Bachman et al v. KinderCare Education at Work, LLC
Plaintiff: John Taylor Bachman and Kathleen Bridget Stranix
Defendant: KinderCare Education at Work, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00078
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER modifying the scheduling order as set forth in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and as requested by parties. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/7/2020. (ssm)
January 24, 2020 Filing 12 DISCOVERY LETTER re: Pl's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Kindercare Education at Work lLC d/b/a UVA Child Development Center, II by John Taylor Bachman.(Ray, Melissa)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiff John Taylor Bachman (Ray, Melissa)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 11/16-11/20/2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ssm)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 10/7/2020 Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Discovery due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/13/2020. (ssm)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 Scheduling Letter (ssm)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jcj)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Paper State Court Records received from Charlottesville Circuit Court, CL19-590, consisting of Complaint; Interrogatories (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (jcj)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Kyle McNew on behalf of John Taylor Bachman, Kathleen Bridget Stranix (McNew, Edward)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Charlottesville Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal filed by KinderCare Education at Work, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/17/19. (hnw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by KinderCare Education at Work, LLC (Haynes, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by KinderCare Education at Work, LLC.(Haynes, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlottesville Circuit Court, case number CL19-590. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3292556), filed by KinderCare Education at Work, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachman et al v. KinderCare Education at Work, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Taylor Bachman
Represented By: Charles J. Zauzig, III
Represented By: Melissa Ray
Represented By: Edward Kyle McNew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Bridget Stranix
Represented By: Charles J. Zauzig, III
Represented By: Melissa Ray
Represented By: Edward Kyle McNew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KinderCare Education at Work, LLC
Represented By: Brennan Crowder Morrissett
Represented By: James Matthew Haynes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?