Lee et al v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al
Plaintiff: Scott R. Lee, Jr. and Kimberley Toone
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Sears, Roebuck and Co. and Global Express, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Denial of Defendants' Demurrer re #1 Notice of Removal, Ex 1 -- Demurrer, by Scott R. Lee, Jr, Kimberley Toone. (Wayland, Edward) Modified on 10/22/2019 - removed Judge Hoppe referral (kld).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/19. (jcj)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Cuff, Alexandria)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, N.A..(Cuff, Alexandria)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Culpeper Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/11/2019. (hnw)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Bank of America, N.A. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (hnw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Culpeper County Cirucit Court, case number CL190000. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt 0423-3242098), filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Answer and Demurrer, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Alexandria Elizabeth Cuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott R. Lee, Jr.
Represented By: Edward McCoy Wayland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Toone
Represented By: Edward McCoy Wayland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?