012 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Settlement Conference held on 5/3/2012. Compromise settlement not reached. Discussions will continue. Counsel will report progress to Magistrate Judge Sargent by telephone conference call scheduled for 3 p.m. on May 14, 2012. (PMS) Modified on 5/7/2012 - corrected date hearing was held to reflect 5/3/12 instead of 5/4/12 (ejs).
April 27, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2012 at 10:00 AM and 5/4/2012 at 9:30 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
April 19, 2012 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Status Conference held via CC on 4/19/2012. Court will refer cases to Judge Sargent for mediation. Orders to follow. (Court Reporter N/A.) (lmh)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Minute Order. This case is hereby referred to the Honorable Pamela Meade Sargent, U.S. Magistrate Judge, to mediate the case with the parties. Judge Sargent will schedule a mediation hearing and advise the parties of the procedures to be followed in connection therewith. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 4/19/2012. (JPJ)
April 18, 2012 Filing 78 Notice Rescheduling Hearing previously set for 4/18/2012 at 3:00 PM before Judge James P. Jones in Abingdon: Status Conference via cc reset for 4/19/2012 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones.(Court Reporter Not Required) (lmh)
April 4, 2012 Filing 77 Notice Rescheduling Hearing previously set for 4/5/2012 at 4:30 PM before Judge James P. Jones in Abingdon: Status Conference reset via CC for 4/18/2012 03:00 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (Court Reporter Not Required)(lmh)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER removing Brian Wheeler as counsel of record for CNX Gas Company, LLC, Attorney Brian Scott Wheeler terminated.. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/27/12. (ejs)
February 22, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set via CC for 4/5/2012 04:30 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lmh)
February 21, 2012 Filing 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Status Conference held on 2/21/2012; Additional Status Conference set for 4/5/2012 at 4:30 PM (Court Reporter N/A.) (lmh)
February 21, 2012 Filing 73 Letter Re: Brian Wheeler by CNX Gas Company LLC. (ejs)
January 11, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set via CC for 2/21/2012 04:30 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lmh)
January 9, 2012 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Status Conference held via CC on 1/9/2012; Additional Status Conference set for 2/21/2012 at 4:30 p. m. (Court Reporter N/A.) (lmh)
November 22, 2011 Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/9/2012 04:30 PM via CC in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lmh)
November 21, 2011 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Status Conference held on 11/21/2011; Additional Status Conference set for 1/9/2012 at 4:30 p. m. via CC (Court Reporter N/A.) (lmh)
October 12, 2011 Filing 68 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commonwealth Coal Corporation.(Gardner, Blair)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER staying all current deadlines set forth in #64 Order as to CNX Gas Company, LLC. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/11/2011. (lmh)
October 12, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference via CC set for 11/21/2011 at 04:30 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lmh)
October 11, 2011 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Status Conference via CC held on 10/11/2011; Court agrees to stay deadlines. Additional status conference via CC set for 11/21/11 at 4:30 p. m. (Court Reporter N/A.) (lmh)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER fully adopting/accepting #44 Report and Recommendations; granting #57 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/28/2011. (lmh)
August 2, 2011 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Court Hearing held on 8/2/2011 on objections to amended Report and Recommendation. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (aec)
June 24, 2011 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Strike #56 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 23, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Strike #56 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Wheeler, Brian)
June 17, 2011 Filing 59 Brief/Memorandum Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Objections. filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Gardner, Blair)
June 17, 2011 Filing 58 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #57 MOTION to Strike #56 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 17, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION to Strike #56 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition by Doris Betty Addison. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 17, 2011 Filing 56 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #53 Response,, to CNX's Objections to the Report and Recommendation. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Wheeler, Brian)
June 14, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing set for 8/2/2011 10:30 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones on objections to report and recommendation(aec)
June 10, 2011 Filing 54 Response re #49 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint PursuaREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursua. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Herrington, Brian)
June 10, 2011 Filing 53 Response re #51 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint PursuaREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursua. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Herrington, Brian)
June 10, 2011 Filing 52 Response re #51 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #50 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint PursuaREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursua. filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Wood, Blair)
May 27, 2011 Filing 51 OBJECTION to #44 Report and Recommendations of May 13th by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compl. Pobst v. Garden Realty Corp., #2 Exhibit Order Dismissing CNX from Pobst, #3 Exhibit Compl. Rasnake v. CNX, #4 Exhibit Voluntary Nonsuit Order of CNX from Rasnake)(Wood, Blair)
May 27, 2011 Filing 50 OBJECTION to #44 Report and Recommendations by Doris Betty Addison. (Herrington, Brian)
May 27, 2011 Filing 49 OBJECTION to #44 Report and Recommendations by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Gardner, Blair)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORAL ORDER withdrawing #37 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/17/11. (ejs)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORAL ORDER granting #45 Motion to Withdraw the #37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/17/11. (ejs)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORAL ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: #45 MOTION to Withdraw #37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Doris Betty Addison. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on May 17, 2011. (aec)
May 16, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw #37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint by Doris Betty Addison. (Barrett, Don (John))
May 13, 2011 Filing 44 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. Objections to R&R due by 5/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/13/11. (Bordwine, Robin)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order to Vacate #41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss; #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/13/11. (lmh)
May 13, 2011 Filing 42 Letter for clarification re: report and recommendation by Doris Betty Addison. (lmh)
May 11, 2011 Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. Objections to R&R due by 5/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/11/11. (Bordwine, Robin) Vacated by Order entered at #43 on 5/13/11 Modified on 5/13/2011 to add vacated text (lmh).
