Robbins v. New Bern Transport Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rosalyne C. Robbins
Defendant: New Bern Transport Corporation and Erik William Schultz
Case Number: 2:2021cv00032
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (flc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by New Bern Transport Corporation.(Whiting, Jason)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Erik William Schultz.(Whiting, Jason)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erik William Schultz. (Whiting, Jason)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by New Bern Transport Corporation. (Whiting, Jason)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rosalyne C. Robbins. Erik William Schultz waiver sent on 9/10/2021, answer due 11/9/2021.(Smith, Charles)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rosalyne C. Robbins. New Bern Transport Corporation waiver sent on 9/10/2021, answer due 11/9/2021.(Smith, Charles)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Bern Transport Corporation, Erik William Schultz (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402; AVAWDC-3785171.), filed by Rosalyne C. Robbins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(flc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. New Bern Transport Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyne C. Robbins
Represented By: Charles Ray Calton
Represented By: Charles H. Smith, III
Represented By: Powell Murry Leitch, III
Represented By: Thomas William Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Bern Transport Corporation
Represented By: Jason Robert Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik William Schultz
Represented By: Jason Robert Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?