Harleysville Insurance Company v. Holding Funeral Home, Inc. et al

Case Number: 1:2015cv00057
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P. Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Objections to the magistrate judge's Order 69 ; granting 70 Objections to the magistrate judge's Order 69 , and the magistrate judge's Order imposing monetary sanctions 100 is VACATED; Granting 106 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/2/17. (flc)
July 28, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 07/28/2017. (Bordwine, Robin)
May 19, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that an evidentiary hearing be set and directing the Clerk to schedule such hearing at the parties earliest convenience. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 5/19/2017. (lml)
February 9, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 02/09/2017. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 8, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/8/16. (sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Insurance Company v. Holding Funeral Home, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?