Martin v. Ballad Health
Plaintiff: David Martin
Defendant: Ballad Health
Case Number: 1:2021cv00041
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Ballad Health answer due 12/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/5/21. (ejs)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ballad Health (Sumrell, Jonathan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Martin Sumrell on behalf of Ballad Health (Sumrell, Jonathan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ballad Health. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sumrell, Jonathan)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ballad Health NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ejs)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Ballad Health by David Martin (Jarrett, Jack)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ballad Health (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402; receipt number AVAWDC-3800754.), filed by David Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ejs) Modified on 9/30/2021 - Corrected date of filing to reflect 9/29/21 instead of 9/30/21 (ejs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Ballad Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Martin
Represented By: Jack Bradley Jarrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballad Health
Represented By: Jonathan Martin Sumrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?