Abraham v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Lorraine Abraham
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00036
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. Discovery and all pretrial deadlines are hereby STAYED until November 15, 2019. The parties are further DIRECTED to submit a status report to the Court no later than November 22, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on September 30, 2019. (sfc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated; Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson & Company for C R Bard Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/20/19. (flc)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard B. North by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Marshall Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing parties to submit Proposed Pretrial Order, due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Judge Moon Standard Pretrial Order)(mka)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Order. This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Norman K. Moon, Senior United States District Judge. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/13/2019. (JPJ)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 MDL Lead - Certified Docket with Attachments - PART 3 - (Attachments: #1 Docket Entry 10947, #2 Docket Entry 11011, #3 Docket Entry 11041, #4 Docket Entry 11064, #5 Docket Entry 11073, #6 Docket Entry 11080, #7 Docket Entry 11082, #8 Docket Entry 11256, #9 Docket Entry 11313, #10 Docket Entry 11320, #11 Docket Entry 11321, #12 Docket Entry 11659, #13 Docket Entry 11871, #14 Docket Entry 12007, #15 Docket Entry 12061, #16 Docket Entry 12202, #17 Docket Entry 12357, #18 Docket Entry 12507, #19 Docket Entry 12508, #20 Docket Entry 12533, #21 Docket Entry 12589, #22 Docket Entry 12590, #23 Docket Entry 12593, #24 Docket Entry 12595, #25 Docket Entry 12598, #26 Docket Entry 12830, #27 Docket Entry 12853, #28 Docket Entry 12971, #29 Docket Entry 13329, #30 Docket Entry 15098, #31 Docket Entry 15176, #32 Docket Entry 16343, #33 Docket Entry 16992, #34 Docket Entry 17008, #35 Docket Entry 17285, #36 Docket Entry 17386, #37 Docket Entry 17401, #38 Docket Entry 17494, #39 Docket Entry 17513, #40 Docket Entry 17582, #41 Docket Entry 18038)(flc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MDL Lead - Certified Docket with Attachments - PART 2 - (Attachments: #1 Docket Entry 5770, #2 Docket Entry 5881, #3 Docket Entry 5883, #4 Docket Entry 6227, #5 Docket Entry 6799, #6 Docket Entry 8113, #7 Docket Entry 8315, #8 Docket Entry 8871, #9 Docket Entry 8872, #10 Docket Entry 8874, #11 Docket Entry 9415, #12 Docket Entry 9428, #13 Docket Entry 9432, #14 Docket Entry 9433, #15 Docket Entry 9434, #16 Docket Entry 9770, #17 Docket Entry 9771, #18 Docket Entry 9772, #19 Docket Entry 9773, #20 Docket Entry 9775, #21 Docket Entry 9861, #22 Docket Entry 9881, #23 Docket Entry 9991, #24 Docket Entry 10051, #25 Docket Entry 10052, #26 Docket Entry 10072, #27 Docket Entry 10075, #28 Docket Entry 10230, #29 Docket Entry 10231, #30 Docket Entry 10235, #31 Docket Entry 10258, #32 Docket Entry 10323, #33 Docket Entry 10348, #34 Docket Entry 10382, #35 Docket Entry 10403, #36 Docket Entry 10404, #37 Docket Entry 10438, #38 Docket Entry 10486, #39 Docket Entry 10489, #40 Docket Entry 10497, #41 Docket Entry 10524, #42 Docket Entry 10587, #43 Docket Entry 10819, #44 Docket Entry 10920, #45 Docket Entry 10922)(flc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MDL Lead - Certified Docket with Attachments - PART 1 - (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Submission, #2 Docket Entry 248, #3 Docket Entry 249, #4 Docket Entry 269, #5 Docket Entry 303-2, #6 Docket Entry 314, #7 Docket Entry 363, #8 Docket Entry 364, #9 Docket Entry 365, #10 Docket Entry 366, #11 Docket Entry 372, #12 Docket Entry 401, #13 Docket Entry 519, #14 Docket Entry 699, #15 Docket Entry 927, #16 Docket Entry 1108, #17 Docket Entry 1153-1, #18 Docket Entry 1153-2, #19 Docket Entry 1259, #20 Docket Entry 1319, #21 Docket Entry 1485, #22 Docket Entry 1662, #23 Docket Entry 1663, #24 Docket Entry 2238, #25 Docket Entry 2239, #26 Docket Entry 2813, #27 Docket Entry 3214, #28 Docket Entry 3215, #29 Docket Entry 3272, #30 Docket Entry 3312, #31 Docket Entry 3313, #32 Docket Entry 3314, #33 Docket Entry 3372, #34 Docket Entry 3398, #35 Docket Entry 3685, #36 Docket Entry 4015, #37 Docket Entry 4016, #38 Docket Entry 4141, #39 Docket Entry 4311, #40 Docket Entry 4335, #41 Docket Entry 4339, #42 Docket Entry 4865, #43 Docket Entry 4866, #44 Docket Entry 5007, #45 Docket Entry 5285)(flc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03240. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #5 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3240-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Lorraine Abraham. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13426869 filed by Lorraine Abraham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Abraham
Represented By: Jeff Thomas Seldomridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?