Entrepreneur Media, Inc. v. VIDA Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Entrepreneur Media, Inc.
Defendant: Tatiana Jimenez, Does 1-10, Gerardo Jimenez and VIDA Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00008
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick C. Justman for Entrepreneur Media, Inc. added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/20/19. (hnw) Modified on 3/27/2019 (hnw).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer L. Barry for Entrepreneur Media, Inc. added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/20/219 (hnw) Modified on 3/27/2019 (hnw).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Perry J. Viscounty for Entrepreneur Media, Inc. added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/20/19. (hnw) Modified on 3/27/2019 (hnw).
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Patrick C. Justman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3099258. by Entrepreneur Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barry, Stephen)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3099253. by Entrepreneur Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barry, Stephen)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Perry J. Viscounty to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3099248. by Entrepreneur Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barry, Stephen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Entrepreneur Media, Inc.. Gerardo Jimenez waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019; Tatiana Jimenez waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019; VIDA Group LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019.(Barry, Stephen)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tatiana Jimenez NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to VIDA Group LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gerardo Jimenez NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Entrepreneur Media, Inc. (hnw)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Gerardo Jimenez, Tatiana Jimenez, VIDA Group LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no 0423-3064156.), filed by Entrepreneur Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entrepreneur Media, Inc. v. VIDA Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entrepreneur Media, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Paul Barry
Represented By: Perry Joseph Viscounty
Represented By: Patrick Crary Justman
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatiana Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIDA Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?