Ratliff et al v. CMH Homes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Brandon Ratliff and Letisha Dawn Ratliff
Defendant: CMH Services, Inc., CMH Homes, Inc. and Southern Energy Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Voluntary Dismiss. Defendant CMH Services, Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice, and it is ORDERED that Southern Energy Homes, Inc. is joined in this matter as a party defendant. It is ORDERED that Southern Energy Homes, Inc. shall have 21 days, from the entry of this order, to file responsive pleadings, including its Consent to Removal. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/24/2019. (ar)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Letter (mka)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss by Derrick Brandon Ratliff, Letisha Dawn Ratliff. (Scott, Thomas)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Judge James P. Jones no longer assigned to case. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on 11/22/19. (flc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jessee, Roy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Paper State Court Records received from Buchanan County Circuit Court, CL 19-697, consisting of Supplemental filing - Affidavit for Service, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (lml)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Paper State Court Records received from Buchanan County Circuit Court, CL 19-697, consisting of Complaint, Cover Sheet, Affidavit For Sercice, Process of Service, Notice of Removal, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (lml) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/15/2019) (lml).
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Derrick Brandon Ratliff, Letisha Dawn Ratliff (Scott, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (lml)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMH Homes, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clayton Homes, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent CMH Capital, Inc. for CMH Homes, Inc.. (Jessee, Roy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Jessee, Roy)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Buchanan County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/15/2019. (lml)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Buchanan County Circuit Court, case number CL19-697. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, Receipt #0423-3247212), filed by CMH Homes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint State Court, #2 Certificate of Existence CMH Homes Inc., #3 Certificate of Existence CMH Services Inc., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratliff et al v. CMH Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Brandon Ratliff
Represented By: Thomas Ralph Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letisha Dawn Ratliff
Represented By: Thomas Ralph Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Mark Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Energy Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Mark Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?