Evans v. University of Virginia Physicians Group

Plaintiff: M.D. Avery Evans and Avery Evans
Defendant: University of Virginia Physicians Group and Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00006
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (hnw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company for Standard Insurance Company. (Stephens, Edwin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Standard Insurance Company.(Stephens, Edwin)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Substitute Party. Standard Insurance Company added. University of Virginia Physicians Group (Long-Term Disability Plan) terminated. Standard shall file its pleadings in response to the Complaint on or before March 29, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/25/19. (hnw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of Virginia Physicians Group (Stephens, Edwin)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by University of Virginia Physicians Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Edwin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to University of Virginia Physicians Group NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University of Virginia Physicians Group (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00 paid by e-receipt #0423-3060990), filed by Avery Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. University of Virginia Physicians Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Virginia Physicians Group
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Avery Evans
Represented By: Benjamin Weaver Glass, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Evans
Represented By: Benjamin Weaver Glass, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?