McClellan v. Commercial Electronics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald A. McClellan
Defendant: Commercial Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00024
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Big Stone Gap Office
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #8 MOTION to Withdraw , 13 Order on Motion to Withdraw. Follows oral order of 9/17/18; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of entry of this Order to retain substitute counsel and have that counsel enter an appearance in the case; it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's deadline for responding to the pending Motion to Dismiss #4 , is extended pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/18/18. (flc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 FTR Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Abingdon Division in CR2 held before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/17/18. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Felicia Clark, FTR (flc)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Entered by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/17/18. (flc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2018 re #8 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Ronald A. McClellan. (FTR Operator: Felicia Clark, FTR) (flc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Withdraw : (FTR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 02:30 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Withdraw . filed by Commercial Electronics, Inc.. (Loughlin, Rachael)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 Additional State Court Records from Scott County Circuit Court (ab)
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw by Ronald A. McClellan.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Collins, Anthony)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 State Court Records from Circuit Court Scott County (ejs)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court by Rachael Luzietti Loughlin on behalf of Commercial Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Loughlin, Rachael)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Commercial Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loughlin, Rachael)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Commercial Electronics, Inc.. (Loughlin, Rachael)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Scott County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 07/31/2018. (ab)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ab)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scott County Circuit Court, case number CL18-646. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-2946916), filed by Commercial Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan v. Commercial Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald A. McClellan
Represented By: Anthony E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Vijay Kumar Mago
Represented By: Rachael Luzietti Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?