King v. Capital One Bank, et al
Plaintiff: Lori King
Defendant: InCharge Debt Solutions and Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00068
Filed: October 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot 100 Motion for Stay or Continuance. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/5/2012. (mab)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/15/12. (hnw)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 58 Motion following hearing of 9/24/12. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/25/12. (hnw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Capital One Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori King
Represented By: Gregory Scott Duncan
Represented By: Garrett Minor Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InCharge Debt Solutions
Represented By: Dennis M. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: WHITEFORD TAYLOR & PRESTON LLP
Represented By: WHITEFORD TAYLOR & PRESTON LLP
Represented By: EDMUNDS & WILLIAMS PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A.
Represented By: James Francis Neale
Represented By: Bryan A. Fratkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?