Cook v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ruby Gail Cook
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00031
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 Response re #21 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff of Trial by Jury. filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Stallard, William)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE Order to Respond re #21 Notice (Other) Defendant's Response due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 08/27/19. (PMS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Ruby Gail Cook Trial by Jury (Jessee, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 & 7/15/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ejs)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 & 7/15/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/26/19. (ejs)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE Order to Amend/Correct Complaint [1-2] Paragraph No. 7 to correct alleged injury date to August 2, 2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 08/26/19. (PMS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held with Counsel Jessee, Coughlin and Stallard by telephone conference call on 8/26/2019. Oral motion made by plaintiff's counsel to amend the Complaint to change the date of alleged injury in Paragraph No. 7 to August 2, 2015. Defendant does not object to amendment, and motion will be granted. Case set for bench trial before Judge Jones in AB on 7/14-15/19. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed in state court 8/9/19 (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Answer filed in state court on 8/6/19)(ejs)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court Washington County, Virginia, 18-2077, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ejs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Stallard, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Paper State Court Records received from Washington County Circuit Court, 191CL18002077, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ejs)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute Order. There being no objection, the name of the defendant is changed to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. The Clerk shall make such change on the docket of this case. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/16/2019. (JPJ)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel D. Coughlin for Ruby Gail Cook added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/16/19. (ejs)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Ruby Gail Cook NO Objection to name change of Defendant (Jessee, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Daniel D. Coughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3206860. by Ruby Gail Cook. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jessee, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Joint Rule 26(f) Report due 8/23/2019. (Bordwine, Robin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.. (Stallard, William)
August 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Minute Order. In its Answer, Defendant states that the correct defendant entity is Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, rather than Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. Plaintiff must advise the court within 7 days if she has any objection to an amendment of the name of Defendant in this case. In addition, Defendant has filed a Disclosure form, ECF No. 5, that indicates that it has no parent, grandparent, or great grandparent corporation and that no other publicly held corporation that has a direct financial interest in the outcome of the litigation. Defendant must file an explanation within 7 days of Defendant's connection, if any, to the publicly held corporation Walmart, Inc. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/10/2019. (JPJ)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ar)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 08/09/2019. (ar)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. (ar)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. (ar)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number CL18-2077. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3201121), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Answer)(ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Gail Cook
Represented By: John Edward Jessee
Represented By: Daniel Dominic Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?