Plum Creek Timberlands, L.P. v. Yellow Poplar Lumber Company, Inc., et al. et al

Case Number: 1:2013cv00062
Filed: July 31, 2013
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P. Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2016 446 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER denying 330 the Range/EQT Motion for Summary Judgment; the Plum Creek/Highland Motion for Summary Judgment 341 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, being granted as to Range/EQTs claim solely based upon ownership of th e coal estate and otherwise denied; the Baker/Trivett/McGlothlin Motion for Summary Judgment 338 and the Motion for Summary Judgment by the Unknown Descendants, etc., of G. W. Charles, et al. 339 are DENIED. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/30/2016. (lml)
November 21, 2016 431 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER on Motion to Exclude granting in part and denying in part 332 ; on Motion to Exclude granting in part and denying in part 336 . Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/21/2016. (lml)
November 10, 2016 428 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 330 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 338 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 339 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 341 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/10/16. (flc)
August 24, 2015 397 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER adding John M. Lamie, Trustee for Yellow Poplar Lumber Company as a party defendant; the trustee must file responsive pleadings within 14 days from the date of entry of this order; and directing the clerk to schedule a hearing on all pending motions. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/24/15. (flc)
March 31, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Motion to Remand (ECF 6-4, page 698); Denying Plum Creek Timberlands, L.P.s Motion to Dismiss (ECF 6-2, page 398); denying Motion to Dismiss the Crossclaim of Range Resources-Pine Mountain, Inc. (ECF 6-5, page 809); Denyin g Motion to Dismiss the Crossclaim of Range Resources-Pine Mountain, Inc. (ECF 6-5, page 843); Denying Plum Creek Timberlands, L.P's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendants Edwin F. Legard, Jr., Anne Cox, Trustee and William G. Baker, Jr. T rustee and Memorandum in Support (ECF 6-6, page 932); Denying Defendants Matthew Trivett and Michael Trivett's Motion to Dismiss the Crossclaim of Range Resources-Pine Mountain, Inc. (ECF No. 6-6, page 967): Denying Plum Creek Timberlands, L.P.s Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim ofDefendants Donald A. McGlothlin, Jr., Mary L. Burton, Leah A. McGlothlin and Kevin T. McGlothlin and Memorandum in Support (ECF No. 6-6, page 1038); Denying Plum Creek Timberlands, L.P.s Motion to Dismiss Counterclai m of Defendants Matthew Trivett and Michael Trivett and Memorandum in Support (ECF No. 5); Denying Defendant Charles S. Bartletts Motion to Dismiss the Crossclaim of Range Resources-Pine Mountain, Inc. (ECF No. 76). Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/31/2014. (lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plum Creek Timberlands, L.P. v. Yellow Poplar Lumber Company, Inc., et al. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?