Draper v. United States Postal Service c/o Megan J. Brennan Postmaster General

Plaintiff: Cedrick E. Draper
Defendant: United States Postal Service c/o Megan J. Brennan Postmaster General
Case Number: 3:2018cv00070
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order Dismissing Case by Cedrick E. Draper. (hnw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER TO ORDER by Cedrick E. Draper. Amendment to #13 Affidavit in Opposition (hnw)
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER TO ORDER AND STATEMENT OF FACTS/AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #12 Order Dismissing Case by Cedrick E. Draper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(hnw)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice the fourteen-day period having expired and the plaintiff having not paid the filing fee.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/26/18. (hnw)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Leave to file an Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/26/18. (hnw)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION For Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal by Cedrick E. Draper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hnw)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 Answer to Order re #8 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Cedrick E. Draper. (hnw)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #7 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff is again advised that this action will be DIMISSED without further notice unless the filing fee is paid within fourteen (14) days of the court's PREVIOUS order. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/30/18. (hnw)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Objection by Cedrick E. Draper. (hnw)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedrick E. Draper. (hnw)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ADVISING that the case will be dismissed without further notice if the fee is not paid within 14 days. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 08/27/2018. (ssm)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Virginia. (rban, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/20/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this matter to the USDC for the WDVA and close the case file in this District. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/17/2018. (rban, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/20/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedrick E Draper. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/20/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service c/o Megan J. Brennan Postmaster General, filed by Cedrick E Draper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/20/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. United States Postal Service c/o Megan J. Brennan Postmaster General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service c/o Megan J. Brennan Postmaster General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedrick E. Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?