University of Virginia Patent Foundation v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: University of Virginia Patent Foundation
Defendant: General Electric Company and Philips Electronics North America Corp.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00025
Filed: May 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Patent Office
County: Charlottesville City
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying 185 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 188 Motion for Leave to Appeal; Lifting STAY. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/27/2011. (mab)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying 167 Motion for Reconsideration in re 175 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/8/2011. (mab)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/9/2010. (mab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University of Virginia Patent Foundation v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Virginia Patent Foundation
Represented By: Charles Connor Crook, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?