White et al v. Capitol One Bank U.S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth White and Monique Nicole White
Defendant: Capitol One Bank U.S.A., The CBE Group, Capital One Bank, Onemain Financial of America, Inc., John and Jane Does 1-10 and Navy Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv00073
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE/MOTION in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #14 MEMORANDUM. filed by Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White. (jcj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2020: #1 Exhibit B) (jcj).
January 21, 2020 Filing 31 PRO SE NOTICE to the Court by Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White and CBE Group Inc. Defendants' agreed upon an Out of Court settlement under FRCP 26(p). (jcj)
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 PRO SE MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Capitol One Bank USA aka Capital One Bank (USA) NA by Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White. (jcj)
January 13, 2020 Filing 29 Paper State Court Records received from Charlottesville Circuit Court, CL19-538, consisting of Pro Se Complaint w/exhibits, Summonses, Notice of Removal, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (jcj)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRETRIAL ORDER. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/9/20. (jcj)
January 9, 2020 Filing 27 Roseboro Notice re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Deadline set for 2/3/2020. (jcj)
January 8, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Correction: Document #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM was modified to replace deficient/incorrectpdf document with corrected pdf document. Original pdf was missing text (hnw)
January 8, 2020 Filing 25 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by The CBE Group identifying Corporate Parent CBE Companies for The CBE Group. (Colombell, Mark)
January 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by The CBE Group re #22 Roseboro Notice (Colombell, Mark)
January 8, 2020 Filing 23 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by The CBE Group. (Colombell, Mark)
January 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The CBE Group. (Colombell, Mark) (Main Document 22 replaced on 1/8/2020) (hnw).
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 Letter Response to Docket No. 19 by Navy Federal Credit Union (North, Susan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 PRO SE MOTION /Notice of right to serve defendants' pursuant to FRCP Rule 4 by Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White. (jcj)
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 PRO SE MOTION to Compel the Defendant's to send certified copies of Documents 13-16 that were not received, thus making plaintiff's unable to properly and timely reply to them by Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White. (jcj)
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Capitol One Bank U.S.A. (Schaeffer, Seth)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from plaintiff's Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White requesting service of summons with attached Complaint that was filed with Charlottesville Circuit Court on 10/10/2019 and requesting a copy of the docket sheet. Summonses will not be executed since this is a Notice of Removal case by the defendant's. Clerk will mail a copy of the docket sheet to plaintiffs. by Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White (jcj)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 Roseboro Notice re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Deadline set for 1/20/2020. (jcj)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Navy Federal Credit Union re #13 Roseboro Notice (Bean, Gregory)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Bean, Gregory)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Bean, Gregory)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scott Bean on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union (Bean, Gregory)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jcj)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Kenneth White, Monique Nicole White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jcj)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Navy Federal Credit Union re #1 (North, Susan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navy Federal Credit Union (North, Susan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Childers North on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union (North, Susan)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Charlottesville Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Capitol One Bank U.S.A.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/4/19. (hnw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Roseboro Notice re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Deadline set for 12/30/2019. (hnw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Capitol One Bank U.S.A.. (Schaeffer, Seth)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capitol One Bank U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Roseboro Notice)(Schaeffer, Seth)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capitol One Bank U.S.A. (Schaeffer, Seth)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlottesville Cirucit Court, case number CL19-538. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3279514), filed by Capitol One Bank U.S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Capitol One Bank U.S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol One Bank U.S.A.
Represented By: Seth Abram Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CBE Group
Represented By: Mark Richard Colombell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Represented By: Seth Abram Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onemain Financial of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Represented By: Susan Childers North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Nicole White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?