Adkins et al v. Commonwealth Of Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Haley Marie Cantrell Adkins and Andrew Jordan Adkins
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Virginia, Paula Meade Hill Collins and Michael Meade
Case Number: 2:2021cv00031
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Andrew Jordan Adkins, Haley Marie Cantrell Adkins. (McAfee, Timothy)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Paula Meade Hill Collins, Michael Meade. (Minor, Steven)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Andrew Jordan Adkins, Haley Marie Cantrell Adkins.(McAfee, Timothy) Modified on 10/27/2021 - removed text referring motion to Judge Sargent (ejs).
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #5 Brief / Memorandum in Support . filed by Andrew Jordan Adkins, Haley Marie Cantrell Adkins. (McAfee, Timothy)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paula Meade Hill Collins, Michael Meade with Corrections (Minor, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paula Meade Hill Collins, Michael Meade (Minor, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Paula Meade Hill Collins, Michael Meade. (Minor, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Paula Meade Hill Collins, Michael Meade. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Minor, Steven)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commonwealth Of Virginia. Commonwealth Of Virginia waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021.(Kelly, Sheri)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri Hiter Kelly on behalf of Commonwealth Of Virginia (Kelly, Sheri)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402.00 ;receipt number AVAWDC-3777767 ), filed by Haley Marie Cantrell Adkins, Andrew Jordan Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ejs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins et al v. Commonwealth Of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Marie Cantrell Adkins
Represented By: Timothy Worth McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jordan Adkins
Represented By: Timothy Worth McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Virginia
Represented By: Sheri Hiter Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Meade Hill Collins
Represented By: Steven R. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meade
Represented By: Steven R. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?