Leali v. St. Pierre et al
Plaintiff: Nader Leali
Defendant: K & B Transport, Inc. and William Joseph St. Pierre
Case Number: 1:2019cv00018
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) : Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 and 5/6/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (flc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 and 5/6/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/12/19. (flc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by K & B Transport, Inc., Nader Leali, William Joseph St. Pierre. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent (flc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Webb and Jebo on 7/12/2019. Jury trial set in AB before U.S. Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent for 5/5-6/20. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS) Modified on 7/12/2019 to correct docket text to reflect the jury trial will be held before Judge Sargent(flc).
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiff Nader Leali (Webb, Dale)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by K & B Transport, Inc., William Joseph St. Pierre (Jebo, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Paper State Court Records received from Washington County Circuit Court, CL19-190, consisting of Complaint; Plaintiff's Interogatories; Official Receipt; Plaintiff's Interogatories; Cover Letter; Answer by Defendants; Cover Letter pertaining to extension of time; Notice of Filing Removal; Agreed Extension Order, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (flc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2019 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/22/19. (flc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (flc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number CL19-190. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt #: 0423-3147231), filed by K & B Transport, Inc., William Joseph St. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Washington County Circuit Court - Complaint, #3 Washington County Circuit Court - Notice of Service, #4 Washington County Circuit Court - Answer, #5 Washington County Circuit Court - Notice of Filing Removal)(flc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leali v. St. Pierre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K & B Transport, Inc.
Represented By: James Rhea Jebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Joseph St. Pierre
Represented By: James Rhea Jebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nader Leali
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gick
Represented By: Dale Wade Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?