Hylton et al v. CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Hylton and Greever Asbury
Defendant: CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00029
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1104
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to CONSOL Energy, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(lml)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for CONSOL ENERGY, INC. by Greever Asbury, Donald Hylton (Petsonk, Samuel)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/28/21. (ejs)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Sam B. Petsonk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BVAWDC-3726698. by Greever Asbury, Donald Hylton. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Cromer, Mary)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSOL Energy, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number CVAWDC-3725425), filed by Donald Hylton, Greever Asbury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hylton et al v. CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hylton
Represented By: Mary Varson Cromer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greever Asbury
Represented By: Mary Varson Cromer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?