May 9, 2011 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Telephone Conference held on 5/9/2011 with counsel for plaintiff and CNX regarding motion to amend complaint. Parties agree that motion to amend does not affect pending motions to dismiss. Court will decide motions to dismiss first before addressing motion to amend complaint. Counsel agree 5/9/11 hearing on motions to dismiss are not necessary and motions may be decided on briefs. CNX counsel Blank will contact counsel for Commonwealth to ensure no need for hearing. (pms)
May 9, 2011 Filing 39 Notice of Cancellation of Motion hearing set on 5/9/11 at 1:00 p.m. (ejs)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Doris Betty Addison Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent.. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on 5/9/11. (lmh)
May 6, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Barrett, Don (John))
May 6, 2011 Filing 36 Notice of Correction - Docket entry #36 - Attorney failed to attach exhibit and proposed complaint - entry deleted by Clerk at request of attorney - Attorney will redocket the entry and add attachments. (ejs)
March 31, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7), #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) : Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2011 01:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
March 21, 2011 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7). filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Cloud, Meghan)
March 10, 2011 Filing 33 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #30 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition. filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Gardner, Blair)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Consent Order regarding extension of time; defendant's reply brief due by 3/21/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/10/11. (lmh)
March 4, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Scott Wheeler on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC (Wheeler, Brian)
March 3, 2011 Filing 30 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7), #17 Brief / Memorandum in Support. filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Herrington, Brian)
March 3, 2011 Filing 29 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #13 Brief / Memorandum in Support,, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7). filed by Doris Betty Addison. (Herrington, Brian)
February 21, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Todd Blank on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC (Blank, Jonathan)
February 21, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Mitchell Cloud on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC (Cloud, Meghan)
February 17, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Creekmore on behalf of CNX Gas Company LLC (Creekmore, James)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) Responses due by 3/3/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/31/11. (lmh)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) Responses due by 3/3/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/31/11. (lmh)
January 28, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffett, Larry)
January 28, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffett, Larry)
January 20, 2011 Filing 21 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commonwealth Coal Corporation . (Gardner, Blair)
January 19, 2011 Filing 20 Notice of Filing Deficiency - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement as to Commonwealth Coal Corporation - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are now directed to file the above statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. We ask that you comply with this rule change in the future. The corporate disclosure statement form is available on our public website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov. The form is located under forms on this web page. This form should be electronically filed in this matter within three (3) business days. (aec)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Referring #16 Motion to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Sargent and whatever else the order states. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on January 19, 2011. (aec)
January 18, 2011 Filing 17 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7). filed by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Whitesell, Eric)
January 18, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Whitesell, Eric)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CNX Gas Company LLC Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/18/11. (lmh)
January 18, 2011 Filing 14 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNX Gas Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent CONSOL Energy Inc. for CNX Gas Company LLC.. (Wood, Blair)
January 18, 2011 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7). filed by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wade v. Hugh MacRae Land Trust, #2 Exhibit Pooling Order AA-38, #3 Exhibit Pooling Order Y-37, #4 Exhibit Pooling Order Z-37, #5 Exhibit Pooling Order Z-38, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Lease, #7 Exhibit Ratliff v. Harrison-Wyatt, Opinion, #8 Exhibit Ratliff v. Harrison-Wyatt, Order)(Wood, Blair)
January 18, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(b)(7) by CNX Gas Company LLC. (Wood, Blair)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/15/10. (ejs)
December 14, 2010 Filing 10 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Larry D. Moffett, Don Barrett, Brian Herrington, Katherine B. Riley, David M. McMullan, Jr., Elizabeth J. Cabraser, David S. Stellings, Steven E. Fineman, Daniel E. Seltz, Jennifer Gross, Elizabeth A. Alexander, Richard R. Barrett, and Charles F. Barrett by Doris Betty Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Glubiak, Peter)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 12/10/10. (lmh)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on December 9, 2010. (aec)
December 9, 2010 Filing 7 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time - Modified docket entry as counsel had linked motion to incorrect document. (aec)
December 9, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitesell, Eric) Modified on 12/9/2010 as counsel linked motion to incorrect document (aec).
December 8, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Commonwealth Coal Corporation. (Whitesell, Eric) (Main Document 5 replaced with counsel signature on 12/8/2010;) (lmh).
December 2, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Betty Addison. Commonwealth Coal Corporation served on 11/19/2010, answer due 12/10/2010.(Glubiak, Peter)
November 9, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth Coal Corporation.(lmh)
November 9, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CNX Gas Company LLC.(lmh)
November 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CNX Gas Company LLC, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, John Does A-Z (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt #0423-1202444), filed by Doris Betty Addison. 100 Day Notice due by 2/17/2011 120 Day Service due by 3/9/2011 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. CNX Gas Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Betty Addison
Represented By: Brian Herrington
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: David Malcom McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Don (John) William Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Jackson Stuart White, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Gross
Represented By: Larry D. Moffett
Represented By: Peter Gerard Glubiak
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Sara Katherine Riley
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Represented By: Jennifer Lindsey Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNX Gas Company LLC
Represented By: James Robert Creekmore
Represented By: James Francis Neale
Represented By: Larissa L. Paule-Carres Sneathern
Represented By: Blair N. C. Wood
Represented By: Brian Scott Wheeler
Represented By: Jonathan Todd Blank
Represented By: Lisa M. Lorish
Represented By: Meghan Mitchell Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Coal Corporation
Represented By: Eric Dwight Whitesell
Represented By: Blair Martin Gardner
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison-Wyatt, LLC
Represented By: Eric Dwight Whitesell
Represented By: Blair Martin Gardner
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckhorn Coal Company
Represented By: Eric Dwight Whitesell
Represented By: Blair Martin Gardner
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?