Anderson v. Creative Hairdressers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: India Anderson
Defendant: Ratner Companies, LLC and Creative Hairdressers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00041
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicholas Raymond Conlon for India Anderson added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 7/30/19. (jcj)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORAL ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason Travis Brown for India Anderson added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 7/30/19. (jcj)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by India Anderson. Creative Hairdressers, Inc. waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019.(Cannon, Curtis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by India Anderson. Ratner Companies, LLC waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019.(Cannon, Curtis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Nicholas Conlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3193406. by India Anderson. (Cannon, Curtis) Modified on 7/29/2019 to amend name (jcj).
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Jason T. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3193399. by India Anderson. (Cannon, Curtis) Modified on 7/29/2019 to amend name (jcj).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ratner Companies, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Creative Hairdressers, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3185637.), filed by India Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(jcj) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2019) (jcj). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/17/2019) (jcj). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2019) (jcj). Modified on 7/17/2019 to correct footer (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Creative Hairdressers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratner Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Hairdressers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: India Anderson
Represented By: Curtis Daniel Cannon
Represented By: Jason Travis Brown
Represented By: Nicholas Raymond Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?