Evans v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jason Evans Evans
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00027
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jason Evans Evans, Andrew M. Saul. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent (ejs)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued)(lml)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (lml)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 06/11/2021. (rb)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Evans Evans. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. #1 Application) (lml).
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Jason Evans Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Evans Evans
Represented By: Lewey Keith Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Robert S. Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?