Stacy et al v. Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clifford Allen and Charlie Stacy
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc., Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc. and Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00015
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tucci, Robert)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 05/27/2021. (ar)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC., Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc., Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clair, Bethany)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/27/21. (ejs)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2021 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to confer regarding discovery and to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 6/29/2021.(rb)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3710024. by Clifford Allen, Charlie Stacy. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mundaca, Francisco)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Cancellation of Scheduling Conference scheduled for 5/24/21 at 1:30 p.m. Scheduling Conference will be set at a later date. (rb)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M Bernas on behalf of Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC., Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc., Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc. (Bernas, Kenneth)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlie Stacy, Clifford Allen. Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC. served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021.(Greenberg, Gregg)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Continue Scheduling Conference by Clifford Allen, Charlie Stacy. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mundaca, Francisco)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin P Fryer on behalf of Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC., Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc., Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc. (Fryer, Benjamin)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2021 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to confer regarding discovery and to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 5/21/2021. (rb)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlie Stacy, Clifford Allen. Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc. served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021.(Greenberg, Gregg)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlie Stacy, Clifford Allen. Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc. served on 4/13/2021, answer due 5/4/2021.(Greenberg, Gregg)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/6/21. (ejs)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Benjamin P. Fryer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3693107. by Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC., Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc., Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clair, Bethany)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Frank Calandra, Inc., Corporate Parent Calandra Group, Corporate Parent Chemstream Holdings LLC for Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC.. (Clair, Bethany)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Frank Calandra, Inc. for Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc.. (Clair, Bethany)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Frank Calandra, Inc. for Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc.. (Clair, Bethany)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC., Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc., Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc..(Clair, Bethany)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC., Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc., Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Issued to Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc., #2 Issued to Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC)(ejs)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402.00 - Receipt # AVAWDC-367172), filed by Charlie Stacy, Clifford Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ejs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacy et al v. Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennmar Corporation of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: Bethany Patrice Clair
Represented By: Kenneth M Bernas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennmar Corporation of East Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: Bethany Patrice Clair
Represented By: Kenneth M Bernas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennmar Construction Tools, LLC.
Represented By: Benjamin P Fryer
Represented By: Bethany Patrice Clair
Represented By: Kenneth M Bernas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Allen
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Represented By: Francisco E. Mundaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Stacy
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Represented By: Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci
Represented By: Francisco E. Mundaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?