McAfee v. Cauthorne et al
Plaintiff: Timothy W. McAfee
Defendant: Clifton Cauthorne, Marley Green, Susan Downs-Freeman, Stacey A. Carson and Town of Pound
Case Number: 2:2021cv00033
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION and ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Stacy A. Carson; this action is DISMISSED solely as to Defendant Stacey A. Carson; the clerk shall terminate this defendant as a party to the case. Signed by Senior Judge James P. Jones on 10/22/2021. (flc)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Original State Court Record(s) received from Wise County and City of Norton Circuit Court Office, case number(s) CL21-383 consisting of Complaint, Petition for Removal, Demurrer. (Records available for viewing in the clerks office.) (lml)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Stacey A. Carson. (Harf, Julian)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stacey A. Carson. (Harf, Julian)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court of Wise County Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/14/2021. (lml)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Respond. Signed by Senior Judge James P. Jones on 9/13/2021. (lml)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stacey A. Carson (lml)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wise County Circuit Court, case number CL21-383. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402.00, receipt number AVAWDC-3785727)), filed by Stacey A. Carson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint -state court, #3 Defendant Carson Demurer, #4 Defendant Memo in Support of Demurrer)(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAfee v. Cauthorne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W. McAfee
Represented By: Richard D. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Cauthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Downs-Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey A. Carson
Represented By: Emily Kristin Stubblefield
Represented By: Jeremy Ethridge Carroll
Represented By: Julian Friedman Harf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Pound
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?